|
28.03.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.04.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.12.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.12.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
15.12.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
02.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.10.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.04.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.04.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.02.2020 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2020 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.06.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.06.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.04.2019 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2019 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.12.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2018 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.04.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.03.2018 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2018 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2018 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.01.2018 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.04.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
10.04.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
19.12.2016 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
16.12.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
16.12.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.12.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
15.12.2016 |
Substitute sheet (Rule 26) - drawings for ISA/EP |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
17.10.2016 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
16 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Invitation to Correct Defects in the International Application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
4 |