EP3353214 - AGENTS INHIBITING KALLIKREIN-8 FOR USE IN THE PREVENTION OR TREATMENT OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.04.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universität Duisburg-Essen Universitätsstrasse 2 45141 Essen / DE | [2018/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERRING, Arne Kerßenbrockstr. 33 48147 Münster / DE | 02 /
KEYVANI, Kathy Girondellenstr. 4 45134 Essen / DE | [2018/31] | Representative(s) | Lahrtz, Fritz, et al Simmons & Simmons LLP Lehel Carré Thierschplatz 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/33] | Lahrtz, Fritz Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Seckenheimer Landstr. 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2018/31] | Lahrtz, Fritz Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 68 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16775537.0 | 21.09.2016 | [2018/31] | WO2016EP72381 | Priority number, date | EP20150002769 | 25.09.2015 Original published format: EP 15002769 | EP20150003657 | 22.12.2015 Original published format: EP 15003657 | [2018/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017050803 | Date: | 30.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3353214 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3353214 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/40, A61K39/395, A61P25/28, G01N33/53 | [2018/31] | CPC: |
C07K16/40 (EP,US);
A61K39/395 (US);
A61P25/28 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/54 (EP,US);
A61K9/51 (US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WIRKSTOFFE ZUR HEMMUNG VON KALLIKREIN-8 ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER VORBEUGUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON MORBUS ALZHEIMER | [2020/08] | English: | AGENTS INHIBITING KALLIKREIN-8 FOR USE IN THE PREVENTION OR TREATMENT OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE | [2018/31] | French: | AGENTS D'INHIBITION KALLIKREIN-8 POUR UTILISATION DANS LA PRÉVENTION OU LE TRAITEMENT DE LA MALADIE D'ALZHEIMER | [2020/08] |
Former [2018/31] | WIRKSTOFFE ZUR HEMMUNG VON KALLIKREIN-8 ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER VORBEUGUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON MORBUS ALZHEIMER | ||
Former [2018/31] | AGENTS INHIBANT LA KALLICRÉINE 8 UTILISÉS DANS LA PRÉVENTION OU LE TRAITEMENT DE LA MALADIE D'ALZHEIMER | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/31] | 24.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.09.2016 | AL | 18.08.2021 | AT | 18.08.2021 | CY | 18.08.2021 | CZ | 18.08.2021 | DK | 18.08.2021 | EE | 18.08.2021 | ES | 18.08.2021 | FI | 18.08.2021 | HR | 18.08.2021 | IT | 18.08.2021 | LT | 18.08.2021 | LV | 18.08.2021 | MC | 18.08.2021 | MK | 18.08.2021 | MT | 18.08.2021 | NL | 18.08.2021 | PL | 18.08.2021 | RO | 18.08.2021 | RS | 18.08.2021 | SE | 18.08.2021 | SI | 18.08.2021 | SK | 18.08.2021 | SM | 18.08.2021 | IE | 21.09.2021 | LU | 21.09.2021 | BE | 30.09.2021 | BG | 18.11.2021 | NO | 18.11.2021 | GR | 19.11.2021 | IS | 18.12.2021 | PT | 20.12.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 21.09.2016 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
MK | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
IE | 21.09.2021 | ||
LU | 21.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 21.09.2016 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
IE | 21.09.2021 | ||
LU | 21.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 21.09.2016 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
IE | 21.09.2021 | ||
LU | 21.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
