EP3337316 - CUSTOM SIZE HORSE SHOE HAVING INTEGRATED LIGHT-WEIGHT STRUCTURE AND GENERATIVE PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/26] | CUSTOM HORSESHOE WITH INTEGRATED LIGHTWEIGHT STRUCTURE AND GENERATIVE PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR | ||
[2019/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rosswag GmbH August-Rosswag-Strasse 1 76327 Pfinztal / DE | [2018/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DONISI, Sven Schauinslandstrasse 6 76327 Pfinztal / DE | 02 /
GRAF, Gregor Bockstalstraße 36 76327 Pfinztal / DE | [2018/27] |
Former [2018/26] | 01 /
DONISI, Sven Schauinslandstrasse 6 76327 Pfinztal / DE | ||
02 /
GRAF, Gregor Bockstalstrasse 26 76327 Pfinztal / DE | Representative(s) | Mehl-Mikus, Claudia mepat Patentanwälte Dr. Mehl-Mikus, Goy, Dr. Drobnik PartG mbB Eisenlohrstraße 31 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [2018/26] | Application number, filing date | 16774851.6 | 18.08.2016 | [2018/26] | WO2016EP01407 | Priority number, date | DE20151010607 | 18.08.2015 Original published format: DE102015010607 | [2018/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017028957 | Date: | 23.02.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3337316 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3337316 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A01L1/00 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
A01L1/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MASS-HUFEISEN MIT INTEGRIERTER LEICHTBAUSTRUKTUR UND GENERATIVES FERTIGUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2018/26] | English: | CUSTOM SIZE HORSE SHOE HAVING INTEGRATED LIGHT-WEIGHT STRUCTURE AND GENERATIVE PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR | [2019/27] | French: | FER À CHEVAL À STRUCTURE LÉGÈRE INTÉGRÉE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION GÉNÉRATIF CORRESPONDANT | [2019/27] |
Former [2018/26] | CUSTOM HORSESHOE WITH INTEGRATED LIGHTWEIGHT STRUCTURE AND GENERATIVE PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR | ||
Former [2018/26] | FER À CHEVAL DE RÉFÉRENCE À STRUCTURE LÉGÈRE INTÉGRÉE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION GÉNÉRATIVE ASSOCIÉ | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/26] | 16.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.08.2016 | AL | 06.11.2019 | CY | 06.11.2019 | CZ | 06.11.2019 | DK | 06.11.2019 | EE | 06.11.2019 | FI | 06.11.2019 | HR | 06.11.2019 | LT | 06.11.2019 | LV | 06.11.2019 | MC | 06.11.2019 | MK | 06.11.2019 | MT | 06.11.2019 | NL | 06.11.2019 | PL | 06.11.2019 | RO | 06.11.2019 | RS | 06.11.2019 | SI | 06.11.2019 | SK | 06.11.2019 | SM | 06.11.2019 | TR | 06.11.2019 | BG | 06.02.2020 | GR | 07.02.2020 | IS | 06.03.2020 | PT | 06.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 18.08.2016 | |
AL | 06.11.2019 | ||
CY | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
MT | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
TR | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2308228 (ERNST & CO KG) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [Y]WO9203770 (BAUR ANDREAS [DE]) [Y] 8-10,12 * abstract * * page 3 * * pages 6-9 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2013067285 (FOUR SCORNED LLC [US]) [Y] 7,12 * abstract * * pages 4-6 * * figure 1 *; | [XAY]US2014262353 (BERGELEEN LYLE EUGENE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] , [0015] , [0019] , [0020] , [0105] , [0117] , [0129] , [0133] - [0136] - [0140] , [0142] , [0143] * * claims 1,5,17,18,28,29 * * figures 2A-2KC * [A] 3,4,11 [Y] 7-10,12 | by applicant | DE4027057 | FR2973644 |