EP3280129 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/06] | ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT | ||
[2021/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 15-3, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | [2018/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUCHIYA, Satoshi c/o NIKON CORPORATION 15-3, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | 02 /
ASANO, Yuuki c/o NIKON CORPORATION 15-3, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIKAWA, Shuhei c/o NIKON CORPORATION 15-3, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | 04 /
NAMIKAWA, Aiko c/o NIKON CORPORATION 15-3, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | [2018/06] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/06] | Application number, filing date | 16773024.1 | 30.03.2016 | [2018/06] | WO2016JP60496 | Priority number, date | JP20150070439 | 30.03.2015 Original published format: JP 2015070439 | [2018/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016159143 | Date: | 06.10.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3280129 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3280129 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/232, G03B7/091, H04N5/235, H04N5/243, H04N5/353, H04N5/369, H04N9/64, H04N9/04, G06K9/20, G06K9/46 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
H04N23/62 (EP,CN,US);
G06V10/147 (EP,CN,US);
H04N9/64 (US);
G03B15/00 (EP,CN,US);
G03B7/091 (EP,CN,US);
G06V10/10 (EP,CN,US);
G06V10/50 (EP,CN,US);
G06V10/56 (EP,CN,US);
H01L27/14621 (EP,CN,US);
H01L27/14627 (EP,CN,US);
H01L27/1464 (EP,CN,US);
H04N23/00 (US);
H04N23/60 (CN);
H04N23/63 (CN);
H04N23/632 (EP,CN,US);
H04N23/635 (EP,CN,US);
H04N23/67 (EP,CN,US);
H04N23/672 (EP,CN,US);
H04N23/673 (EP,CN,US);
H04N23/71 (EP,CN,US);
H04N23/72 (CN,US);
H04N23/73 (EP,CN,US);
H04N23/76 (EP,CN,US);
H04N25/134 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/40] | H04N5/232, G03B7/091, G03B15/00, H04N5/225, G06T7/11 | ||
Former IPC [2018/06] | H04N5/232, G03B7/091, G03B15/00, H04N5/225 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2021/37] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2021/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2021/37] |
Former [2018/06] | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT | ||
Former [2018/06] | ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT | ||
Former [2018/06] | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PRODUIT DE PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2017 | Translation filed | 28.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/06] | 28.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.03.2016 | AL | 19.01.2022 | AT | 19.01.2022 | CY | 19.01.2022 | CZ | 19.01.2022 | DK | 19.01.2022 | EE | 19.01.2022 | ES | 19.01.2022 | FI | 19.01.2022 | HR | 19.01.2022 | IT | 19.01.2022 | LT | 19.01.2022 | LV | 19.01.2022 | MC | 19.01.2022 | MK | 19.01.2022 | NL | 19.01.2022 | PL | 19.01.2022 | RO | 19.01.2022 | RS | 19.01.2022 | SE | 19.01.2022 | SI | 19.01.2022 | SK | 19.01.2022 | SM | 19.01.2022 | TR | 19.01.2022 | IE | 30.03.2022 | LU | 30.03.2022 | BE | 31.03.2022 | CH | 31.03.2022 | LI | 31.03.2022 | BG | 19.04.2022 | NO | 19.04.2022 | GR | 20.04.2022 | IS | 19.05.2022 | PT | 19.05.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 30.03.2016 | |
AL | 19.01.2022 | ||
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CY | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
IT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
MK | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
IE | 30.03.2022 | ||
LU | 30.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 30.03.2016 | |
AL | 19.01.2022 | ||
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CY | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
IT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
IE | 30.03.2022 | ||
LU | 30.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 30.03.2016 | |
AL | 19.01.2022 | ||
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
IT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
IE | 30.03.2022 | ||
LU | 30.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
IT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
IE | 30.03.2022 | ||
LU | 30.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
IE | 30.03.2022 | ||
LU | 30.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
IE | 30.03.2022 | ||
LU | 30.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
IE | 30.03.2022 | ||
LU | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 19.01.2022 | |
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 19.01.2022 | |
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 19.01.2022 | |
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | NL | 19.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2007058064 (HARA NOZOMI [JP], et al); | [A]JP2008092515 (NIKON CORP); | [XY]US2012050565 (IMAI FRANCISCO [US]); | [XY]US2012069212 (IMAI FRANCISCO [US]); | [XY]WO2014192152 (NIKON CORP [JP]); | [E]US2016112644 (NISHI TAKESHI [JP]) | International search | [Y]JP2007081772 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JP2008092515 (NIKON CORP); | [XY]WO2014192152 (NIKON CORP [JP]) |