IE | 21.09.2021 | ||
LU | 21.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
IE | 21.09.2021 | ||
LU | 21.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
LU | 21.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/27] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2005022164 (BAYER HEALTHCARE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-4 * page 56, line 25 - line 26; claim 20 * * page 41, line 24 - page 42, line 1 * * page 80, line 30 - line 31 * * abstract * [I] 5-10,14; | [A]US2005106586 (DIAMANDIS ELEFTHERIOS P [CA]) [A] 1-10,14* the whole document *; | [A]WO2009097141 (JOSLIN DIABETES CT [US], et al) [A] 1-10,14 * page 41 * * abstract *; | [Y] - MOMOTA YOSHIHARU ET AL, "Blockade of neuropsin, a serine protease, ameliorates kindling epilepsy", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, (199802), vol. 10, no. 2, ISSN 0953-816X, pages 760 - 764, XP002755848 [Y] 1-10,14 * figures 1b,3a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1460-9568.1998.00068.x | [YD] - SHIMIZU-OKABE C ET AL, "EXPRESSION OF THE KALLIKREIN GENE FAMILY IN NORMAL AND ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE BRAIN", NEUROREPORT, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, UK, (20010828), vol. 12, no. 12, doi:10.1097/00001756-200108280-00031, ISSN 0959-4965, pages 2747 - 2751, XP008040774 [YD] 1-10,14 * abstract * * figure 2; table 2 * * page 2751 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00001756-200108280-00031 | by applicant | US4328245 | US4409239 | US4410545 | US4683202 | US5573528 | US6251639 | US6350458 | US6692918 | WO2005022164 | - TAMURA, H.; KAWATA, M.; HAMAGUCHI, S.; ISHIKAWA, Y.; SHIOSAKA, S, "Processing of neuregulin-1 by neuropsin regulates GABAergic neuron to control neural plasticity of the mouse hippocampus", J NEUROSCI, (2012), vol. 32, pages 12657 - 12672 | - ATTWOOD, B.K.; BOURGOGNON, J.M.; PATEL, S.; MUCHA, M.; SCHIAVON, E.; SKRZYPIEC, A.E.; YOUNG, K.W.; SHIOSAKA, S.; KOROSTYNSKI, M.;, "Neuropsin cleaves EphB2 in the amygdala to control anxiety", NATURE, (2011), vol. 473, pages 372 - 375 | - HARTMANN, J.; WAGNER, K.V.; GAALI, S.; KIRSCHNER, A.; KOZANY, C.; RUHTER, G.; DEDIC, N.; HAUSL, A.S.; HOEIJMAKERS, L.; WESTERHOLZ,, "Pharmacological Inhibition of the Psychiatric Risk Factor FKBP51 Has Anxiolytic Properties", J NEUROSCI, (2015), vol. 35, pages 9007 - 9016 | - SRIVASTAVA, N.; ROBICHAUX, M.A.; CHENAUX, G.; HENKEMEYER, M.; COWAN, C.W., "EphB2 receptor forward signaling controls cortical growth cone collapse via Nck and Pak", MOL CELL NEUROSCI, (2013), vol. 52, pages 106 - 116 | - KAYSER, M.S.; NOLT, M.J.; DALVA, M.B., "EphB receptors couple dendritic filopodia motility to synapse formation", NEURON, (2008), vol. 59, pages 56 - 69 | - ADAMS, R.H.; WILKINSON, G.A.; WEISS, C.; DIELLA, F.; GALE, N.W.; DEUTSCH, U.; RISAU, W.; KLEIN, R., "Roles of ephrinB ligands and EphB receptors in cardiovascular development: demarcation of arterial/venous domains, vascular morphogenesis, and sprouting angiogenesis", GENES DEV, (1999), vol. 13, pages 295 - 306 | - CHUKKAPALLI, S.; AMESSOU, M.; DILLY, A.K.; DEKHIL, H.; ZHAO, J.; LIU, Q.; BEJNA, A.; THOMAS, R.D.; BANDYOPADHYAY, S.; BISMAR, T.A., "Role of the EphB2 receptor in autophagy, apoptosis and invasion in human breast cancer cells", EXP CELL RES, (2014), vol. 320, pages 233 - 246 | - KANDOUZ, M.; HAIDARA, K.; ZHAO, J.; BRISSON, M.L.; BATIST, G., "The EphB2 tumor suppressor induces autophagic cell death via concomitant activation of the ERK1/2 and PI3K pathways", CELL CYCLE, (2010), vol. 9, pages 