EP3279595 - HEAT TREATMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IHI Corporation 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | For all designated states IHI Machinery and Furnace Co., Ltd. 3-3 Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-6009 / JP | [2020/01] |
Former [2018/06] | For all designated states IHI Corporation 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | ||
For all designated states IHI Machinery and Furnace Co., Ltd. 3-3 Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-5009 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATSUMATA Kazuhiko c/o IHI Machinery and Furnace Co. Ltd. 3-3 Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-6009 / JP | 02 /
NAGATA Takahiro c/o IHI Machinery and Furnace Co. Ltd. 3-3 Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-6009 / JP | [2018/06] | Representative(s) | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/02] | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | ||
Former [2018/06] | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 16772440.0 | 22.03.2016 | [2018/06] | WO2016JP58951 | Priority number, date | JP20150067959 | 30.03.2015 Original published format: JP 2015067959 | [2018/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016158559 | Date: | 06.10.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3279595 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3279595 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C21D1/06, C21D9/00, F27B5/02, F27B5/12, F27B5/13, F27D3/00, F27D15/02, F27D99/00, C23C8/20, F27B17/00, F27D7/00, F27D9/00 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
F27B17/0016 (EP,US);
F27B9/12 (US);
C21D9/0018 (EP,US);
C21D9/0062 (EP,US);
C23C8/20 (EP,US);
F27B5/02 (EP,US);
F27B5/12 (EP,US);
F27B5/13 (EP,US);
F27B9/028 (US);
F27B9/042 (US);
F27B9/2407 (US);
F27D15/0206 (EP,US);
F27D3/0024 (EP,US);
F27D7/00 (EP,US);
F27D9/00 (EP,US);
F27D99/0073 (EP,US);
C21D1/06 (EP,US);
F27B2009/122 (US);
F27B2009/126 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/42] | F27B9/12, F27B9/20, C21D1/06, C21D9/00, F27B5/02, F27B5/12, F27B5/13, F27D3/00, F27D15/02, F27D99/00, C23C8/20, F27B17/00, F27D7/00, F27D9/00 | ||
Former IPC [2018/06] | F27B9/12, F27B9/20, C21D1/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMEBEHANDLUNGSSYSTEM | [2018/06] | English: | HEAT TREATMENT SYSTEM | [2018/06] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT THERMIQUE | [2018/06] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2017 | Translation filed | 08.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/06] | 08.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.03.2016 | AL | 08.01.2020 | AT | 08.01.2020 | CY | 08.01.2020 | CZ | 08.01.2020 | DK | 08.01.2020 | EE | 08.01.2020 | ES | 08.01.2020 | FI | 08.01.2020 | HR | 08.01.2020 | IT | 08.01.2020 | LT | 08.01.2020 | LV | 08.01.2020 | MC | 08.01.2020 | MK | 08.01.2020 | MT | 08.01.2020 | NL | 08.01.2020 | PL | 08.01.2020 | RO | 08.01.2020 | RS | 08.01.2020 | SE | 08.01.2020 | SI | 08.01.2020 | SK | 08.01.2020 | SM | 08.01.2020 | TR | 08.01.2020 | IE | 22.03.2020 | LU | 22.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | CH | 31.03.2020 | LI | 31.03.2020 | BG | 08.04.2020 | GB | 08.04.2020 | NO | 08.04.2020 | GR | 09.04.2020 | IS | 08.05.2020 | PT | 31.05.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 22.03.2016 | |
AL | 08.01.2020 | ||
AT | 08.01.2020 | ||
CY | 08.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
MT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
TR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IE | 22.03.2020 | ||
LU | 22.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
GB | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 22.03.2016 | |
AT | 08.01.2020 | ||
CY | 08.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
MT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
TR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IE | 22.03.2020 | ||
LU | 22.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
GB | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
IE | 22.03.2020 | ||
LU | 22.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
GB | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
IE | 22.03.2020 | ||
LU | 22.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
IE | 22.03.2020 | ||
LU | 22.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
LU | 22.03.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 08.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH03130317 (ULVAC CORP) [A] 2,3,6-8 * figures 1, 2 * * the whole document *; | [A]JP2007315729 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD) [A] 6-8 * figures 1, 7 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] *; | [XI]JP2008170116 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD) [X] 1 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0019] * [I] 2-8; | [A]JP2009236344 (IHI CORP) [A] 4,5 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0070] *; | [XI]JP2015017790 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD) [X] 1 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0059] * [I] 2-8; | [A]JP5669981B (CHUGAI RO KOGYO KAISHA LTD) [A] 1-8 * figures 2, 4, 7-9 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003] ** paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0037] * | International search | [Y]JPH03130317 (ULVAC CORP) [Y] 6-8 * , page 2, lower left column, line 8 to lower right column, line 13 (Family: none) *; | [XYA]JP2008170116 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD) [X] 1 * , paragraphs [0006] to [0017]; fig. 1 to 7 (Family: none) * [Y] 4-8 [A] 2-3; | [Y]JP2009236344 (IHI CORP) [Y] 4-8 * , paragraphs [0014] to [0034],[0063] to [0064]; fig. 1 to 5 (Family: none) *; | [XYA]JP2015017790 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD) [X] 1 * , paragraphs [0048] to [0065]; fig. 1 to 5, 8 (Family: none) * [Y] 4-8 [A] 2-3; | [EXA]JP2016089251 (CHUGAI RO KOGYO KAISHA LTD) [EX] 1-3 * , paragraphs [0015], [0018] to [0049]; fig. 1 to 17 (Family: none) *[EA] 4-8 |