EP3273994 - CAR T-CELL THERAPY DIRECTED TO LHR FOR THE TREATMENT OF SOLID TUMORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Southern California 1150 South Olive Street, Suite 2300 Los Angeles, CA 90015 / US | [2018/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EPSTEIN, Alan L. c/o University of Southern California 1150 South Olive Street Suite 2300 Los Angeles, California 90015 / US | 02 /
HU, Peisheng c/o University of Southern California 1150 South Olive Street Suite 2300 Los Angeles, California 90015 / US | 03 /
PINSKI, Jacek K. c/o University of Southern California 1150 South Olive Street Suite 2300 Los Angeles, California 90015 / US | [2018/05] | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [2018/05] | Application number, filing date | 16773871.5 | 25.03.2016 | [2018/05] | WO2016US24354 | Priority number, date | US201562139623P | 27.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562139623 P | [2018/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016160618 | Date: | 06.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3273994 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3273994 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, C07K14/59, C07K14/72, C07K16/28, C07K16/30 | [2018/05] | CPC: |
G01N33/57415 (EP,US);
C07K16/2869 (EP,US);
A61K35/17 (US);
A61K39/4611 (EP);
A61K39/4631 (EP);
A61K39/464402 (EP);
A61K39/464468 (EP);
A61K39/46447 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C07K14/7051 (EP,US);
C07K14/70517 (EP,US);
C07K14/70521 (EP);
C07K14/70578 (EP,US);
C07K14/723 (EP);
C07K16/2809 (US);
C07K16/3007 (EP,US);
C07K16/3069 (US);
G01N33/57434 (EP,US);
G01N33/57449 (US);
G01N33/76 (EP,US);
A61K2035/124 (US);
A61K2039/505 (US);
A61K2239/29 (EP);
A61K2239/31 (EP);
A61K2239/38 (EP);
A61K2239/59 (EP);
C07K2317/24 (US);
C07K2317/31 (EP);
C07K2317/54 (US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,US);
C07K2317/56 (US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,US);
C07K2317/76 (US);
C07K2319/00 (EP);
C07K2319/02 (EP,US);
C07K2319/03 (EP,US);
C07K2319/30 (EP);
C07K2319/33 (EP);
G01N2800/52 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CAR-T-ZELLTHERAPIE GEGEN LHR ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON SOLIDEN TUMOREN | [2018/05] | English: | CAR T-CELL THERAPY DIRECTED TO LHR FOR THE TREATMENT OF SOLID TUMORS | [2018/05] | French: | THÉRAPIE À BASE DE LYMPHOCYTES T CAR DIRIGÉS CONTRE LE RÉCEPTEUR LHR POUR LE TRAITEMENT DES TUMEURS SOLIDES | [2018/05] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/05] | 13.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.11.2020 | 09.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   23.09.2020 | 31.03.2021 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   18.05.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.03.2016 | AL | 01.12.2021 | AT | 01.12.2021 | CY | 01.12.2021 | CZ | 01.12.2021 | DK | 01.12.2021 | EE | 01.12.2021 | FI | 01.12.2021 | HR | 01.12.2021 | IT | 01.12.2021 | LT | 01.12.2021 | LV | 01.12.2021 | MC | 01.12.2021 | MK | 01.12.2021 | MT | 01.12.2021 | NL | 01.12.2021 | PL | 01.12.2021 | RO | 01.12.2021 | RS | 01.12.2021 | SE | 01.12.2021 | SI | 01.12.2021 | SK | 01.12.2021 | SM | 01.12.2021 | TR | 01.12.2021 | BG | 01.03.2022 | NO | 01.03.2022 | GR | 02.03.2022 | GB | 25.03.2022 | IE | 25.03.2022 | LU | 25.03.2022 | ES | 26.03.2022 | BE | 31.03.2022 | CH | 31.03.2022 | FR | 31.03.2022 | LI | 31.03.2022 | IS | 01.04.2022 | PT | 01.04.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 25.03.2016 | |
AL | 01.12.2021 | ||
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CY | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
MK | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
TR | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
GB | 25.03.2022 | ||
IE | 25.03.2022 | ||
LU | 25.03.2022 | ||
ES | 26.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 25.03.2016 | |
AL | 01.12.2021 | ||
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CY | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
MK | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
GB | 25.03.2022 | ||
IE | 25.03.2022 | ||
LU | 25.03.2022 | ||
ES | 26.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 25.03.2016 | |
