EP3237208 - HYDROPHOBIC PHOSPHONATE AND SILANE CHEMISTRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Moxtek, Inc. 452 West 1260 North Orem, UT 84057 / US | [2017/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINFORD, Matt 845 East 1080 North Orem, Utah 84097 / US | 02 /
DIWAN, Anubhav 1111 S. 1350 W. Unit No. D413 Ore, Utah 84058 / US | 03 /
LANE, Fred 1574 W. 480 N. Lindon, Utah 84042 / US | 04 /
MATTHEW, C. George 588 Compton Ct. Murray UT 84107 / US | [2018/19] |
Former [2018/14] | 01 /
LINFORD, Matt 845 East 1080 North Orem, Utah 84097 / US | ||
02 /
DIWAN, Anubhav 90 West 800 North Provo, Utah 84601 / US | |||
03 /
LANE, Fred 230 West North Temple Salt Lake City, Utah 83103 / US | |||
04 /
MATTHEW, C. George 588 Compton Ct. Murray UT 84107 / US | |||
Former [2017/44] | 01 /
LINFORD, Matt 845 East 1080 North Orem, Utah 84097 / US | ||
02 /
DIWAN, Anubhav 90 West 800 North Provo, Utah 84601 / US | |||
03 /
LANE, Fred 230 West North Temple Salt Lake City, Utah 83103 / US | Representative(s) | Walker, Ross Thomson Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [2017/44] | Application number, filing date | 16773967.1 | 29.03.2016 | [2017/44] | WO2016US24640 | Priority number, date | US201562142854P | 03.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562142854 P | US201562190188P | 08.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562190188 P | US201562209024P | 24.08.2015 Original published format: US 201562209024 P | US201562216782P | 10.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562216782 P | US201562242883P | 16.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562242883 P | US201562265773P | 10.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562265773 P | US201615078753 | 23.03.2016 Original published format: US201615078753 | [2017/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016160766 | Date: | 06.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3237208 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/28, B32B3/30, C09D5/16, C09D5/08, C23C16/30 | [2018/24] | CPC: |
C09D5/082 (EP,US);
C09D5/08 (CN,KR,US);
C09D4/00 (KR);
C23C16/24 (CN,KR,US);
C23C16/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/44] | B32B27/28, B32B3/30, C09D5/16, C09D5/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/44] | Title | German: | HYDROPHOBE PHOSPHONAT- UND SILANCHEMIE | [2017/44] | English: | HYDROPHOBIC PHOSPHONATE AND SILANE CHEMISTRY | [2017/44] | French: | CHIMIE DE PHOSPHONATE ET DE SILANE HYDROPHOBE | [2017/44] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 25.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/44] | 25.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/22] | 15.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004009717 (UNIV CINCINNATI [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0071] ** abstract *; | [E]WO2016118412 (CHEMOURS COMPANY TT LLC [US]) [E] 1-15 * page 3, line 10 - line 19 * * abstract * | International search | [XY]US3630790 (SCHMIDT DONALD L, et al) [X] 1, 2, 8 * See abstract; column 1, lines 5, 6, 47-57; column 2, lines 18-26; claims 1, 7; and Table 1. * [Y] 3-7, 9, 10; | [A]US4705725 (GLAJCH JOSEPH L [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * See abstract; column 2, lines 20-40; column 4, lines 46-65; column 5, lines 20-23, 35-44; and claims 1, 2, 4, 5, 15. *; | [A]US5455367 (KLEIN KLAUS-DIETER [DE], et al) [A] 1-10* See abstract; column 3, lines 46-61; column 5, lines 1, 2; and claims 3, 5. *; | [A]US2008131709 (HANSON ERIC L [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * See abstract; paragraphs [0023]-[0027], [0072]; and claims 1, 2, 7, 10. *; | [Y] - DALMORO, VIVIANE et al., "A synergistic combination of tetraethylorthosilicate and multiphosphonic acid offers excellent corrosion protection to AA1100 aluminum alloy", Applied Surface Science, (20130000), vol. 273, pages 758 - 768, XP028579457 [Y] 3-7, 10 * See abstract; page 759, 760, 767; and scheme 1. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apsusc.2013.02.131 | [Y] - ISHIZAKI, TAKAHIRO et al., "Corrosion resistant performances of alkanoic and phosphonic acids derived self-assembled monolayers on magnesium alloy AZ31 by vapor-phase method", Langmuir, (20110000), vol. 27, pages 6009 - 6017, XP055318980 [Y] 9, 10 * See abstract; and page 6010. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la200122x | [A] - HOQUE, E. et al., "Alkylperfluorosilane self-assembled monolayers on aluminum: A comparison with alkylphosphonate self-assembled monolayers", Jounral of Physical Chemisrty, (20070000), vol. 111, pages 3956 - 3962, XP055318982 [A] 1-10 * See abstract; and pages 3957, 3958. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jp066101m | [A] - KHRAMOV, A. N. et al., "Sol-gel coatings with phosphonate functionalities for surface modification of magnesium alloys", Thin Solid Films, (20060000), vol. 514, pages 174 - 181, XP025005898 [A] 1-10 * see abstract; page 175; and figure 1. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tsf.2006.02.023 | [A] - ZHENG, SHUN XING et al., "Inorganic-organic sol gel hybrid coatings for corrosion protection of metals", Journal of Sol-Gel Science and Technology, (20100000), vol. 54, pages 174 - 187, XP019792530 [A] 1-10 * See abstract; page 175, right column. * |