EP3278113 - METHOD FOR PREDICTING RISK OF COGNITIVE DETERIORATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.2020 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CRC for Mental Health Ltd. 161 Barry Street Level 2 Carlton South, Victoria 3053 / AU | [2018/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AYTON, Scott 3/120 Murray Street Caulfield, Victoria 3162 / AU | 02 /
FAUX, Noel CRC for Mental Health Ltd Level 2 161 Barry Street Carlton South, Victoria 3053 / AU | 03 /
BUSH, Ashley, Ian 701/505 St Kilda Road Melbourne, Victoria 3000 / AU | [2018/06] | Representative(s) | Huenges, Martin Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/06] | Huenges, Martin Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16771103.5 | 01.04.2016 | [2018/06] | WO2016AU50248 | Priority number, date | AU20150901210 | 02.04.2015 Original published format: AU 2015901210 | AU20160900347 | 03.02.2016 Original published format: AU 2016900347 | [2018/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016154682 | Date: | 06.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3278113 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 06.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, G01N24/08, G01N29/04, A61B5/055, A61K31/4412, A61P25/28, A61B5/00 | [2018/47] | CPC: |
G01N33/84 (EP,US);
A61B5/0055 (EP,US);
A61B5/055 (EP,US);
A61B5/4088 (EP,US);
A61B5/4842 (EP,US);
A61B5/7275 (EP,US);
A61K31/4412 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6883 (US);
G01N33/6896 (US);
G16H50/30 (EP,US);
A61B5/14507 (EP,US);
A61B5/4064 (EP,US);
G01N2333/775 (US);
G01N2800/2814 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/06] | G01N33/68, G01N24/08, G01N29/04, A61B5/055, A61K31/4412, A61P25/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VORHERSAGE DES RISIKOS VON KOGNITIVER VERSCHLECHTERUNG | [2018/06] | English: | METHOD FOR PREDICTING RISK OF COGNITIVE DETERIORATION | [2018/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRÉDICTION DU RISQUE DE DÉTÉRIORATION COGNITIVE | [2018/06] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 02.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/06] | 02.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004102692 (SCHENCK JOHN FREDERICK [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * paragraphs [0021] , [0022]; claim 11 *; | [A]EP1303537 (SIR MORTIMER B DAVIS JEWISH GE [CA], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0003] , [0018] , [0019] * | [I] - BARTZOKIS ET AL, "Brain ferritin iron may influence age- and gender-related risks of neurodegeneration", NEUROBIOLOGY OF AGING, TARRYTOWN, NY, US, (20070201), vol. 28, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.NEUROBIOLAGING.2006.02.005, ISSN 0197-4580, pages 414 - 423, XP005868191 [I] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neurobiolaging.2006.02.005 | [I] - YUANYUAN QIN ET AL, "Investigation on positive correlation of increased brain iron deposition with cognitive impairment in Alzheimer disease by using quantitative MR R2' mapping", JOURNAL OF HUAZHONG UNIVERSITY OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY [MEDICAL SCIENCES] ; MEDICAL SCIENCES, HUAZHONG UNIVERSITY OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, HEIDELBERG, (20110807), vol. 31, no. 4, doi:10.1007/S11596-011-0493-1, ISSN 1993-1352, pages 578 - 585, XP019936032 [I] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11596-011-0493-1 | [X] - AYTON SCOTT ET AL, "Biometals and Their Therapeutic Implications in Alzheimer's Dis", NEUROTHERAPEUTICS, ELSEVIER INC, US, vol. 12, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S13311-014-0312-Z, ISSN 1933-7213, (20141030), pages 109 - 120, (20141030), XP035446831 [X] 13-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s13311-014-0312-z | International search | [X]WO0212284 (UNIV LOMA LINDA MED [US], et al) [X] 1-8, 10, 17, 18 * Abstract; pages 34-45; claim 19. *; | [X]WO2012027794 (MENTAL HEALTH RES INST OF VICTORIA [AU], et al) [X] 20, 21, 23, 24, 25 * Abstract; page 25, lines 26-30; Figures 5, 6, 12 and 19; Example 2; Table 2; claimsl, 9, 20. *; | [X]US2006030619 (LIU GANG [US], et al) [X] 1-7, 17,18, 20, 21, 23, 24 * Abstract; Examples IX-XIII; claims 13-28. *; | [X] - BUSH, A.I. et al., "Evidence for ApoE Protecting Against Brain Iron Overload", Alzheimer's & Dementia: The Journal of the Alzheimer's Association., (20140000), vol. 10, no. issue 4, page P878, XP055316811 [X] 1-19 * , abstract P4-253. Abstract. * | [X] - ZHU, W.Z. et al., "Quantitative MR Phase-corrected Imaging to Investigate Increased Brain Iron Deposition of Patients with Alzheimer Disease", Radiology., (20090000), vol. 253, no. 2, pages 497 - 504, XP055316812 [X] 1-8, 10, 17, 18 * . Abstract; Materials and Methods; Figures 3 and 4. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1148/radiol.2532082324 | [X] - HUANG, X.T. et al., "Reducing iron in the brain: a novel pharmacologic mechanism of huperzine A in the treatment of Alzheimer's disease", Neurobiology of Aging., (20140000), vol. 35, no. issue 5, pages 1045 - 1054, XP028608079 [X] 1-7, 17, 18, 20, 24, 25 * . Abstract; Experimental procedures; Figure 5; final paragraph page 1053. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neurobiolaging.2013.11.004 | [A] - HADZHIEVA, M. et al., "Review: Iron metabolism and the role of iron in neurodegenerative disorders", Neuropathology and Applied Neurobiology., (20140000), vol. 40, no. issue 3, pages 240 - 257, XP055316813 [A] 1-25 * . * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/nan.12096 | [A] - TAO, Y. et al., "Perturbed Iron Distribution in Alzheimer's Disease Serum, Cerebrospinal Fluid, and Selected Brain Regions: A Systematic Review and Meta- Analysis", Journal of Alzheimer's Disease., (20140000), vol. 42, no. issue 2, pages 679 - 690, XP055498028 [A] 1-25 * . * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3233/JAD-140396 | [A] - RITCHIE, C. et al., "Plasma and cerebrospinal fluid amyloid beta for the diagnosis of Alzheimer's disease dementia and other dementias in people with mild cognitive impairment (MCI) (Review", Cochrane Database of Systematic Reviews., (20140000), URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/10.1002/14651858.CD008782.pub4/epdf, (20160519), XP055316814 [A] 1-25 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/14651858.CD008782.pub4 | [PX] - LEHALLIER, B. et al., "Combined Plasma and Cerebrospinal Fluid Signature for the Prediction of Midterm Progression From Mild Cognitive Impairment to Alzheimer Disease", Journal of American Medical Association., (20160200), vol. 73, no. 2, pages 203 - 212, XP055498036 [PX] 1-25 * . Abstract; Methods; Figure 4. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1001/jamaneurol.2015.3135 | [PX] - AYTON, S., "Quantifying the impact of iron in Alzheimer's disease", Journal of Neurochemistry., (20150800), page 321, XP009507326 [PX] 1-25 * , abstract WTH12-01. Abstract. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/jnc.13189 | [PX] - AYTON, S. et al., "Ferritin levels in the cerebrospinal fluid predict Alzheimer's disease outcomes and are regulated by APOE", Nature Communications., (20150500), URL: http://www.nature.com/ncomms/2015/150519/ncomms7760/pdf/ncomms7760.pdf, (20160519) [PX] 1-25 * Abstract; Methods; Figures 2-5; Table 2. * |