Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10129128 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2018 | B2 | US2018270135 | 20.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15187797 | 30.09.2015 | WO2016EP72881 | 26.09.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107925590B | Global Dossier | 18.12.2018 | B | CN107925590 | 17.04.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | EP15187797 | 30.09.2015 | WO2016EP72881 | 26.09.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3357194 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2019 | B1 | EP3357194 | 08.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15187797 | 30.09.2015 | WO2016EP72881 | 26.09.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017055225 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15187797 | 30.09.2015 |