EP3280204 - USER TERMINAL, WIRELESS BASE STATION, AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.05.2024 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2018/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEDA, Kazuki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
UCHINO, Tooru c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
NAGATA, Satoshi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2018/06] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/06] | Application number, filing date | 16773110.8 | 31.03.2016 | [2018/06] | WO2016JP60649 | Priority number, date | JP20150076143 | 02.04.2015 Original published format: JP 2015076143 | [2018/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016159230 | Date: | 06.10.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3280204 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04L1/1829 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
H04L1/1854 (EP);
H04W72/21 (US);
H04L1/1861 (US);
H04L5/001 (EP,US);
H04L5/0048 (US);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04L5/0055 (US);
H04W72/0453 (US);
H04W88/02 (US);
H04W88/08 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/46] | H04L5/00, H04L1/18 | ||
Former IPC [2018/06] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/06] | Title | German: | BENUTZERENDGERÄT, DRAHTLOSE BASISSTATION UND DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2018/06] | English: | USER TERMINAL, WIRELESS BASE STATION, AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2018/06] | French: | TERMINAL UTILISATEUR, STATION DE BASE SANS FIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2018/06] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2017 | Translation filed | 18.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/06] | 18.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Details of reusing dual connectivity for PUCCH on SCell with CA", vol. RAN WG1, no. Dresden, Germany; 20140818 - 20140822, (20140817), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-142834, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20140817), XP050788319 [X] 1,4,9,10 * Introduction; page 1, paragraph 1 * * UCI transmission; page 2, paragraph 3 - page 4 * [Y] 2,3,5-8 | [YA] - CATT, "UCI transmission for FDD-TDD carrier aggregation", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20140210 - 20140214, (20140209), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-140083, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN/RAN1/Docs/, (20140209), XP050735649 [Y] 2,3,5-8 * Introduction; page 1, paragraph 1 * * UCI transmission with FDD as PCell; page 1, paragraph 2 - page 2 * * UCI transmission with TDD as PCell; page 2, paragraph 3 - page 3 * [A] 1,4,9,10 | [A] - INTEL CORPORATION, "Views on UL control enhancements for CA operation", vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20150209 - 20150213, (20150131), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-150237, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_80/Docs/, (20150131), XP050948907 [A] 1-10 * HARQ-ACK on PUSCH; page 2, paragraph 2.2 * | International search | [XY] - ERICSSON, "PUCCH on SCell for carrier aggregation", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1#80, Rl-150321, (20150213), XP050933531 [X] 1, 9, 10 [Y] 2, 3 | [XY] - CATT, "PUCCH on SCell for Rel-13 CA", 3GPP TSG- RAN WG1#80, Rl-150101, (20150213), XP050933315 [X] 1, 9, 10 [Y] 2, 3 | [YA] - NTT DOCOMO, "Further details of UE capability aspects", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1#78b, Rl-144144, (20141010), XP050875427 [Y] 2, 3, 5 [A] 6-8 | [YA] - NTT DOCOMO, "Remaining issues on TDD-FDD CA", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1#76, Rl-140619, (20140214), XP050736144 [Y] 3 [A] 7 | [XYA] - INTEL CORPORATION, "Support of PUCCH on Scell for CA", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1#80, Rl-150085, (20150213), XP050933299 [X] 4 [Y] 5 [A] 6-8 |