Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021023208 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202017064496 | 06.10.2020 | WO2016US51037 | 09.09.2016 | US201815758505 | 08.03.2018 | US201562215927 | 09.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10799580 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2020 | B2 | US2018280497 | 04.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US51037 | 09.09.2016 | US201562215927 | 09.09.2015 | US201615758505 | 09.09.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3347047 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US51037 | 09.09.2016 | US201562215927 | 09.09.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017044803 | Global Dossier | 29.06.2017 | A8 | WO2017044803 | 16.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562215927 | 09.09.2015 |