398 - 407 | - D'AMELIO, M.; ROSSINI, P.M., "Brain excitability and connectivity of neuronal assemblies in Alzheimer's disease: from animal models to human findings", PROG NEUROBIOL, (2012), vol. 99, pages 42 - 60 | - RUAN, L.; LAU, B.W.; WANG, J.; HUANG, L.; ZHUGE, Q.; WANG, B.; JIN, K.; SO, K.F., "Neurogenesis in neurological and psychiatric diseases and brain injury: from bench to bedside", PROG NEUROBIOL, (2014), vol. 115, pages 116 - 137 | - ZLOKOVIC, B.V., "Neurovascular pathways to neurodegeneration in Alzheimer's disease and other disorders", NAT REV NEUROSCI, (2011), vol. 12, pages 723 - 738 | - PARIS, D.; GANEY, N.; BANASIAK, M.; LAPORTE, V.; PATEL, N.; MULLAN, M.; MURPHY, S.F.; YEE, G.T.; BACHMEIER, C.; GANEY, C. ET AL., "Impaired orthotopic glioma growth and vascularization in transgenic mouse models of Alzheimer's disease", J NEUROSCI, (2010), vol. 30, pages 11251 - 11258 | - GHAVAMI, S.; SHOJAEI, S.; YEGANEH, B.; ANDE, S.R.; JANGAMREDDY, J.R.; MEHRPOUR, M.; CHRISTOFFERSSON, J.; CHAABANE, W.; MOGHADAM, A, "Autophagy and apoptosis dysfunction in neurodegenerative disorders", PROG NEUROBIOL, (2014), vol. 112, pages 24 - 49 | - D.S.; STAVRIDES, P.; MOHAN, P.S.; KAUSHIK, S.; KUMAR, A.; OHNO, M.; SCHMIDT, S.D.; WESSON, D.; BANDYOPADHYAY, U.; JIANG, Y. ET AL., "Reversal of autophagy dysfunction in the TgCRND8 mouse model of Alzheimer's disease ameliorates amyloid pathologies and memory deficits", BRAIN, (2011), vol. 134, pages 258 - 277 | - SHIMIZU-OKABE, C.; YOUSEF, G.M.; DIAMANDIS, E.P.; YOSHIDA, S.; SHIOSAKA, S.; FAHNESTOCK, M., "Expression of the kallikrein gene family in normal and Alzheimer's disease brain", NEUROREPORT, (2001), vol. 12, pages 2747 - 2751 | - QU, M.; JIANG, J.; LIU, X.P.; TIAN, Q.; CHEN, L.M.; YIN, G.; LIU, D.; WANG, J.Z.; ZHU, L.Q., "Reduction and the intracellular translocation of EphB2 in Tg2576 mice and the effects of beta-amyloid", NEUROPATHOL APPL NEUROBIOL, (2013), vol. 39, pages 612 - 622 | - SIMON, A.M.; DE MATURANA, R.L.; RICOBARAZA, A.; ESCRIBANO, L.; SCHIAPPARELLI, L.; CUADRADO-TEJEDOR, M.; PEREZ-MEDIAVILLA, A.; AVIL, "Early changes in hippocampal Eph receptors precede the onset of memory decline in mouse models of Alzheimer's disease", J ALZHEIMERS DIS, (2009), vol. 17, pages 773 - 786 | - CISSE, M.; HALABISKY, B.; HARRIS, J.; DEVIDZE, N.; DUBAL, D.B.; SUN, B.; ORR, A.; LOTZ, G.; KIM, D.H.; HAMTO, P. ET AL., "Reversing EphB2 depletion rescues cognitive functions in Alzheimer model", NATURE, (2011), vol. 469, pages 47 - 52 | - JIANG, J.; WANG, Z.H.; QU, M.; GAO, D.; LIU, X.P.; ZHU, L.Q.; WANG, J.Z., "Stimulation of EphB2 attenuates tau phosphorylation through P13K/Akt-mediated inactivation of glycogen synthase kinase-3beta", SCI REP, (2015), vol. 5, page 11765 | - GOETTIG P. ET AL., BIOCHIMIE, (2010), vol. 92, no. 11, pages 1546 - 1567 | - MOMOTA, Y.; YOSHIDA, S.; ITO, J.; SHIBATA, M.; KATO, K.; SAKURAI, K.; MATSUMOTO, K.; SHIOSAKA, S., "Blockade of neuropsin, a serine protease, ameliorates kindling epilepsy", EUR J NEUROSCI, (1998), vol. 10, pages 760 - 764 | - BRITTEN; DAVIDSON, Hybridization Strategy, pages 3 - 15 | - MONNING, U.; SANDBRINK, R.; WEIDEMANN, A.; BANATI, R.B.; MASTERS, C.L.; BEYREUTHER, K., "Extracellular matrix influences the biogenesis of amyloid precursor protein in microglial cells", J BIOL CHEM, (1995), vol. 270, pages 7104 - 7110 | - MUENCHHOFF, J.; POLJAK, A.; SONG, F.; RAFTERY, M.; BRODATY, H.; DUNCAN, M.; MCEVOY, M.; ATTIA, J.; SCHOFIELD, P.W.; SACHDEV, P.S., "Plasma protein profiling of mild cognitive impairment and Alzheimer's disease across two