EP3279294 - GASOLINE ENGINE LUBRICANT OIL COMPOSITION AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Idemitsu Kosan Co., Ltd. 1-1 Marounouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | [2018/14] |
Former [2018/06] | For all designated states Idemitsu Kosan Co., Ltd 1-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUSUMOTO, Tatsuya 24-4 Anesakikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0107 / JP | [2018/06] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/06] | Application number, filing date | 16773138.9 | 31.03.2016 | [2018/06] | WO2016JP60719 | Priority number, date | JP20150074359 | 31.03.2015 Original published format: JP 2015074359 | [2018/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016159258 | Date: | 06.10.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3279294 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3279294 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C10M163/00, C10M169/04, C10M101/02, C10M107/02, C10M133/16, C10M135/18, C10M139/00, C10M145/14, C10M159/20, C10N10/04, C10N10/12, C10N20/02, C10N30/00, C10N30/06, C10N40/25, C10M167/00 | [2018/34] | CPC: |
C10M169/04 (EP,KR,US);
C10M101/02 (KR);
C10M129/50 (KR);
C10M133/58 (KR);
C10M135/10 (KR);
C10M141/08 (US);
C10M145/14 (KR);
C10M163/00 (EP,US);
C10M167/00 (EP,US);
C10M2203/003 (US);
C10M2203/1025 (EP,US);
C10M2205/0285 (EP,US);
C10M2207/262 (EP,US);
C10M2209/084 (EP,US);
C10M2215/223 (US);
C10M2215/28 (EP,US);
C10M2219/046 (EP,US);
C10M2219/068 (EP,US);
C10M2223/045 (EP,US);
C10N2010/02 (EP,KR);
C10N2010/04 (EP,KR);
C10N2010/12 (EP,KR);
C10N2030/02 (US);
C10N2030/04 (US);
C10N2030/06 (EP,US);
C10N2030/54 (EP,US);
C10N2040/25 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C10M2207/262, C10N2010/04 (US);
C10M2219/046, C10N2010/04 (US);
C10M2219/068, C10N2010/12 (US);
C10M2223/045, C10N2010/04 (US) |
Former IPC [2018/06] | C10M163/00, C10M169/04, C10M101/02, C10M107/02, C10M133/16, C10M135/18, C10M139/00, C10M145/14, C10M159/20, C10N10/04, C10N10/12, C10N20/02, C10N30/00, C10N30/06, C10N40/25 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHMIERÖLZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR EINEN BENZINMOTOR UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2018/06] | English: | GASOLINE ENGINE LUBRICANT OIL COMPOSITION AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | [2018/06] | French: | COMPOSITION D'HUILE LUBRIFIANTE POUR MOTEUR À ESSENCE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2018/06] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2017 | Translation filed | 03.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 03.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2017 | Examination requested [2018/06] | 03.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19156155.4 / EP3511398 | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.07.2023 | CZ | 05.07.2023 | DK | 05.07.2023 | EE | 05.07.2023 | ES | 05.07.2023 | FI | 05.07.2023 | HR | 05.07.2023 | IT | 05.07.2023 | LT | 05.07.2023 | LV | 05.07.2023 | NL | 05.07.2023 | PL | 05.07.2023 | RO | 05.07.2023 | RS | 05.07.2023 | SE | 05.07.2023 | SI | 05.07.2023 | SK | 05.07.2023 | SM | 05.07.2023 | NO | 05.10.2023 | GR | 06.10.2023 | IS | 05.11.2023 | PT | 06.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
IT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 05.07.2023 | |
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 05.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9637582 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0001]; examples 7, 8; table 1 *; | [X]US2009082233 (KASAI MORITSUGU [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0002]; example 3; table 1 *; | [A]JP2012102280 (JX NIPPON OIL & ENERGY CORP) [A] 1-13* paragraphs [0010] , [ 0087]; example 2 *; | [XP]WO2015114920 (TONENGENERAL SEKIYU K K [JP], et al) [XP] 1,2,4-6,8-13 * paragraph [0001]; examples 7, 11-16, 18-19, 26-27 *; | [E]WO2016152993 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [E] 1-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0128] - [0129]; examples 2-8; table 4 *; | [E]EP3101095 (EXXONMOBIL RES & ENG CO [US], et al) [E] 1,2,4-6,8-13 * paragraph [0001]; examples 7, 11-16, 18-19, 26-27 *; | [E]WO2017099052 (JX NIPPON OIL & ENERGY CORP [JP], et al) [E] 1,2,5-13 * paragraph [0002]; examples 1-2, 7-8, comp. 5; table 1 *; | [E]EP3275980 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [E] 1-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0128] , [ 0129]; examples 2-8; table 4 * | International search | [A]JPS62215697 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV) [A] 1-13 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH05279686 (Tonen Corp.) [A] 1-13 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH07316577 (TONEN CORP) [A] 1-13 * , entire text & WO 1996/037582 A1 & EP 847435 A1 entire text *; | [A]JPH08209178 (TONEN CORP) [A] 1-13 * , entire text & WO 1996/023856 A1 *; | [A]JPH09263782 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO) [A] 1-13* , entire text & US 6051536 A entire text & EP 798367 A2 *; | [A]JPH10510876 (Exxon Research & Engineering Co.) [A] 1-13 * , entire text & US 5658862 A & WO 1996/019551 A1 & EP 799291 A1 *; | [A]JP2006152305 (INFINEUM INT LTD) [A] 1-13 * , entire text & US 2006/0116299 A1 entire text & EP 1661970 A1 *; | [X]JP2006328265 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO) [X] 1-13 * , claims; paragraphs [0009], [0030]; examples & US 2009/0082233 A1 claims; paragraphs [0019], [0058]; examples & WO 2006/126651 A1 & CN 101184830 A *; | [A]JP2011012213 (CHEVRON JAPAN LTD) [A] 1-13 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [PX]WO2015114920 (TONENGENERAL SEKIYU K K [JP], et al) [PX] 1-13 * , entire text & JP 2015-163673 A * |