06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
16.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
12.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
29.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
20.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
06.05.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
25.03.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] |
11.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
04.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
04.02.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
24.12.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] |
26.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] |
19.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
12.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
05.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |
22.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] |
15.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
16.04.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
13.04.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
13.04.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.04.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
14.12.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.12.2020 |
Change - German title |
published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] |
04.12.2020 |
Change - English title |
published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] |
04.12.2020 |
Change - French title |
published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] |
02.10.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.09.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.05.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.04.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.02.2020 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.10.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.10.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.06.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.04.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.01.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.12.2018 |
First examination report |
|
23.11.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
23.11.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
01.10.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.06.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
22.06.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
22.06.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
28.05.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.04.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.03.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.03.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.03.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
23.03.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.03.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.03.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.12.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.10.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|