AL | 01.12.2021 | ||
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CY | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
GB | 25.03.2022 | ||
IE | 25.03.2022 | ||
LU | 25.03.2022 | ||
ES | 26.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 25.03.2016 | |
AL | 01.12.2021 | ||
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
GB | 25.03.2022 | ||
IE | 25.03.2022 | ||
LU | 25.03.2022 | ||
ES | 26.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
GB | 25.03.2022 | ||
IE | 25.03.2022 | ||
LU | 25.03.2022 | ||
ES | 26.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
GB | 25.03.2022 | ||
IE | 25.03.2022 | ||
LU | 25.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
GB | 25.03.2022 | ||
IE | 25.03.2022 | ||
LU | 25.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
GB | 25.03.2022 | ||
IE | 25.03.2022 | ||
LU | 25.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
GB | 25.03.2022 | ||
IE | 25.03.2022 | ||
LU | 25.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 01.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2012164136 (PINSKI JACEK [US]) [X] 1,9,15,18-20,25 * Paragraphs 61 and 62, example 1 on page 8 * [I] 2-8,10-14,16,17,21-24,26,27; | [XI] - FUNARO ADA ET AL, "Functional, structural, and distribution analysis of the chorionic gonadotropin receptor using murine monoclonal antibodies.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (200311), Database accession no. NLM14602802, XP002783240 [X] 1,9,15,18-20,25 * abstract * [I] 2-8,10-14,16,17,21-24,26,27 | [ ] - FUNARO ADA ET AL, "Functional, structural, and distribution analysis of the chorionic gonadotropin receptor using murine monoclonal antibodies.", THE JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM NOV 2003, (200311), vol. 88, no. 11, ISSN 0021-972X, pages 5537 - 5546 | [XI] - BUKOVSKY ANTONIN ET AL, "Multiple luteinizing hormone receptor (LHR) protein variants, interspecies reactivity of anti-LHR mAb clone 3B5, subcellular localization of LHR in human placenta, pelvic floor and brain, and possible role for LHR in the development of abnormal pregnancy, pelvic floor disorders and Alzheimer's disea", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (20030603), Database accession no. NLM12816543, XP002783241 [X] 1,9,15,18-20,25 * abstract * [I] 2-8,10-14,16,17,21-24,26,27 | [ ] - BUKOVSKY ANTONIN ET AL, "Multiple luteinizing hormone receptor (LHR) protein variants, interspecies reactivity of anti-LHR mAb clone 3B5, subcellular localization of LHR in human placenta, pelvic floor and brain, and possible role for LHR in the development of abnormal pregnancy, pelvic floor disorders and Alzheimer's disea", REPRODUCTIVE BIOLOGY AND ENDOCRINOLOGY : RB&E 03 JUN 2003, (20030603), vol. 1, ISSN 1477-7827, page 46 | [A] - A. A. CHEKMASOVA ET AL, "Successful Eradication of Established Peritoneal Ovarian Tumors in SCID-Beige Mice following Adoptive Transfer of T Cells Genetically Targeted to the MUC16 Antigen", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20100713), vol. 16, no. 14, doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-10-0192, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 3594 - 3606, XP055344554 [A] 1 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-10-0192 | International search | [XYA]US2012164136 (PINSKI JACEK [US]) [X] 1, 9/1 * . Especially para [0062], [0065]. * [Y] 2, 9/2 [A] 5, 6, 9/(5,6); | [A]US2012177664 (YOKOSEKI TATSUKI [JP], et al) [A] 5, 9/5* . Especially SEQ 10 NO: 2438 *; | [YA]US2015030600 (MARKS JAMES D [US], et al) [Y] 2, 9/2 * . Especially para [0016]; SEC ID NO: 244. * [A] 6, 9/6 | by applicant | US707993 | US3791932 | US3817837 | US3839153 | US3850752 | US3850578 | US3853987 | US3867517 | US3879262 | US3901654 | US3935074 | US3984533 | US3996345 | US4034074 | US4098876 | US4683195 | WO9002809 | WO9110737 | WO9117271 | WO9201047 | WO9218619 | WO9222324 | WO9311236 | US5223409 | US5403484 | WO9515982 | US5427908 | WO9520401 | WO9606213 | US5516637 | US5571698 | US5580717 | WO9708320 | US5658727 | US5686281 | US5698426 | US5733743 | US5750753 | US5780225 | US5821047 | US5858358 | US5883223 | US6352694 | US6534055 | US6692964 | US6753136 | WO2004061104 | US6797514 | US6867041 | US6887466 | US6905680 | US6905681 | US6905874 | US6924123 | US7056699 | US7067318 | US7144575 | US7172869 | US7175843 | US7232566 | US7419829 | US7442551 | US2012148552 | US2013287748 | US2015017141 | - SIEGEL, R. et al., CA Cancer J. Clin., (20120000), vol. 62, pages 10 - 29 | - MARCUS, C.S. et al., J. Cancer, (20140000), vol. 5, pages 25 - 30 | - GEIGER, T. L. et al., Blood, (20010000), vol. 98, pages 2364 - 2371 | - JALKANEN, M. et al., J. Cell. Biol., (19870000), vol. 105, pages 3087 - 3096 | - KETTLEBOROUGH et al., Eur. J. Immunol., (19940000), vol. 24, pages 952 - 958 | - PERSIC et al., Gene, (19970000), vol. 187, pages 9 - 18 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. XM_009444056.1 | - PINTO, R.D. et al., Vet. Immunol. Immunopathol., (20060000), vol. 110, pages 169 - 177 | - HOMBACH, A. et al., J Immunol, (20010000), vol. 167, pages 6123 - 6131 | - MAHER, J. et al., Nat Biotechnol, (20020000), vol. 20, pages 70 - 75 | - HAYNES, N. M. et al., J Immunol, (20020000), vol. 169, pages 5780 - 5786 | - HAYNES, N. M. et al., Blood, (20020000), vol. 100, pages 3155 - 3163 | - Journal of Virology, (19980000), vol. 72, pages 5085 - 5092 | - Journal of Virology, (19990000), vol. 73, pages 2886 - 2892 | - MAHER, J., ISRN Oncol., (20120000), vol. 2012, page 278093 | - J. Gene Med., (20120000), vol. 14, pages 405 - 415 | - FEDOROV, V.D. et al., Cancer J., (20140000), vol. 20, pages 160 - 165 | - BARRETT, D.M. et al., Annu. Rev. Med., (20140000), vol. 65, pages 333 - 347 | - JAKOBSEN, M.K. et al., J. Immunother. Emphasis Tumor Immunol., (19950000), vol. 17, pages 222 - 228 | - LOU, Y. et al., Clin. Cancer Res., (20080000), vol. 14, pages 1494 - 1501 | - SINGH, R. et al., Cancer Res., (20070000), vol. 67, pages 1887 - 1892 | - CHU, C.S. et al., Expert Rev. Anticancer Ther., (20080000), vol. 8, pages 243 - 257 | - CHEKMASOVA, A.A. et al., Discov. Med., (20100000), vol. 9, pages 62 - 70 | - PORTER, D.L. et al., NEJM, (20110000), vol. 365, pages 725 - 733 | - KELLY, R.J. et al., Mol. Cancer Ther., (20120000), vol. 11, pages 517 - 525 | - BEATTY, G.L. et al., Cancer Immunol. Res., (20140000), vol. 2, pages 112 - 120 | - KANDALAFT, L.E. et al., J. Transl. Med., (20120000), vol. 10, pages 157 - 167 | - CHEKMASOVA, A.A. et al., Clin. Cancer Res., (20100000), vol. 16, pages 3594 - 606 | - RAO, T.D. et al., Appl. Immunohistochem. Mol. Morphology, (20100000), vol. 18, pages 462 - 472 | - "Uniprot", Database accession no. P01834 | - HUSTON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (19880000), vol. 349, pages 5879 - 5883 | - KOHLERMILSTEIN, Nature, (19750000), vol. 256, pages 495 - 497 | - KOZBOR et al., Immunol. Today, (19830000), vol. 4, page 72 | - JALKANEN, M. et al., J. Cell. Biol., (19850000), vol. 101, pages 976 - 985 | - COTE et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (19830000), vol. 80, pages 2026 - 2030 | - GALFREMILSTEIN, Methods Enzymol, (19810000), vol. 73, pages 3 - 46 | - HAMMERLING et al., Monoclonal Antibodies And T-Cell Hybridomas, (19810000), pages 563 - 681 | - HUSE et al., Science, (19890000), vol. 256, pages 1275 - 1281 | - CHAUDHARY et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (19900000), vol. 87, pages 1066 - 1070 | - BRINKMAN et al., J. Immunol. Methods, (19950000), vol. 184, pages 177 - 186 | - BURTON et al., Advances in Immunology, (19940000), vol. 57, pages 191 - 280 | - MULLINAX et al., BioTechniques, (19920000), vol. 12, pages 864 - 869 | - SAWAI et al., AJRI, (19950000), vol. 34, pages 26 - 34 | - BETTER et al., Science, (19880000), vol. 240, pages 1041 - 1043 | - ORLANDI et al., PNAS, (19890000), vol. 86, pages 3833 - 3837 | - WINTER, G. et al., Nature, (19910000), vol. 349, pages 293 - 299 | - MADDOX et al., J. Exp. Med., (19830000), vol. 158, pages 1211 - 1216 | - S. W. BURCHIEL et al., Tumor Imaging: The Radiochemical Detection of Cancer, (19820000), vol. 13 | - "GeneBank", Database accession no. Y14837 | - WILKIE, S. et al., J. Clin. Immunol., (20120000), vol. 32, pages 1059 - 1070 | - LANITIS, E. et al., Cancer Immunol. Res., (20130000), vol. 1, pages 45 - 53 | - KLOSS, C.C. et al., Nat. Biotechnol., (20130000), vol. 31, pages 71 - 75 | WO1991GB01134 |