EP3277776 - FRACTURING FLUIDS AND METHODS OF TREATING HYDROCARBON FORMATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baker Hughes, a GE company, LLC 17021 Aldine Westfield Houston, TX 77073 / US | [2018/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NELSON, Scott Gregory P.O. Box 4740 Houston, TX 77210-4740 / US | 02 /
ZHOU, Jia P.O. Box 4740 Houston, TX 77210-4740 / US | 03 /
LI, Leiming P.O. Box 4740 Houston, TX 77210-4740 / US | [2018/06] | Representative(s) | Lambacher, Michael V. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Postfach 95 01 60 81517 München / DE | [2018/06] | Application number, filing date | 16774070.3 | 30.03.2016 | [2018/06] | WO2016US24925 | Priority number, date | US201562140105P | 30.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562140105 P | [2018/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016160927 | Date: | 06.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3277776 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C09K8/88, C09K8/68, C09K8/70, C09K8/64, C09K8/82, C09K8/90, C09K8/80 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
C09K8/703 (EP,CN,US);
E21B43/26 (EP,CN,NO,RU,US);
C09K8/70 (RU,US);
E21B43/267 (CN,NO,RU,US);
E21B37/06 (NO,US);
C09K8/035 (CN,US);
C09K8/12 (CN,US);
C09K8/34 (CN,US);
C09K8/52 (CN,NO,US);
C09K8/5756 (CN,US);
C09K8/62 (CN,NO,US);
C09K8/64 (EP,US);
C09K8/68 (EP,NO,RU,US);
C09K8/685 (EP,CN,NO,US);
C09K8/706 (EP,CN,US);
C09K8/76 (RU,US);
C09K8/80 (EP,CN,NO,US);
C09K8/82 (EP,US);
C09K8/88 (EP,RU,US);
C09K8/887 (EP,US);
C09K8/90 (EP,US);
E21B21/003 (US);
E21B33/134 (US);
E21B33/138 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/06] | C09K8/80, C09K8/035, E21B43/267 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/06] | Title | German: | FRAC-FLÜSSIGKEITEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KOHLENWASSERSTOFFFORMATIONEN | [2018/06] | English: | FRACTURING FLUIDS AND METHODS OF TREATING HYDROCARBON FORMATIONS | [2018/06] | French: | FLUIDES DE FRACTURATION ET PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT DE FORMATIONS D'HYDROCARBURES | [2018/06] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/06] | 19.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 04.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2011120719 (SOANE DAVID [US], et al); | [A]CN103816821 (LI LEI); | [I]US2014251610 (BRANNON HAROLD DEAN [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US3425971 (GUGLIEMELLI LEWIS A, et al); | [X]US2008085843 (WANG XIAOLAN [US], et al); | [A]US2013056213 (MEDVEDEV ANATOLY VLADIMIROVICH [RU], et al); | [A]US2014158355 (WUTHRICH PHILIP [US], et al); | [XYA]US2014332214 (ZHOU JIA [US], et al) |