|
28.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
28.04.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.02.2021 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2021 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.09.2020 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.09.2020 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
02.06.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
02.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.01.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.01.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
14.10.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
14.10.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
91 |
|
14.10.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
14.10.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
90 |
|
14.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2019 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2019 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2019 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.04.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
14.11.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
14.11.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2018 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2018 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2018 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2018 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
0 |
|
19.03.2018 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2018 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.01.2018 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.06.2017 |
Republication of front page of international application with corrected bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2017 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Republication of front page of international application with corrected bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
129 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2017 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
0 |
|
16.03.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.03.2017 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
128 |
|
03.01.2017 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
14.10.2016 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
14.10.2016 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.09.2016 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.09.2016 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
19.09.2016 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
19 |
|
19.09.2016 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
90 |
|
19.09.2016 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
18 |
|
19.09.2016 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.09.2016 |
Notification Concerning Payment of Prescribed Fees (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
19.09.2016 |
Notification of the International Application Number and of the International Filing Date (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.09.2016 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
5 |