Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3350944 | Global Dossier | 19.05.2021 | B1 | EP3350944 | 25.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615260481 | 09.09.2016 | US201562219910 | 17.09.2015 | WO2016IL51015 | 12.09.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017046791 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615260481 | 09.09.2016 | US201562219910 | 17.09.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10720704 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2020 | B2 | US2017082754 | 23.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615260481 | 09.09.2016 | US201562219910 | 17.09.2015 |