independent cohorts", J ALZHEIMERS DIS, (2015), vol. 43, pages 1355 - 1373 | - GUIDOTTI, A.; COSTA, E., "Can the antidysphoric and anxiolytic profiles of selective serotonin reuptake inhibitors be related to their ability to increase brain 3 alpha, 5 alpha-tetrahydroprogesterone availability?", BIOL PSYCHIATRY, (1998), vol. 44, pages 865 - 873 | - NAYLOR, J.C.; KILTS, J.D.; HULETTE, C.M.; STEFFENS, D.C.; BLAZER, D.G.; ERVIN, J.F.; STRAUSS, J.L.; ALLEN, T.B.; MASSING, M.W.; PA, "Allopregnanolone levels are reduced in temporal cortex in patients with Alzheimer's disease compared to cognitively intact control subjects", BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (2010), vol. 1801, pages 951 - 959 | - WANG, J.M.; SINGH, C.; LIU, L.; IRWIN, R.W.; CHEN, S.; CHUNG, E.J.; THOMPSON, R.F.; BRINTON, R.D., "Allopregnanolone reverses neurogenic and cognitive deficits in mouse model of Alzheimer's disease", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (2010), vol. 107, pages 6498 - 6503 | - A. DOMB ET AL., POLYMERS FOR ADVANCED TECHNOLOGIES, (1992), vol. 3, pages 279 - 292 | - "Biodegradable Polymers as Drug Delivery Systems", Drugs and the Pharmaceutical Sciences, M. DEKKER, (1990), vol. 45 | - WANG T. ET AL., J CLIN PSYCHIATRY, (2015), vol. 76, no. 2, pages 135 - 141 | - STRUYFS H. ET AL., FRONT NEUROL., (2015), vol. 17, no. 6, page 138 | - ZETTERBERG, H; BLENNOW K., JAMA NEUROL, (2015), vol. 14, pages 1 - 7 | - HADAMITZKY M; HERRING A; KEYVANI K; DOENLEN R; KRUGEL U; BOSCHE K; ORLOWSKI K; ENGLER H; SCHEDLOWSKI M., "Acute systemic rapamycin induces neurobehavioral alterations in rats", BEHAV BRAIN RES., (2014), vol. 273, pages 16 - 22 | - CHISHTI, M.A.; YANG, D.S.; JANUS, C.; PHINNEY, A.L.; HOME, P.; PEARSON, J.; STROME, R.; ZUKER, N.; LOUKIDES, J.; FRENCH, J. ET AL., "Early-onset amyloid deposition and cognitive deficits in transgenic mice expressing a double mutant form of amyloid precursor protein 695", J BIOL CHEM, (2001), vol. 276, pages 21562 - 21570 | - MIRRA, S.S.; HART, M.N.; TERRY, R.D., "Making the diagnosis of Alzheimer's disease. A primer for practicing pathologists", ARCH PATHOL LAB MED, (1993), vol. 117, pages 132 - 144 | - BRAAK, H.; BRAAK, E., "Neuropathological stageing of Alzheimer-related changes", ACTA NEUROPATHOL, (1991), vol. 82, pages 239 - 259 | - Y. MOMOTA; S. YOSHIDA; J. ITO; M. SHIBATA; K. KATO; K. SAKURAI ET AL., "Blockade of neuropsin, a serine protease, ameliorates kindling epilepsy", EUR J NEUROSCI, (1998), vol. 10, pages 760 - 764 | - YOUNG, E.J.; LIPINA, T.; TAM, E.; MANDEL, A.; CLAPCOTE, S.J.; BECHARD, A.R.; CHAMBERS, J.; MOUNT, H.T.; FLETCHER, P.J.; RODER, J.C, "Reduced fear and aggression and altered serotonin metabolism in Gtf2ird1-targeted mice", GENES BRAIN BEHAV, (2008), vol. 7, pages 224 - 234 | - KILIC, E.; ELALI, A.; KILIC, U.; GUO, Z.; UGUR, M.; USLU, U.; BASSETTI, C.L.; SCHWAB, M.E.; HERMANN, D.M., "Role of Nogo-A in neuronal survival in the reperfused ischemic brain", J CEREB BLOOD FLOW METAB, (2010), vol. 30, pages 969 - 984 | - CASTELLANO, J.M.; DEANE, R.; GOTTESDIENER, A.J.; VERGHESE, P.B.; STEWART, F.R.; WEST, T.; PAOLETTI, A.C.; KASPER, T.R.; DEMATTOS,, "Low-density lipoprotein receptor overexpression enhances the rate of brain-to-blood Abeta clearance in a mouse model of beta-amyloidosis", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (2012), vol. 109, pages 15502 - 15507 | - A. BELLUCCI; M.C. ROSI; C. GROSSI; A. FIORENTINI; I. LUCCARINI; F. CASAMENTI, "Abnormal processing of tau in the brain of aged TgCRND8 mice", NEUROBIOL DIS, (2007), vol. 27, pages 328 - 338 |