EP3286264 - AEROGEL MATERIALS AND METHODS FOR THEIR PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aerogel Technologies, LLC 1001 W. Brentwood Lane Glendale, WI 53217 / US | [2018/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEINER, Stephen, A., III 26 Columbia Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 02 /
GRIFFIN, Justin S. 134 Summer Street Watertown, MA 02472 / US | 03 /
NELSON, Ryan T. 56 Bower St. Apt 1 Medford, MA 02155 / US | [2018/24] |
Former [2018/13] | 01 /
STEINER, Stephen, A., III 26 Columbia Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | ||
02 /
GRIFFIN, Justin, S. 68 Prentiss Street Watertown, MA 02472 / US | |||
03 /
NELSON, Ryan T. 8 Fuller Road Moultonborough, NH 03254 / US | |||
Former [2018/11] | 01 /
STEINER, Stephen, A., III 26 Columbia Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | ||
02 /
GRIFFIN, Justin, S. 68 Prentiss Street Watertown, MA 02472 / US | |||
03 /
NELSON, Ryan, T. 8 Fuller Road Moultonborough, NH 03254 / US | |||
Former [2018/09] | 01 /
STEINER, Stephen, A. 26 Columbia Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | ||
02 /
GRIFFIN, Justin, S. 68 Prentiss Street Watertown, MA 02472 / US | |||
03 /
NELSON, Ryan, T. 8 Fuller Road Moultonborough, NH 03254 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/09] | Application number, filing date | 16774204.8 | 31.03.2016 | [2018/09] | WO2016US25282 | Priority number, date | US201562141221P | 31.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562141221 P | [2018/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016161123 | Date: | 06.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3286264 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08L75/00, C08G18/76, C08G18/73, C08G18/79, C08G18/09, C08G101/00, C08G18/18, C08G18/78, C08G18/20, C08G18/24, C08G18/28, C08G18/32, C08G18/30, C08G18/34, C08G18/38 | [2019/07] | CPC: |
C08G18/7657 (EP,US);
C08J9/28 (EP,US);
C08G18/092 (EP,US);
C08G18/18 (EP,US);
C08G18/2036 (EP,US);
C08G18/246 (EP,US);
C08G18/289 (EP,US);
C08G18/30 (US);
C08G18/3215 (EP,US);
C08G18/3243 (EP,US);
C08G18/346 (EP,US);
C08G18/3819 (US);
C08G18/73 (US);
C08G18/7664 (EP,US);
C08G18/7671 (US);
C08G18/7831 (EP,US);
C08G18/792 (EP,US);
C08G69/00 (US);
C08G73/1003 (US);
C08G2110/0058 (EP,US);
C08G2110/0066 (EP,US);
C08G2110/0091 (EP,US);
C08G2115/02 (EP,US);
C08J2201/0502 (EP,US);
C08J2205/026 (EP,US);
C08J2375/02 (EP,US);
C08J2375/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/09] | C08L75/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/09] | Title | German: | AEROGELMATERIALIEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2018/09] | English: | AEROGEL MATERIALS AND METHODS FOR THEIR PRODUCTION | [2018/09] | French: | AÉROGELS ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION | [2018/09] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/09] | 15.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/09] | 15.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/40] | 28.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/40] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 15.12.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 15.12.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.01.2018 | Decision despatched | 15.12.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 15.12.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.01.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 15.12.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 15.12.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.01.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 15.12.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 15.12.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.01.2018 | Decision despatched | 15.12.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 15.12.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.01.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 15.12.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 15.12.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.01.2018 | Decision despatched | 15.12.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 15.12.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.01.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2018 | 31.03.2019 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2019 | 31.03.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009104401 (NAKANISHI KAZUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * Sample 1-4 * * claim 27 * * paragraph [0074] ** tables 1, 2 * | International search | [Y]US5268303 (BOURNE SIDNEY [US]) [Y] 62-64 and 96-98 * col 4, In 13-19 *; | [Y]US6399669 (SUZUKI MASAAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 55 and 75-76 * col 1, In 9-12; col 2, In 7-11 *; | [Y]US2004214497 (KAWABE MASAAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 56 and 87 * para [0019], [0047], [0071], [0072] *; | [Y]US2006281828 (NAKAYAMA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 68-70 and 101-103* para [0006]-[0011], [0040], [0044], [0054], [0056], [0060], [0131] *; | [XY]US2009104401 (NAKANISHI KAZUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3, 74 and 86 * para [0015]-[0020], [0047], [0062], [0072], [0074], [0076]-[0078], [0080], [0082], [0137], [0154]; abstract; figure 1; claims 1 and 25 * [Y] 55-58, 62-64, 75-76, 87-89, 92-94, 96-98; | [XY]US2014080932 (LEE JE KYUN [US], et al) [X] 50-52 and 82-85 * para [0013], [0020], [0043], [0051], [0081], [0086], [0090], [0097], [0105], [0106]; abstract * [Y] 57-58, 68-70, 88 89 and 92-94 and 101-103 |