EP3359825 - CONNECTING DEVICE FOR RIGIDLY CONNECTING A FIRST PIPE TO A SECOND PIPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maytec Aluminium Systemtechnik GmbH Kopernikusstraße 20 85221 Dachau / DE | [2018/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEY, Dieter c/o MayTech Aluminium Systemtechnik GmbH Kopernikusstraße 20 85221 Dachau / DE | [2018/33] | Representative(s) | Roth, Sebastian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/33] | Roth, Sebastian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16775750.9 | 05.10.2016 | [2018/33] | WO2016EP73801 | Priority number, date | DE201510219187 | 05.10.2015 Original published format: DE102015219187 | [2018/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017060306 | Date: | 13.04.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3359825 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16B7/04 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
F16B7/0466 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/33] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUM STARREN VERBINDEN EINES ERSTEN ROHRES MIT EINEM ZWEITEN ROHR | [2018/33] | English: | CONNECTING DEVICE FOR RIGIDLY CONNECTING A FIRST PIPE TO A SECOND PIPE | [2018/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LIAISON POUR RELIER RIGIDEMENT UN PREMIER TUBE À UN DEUXIÈME TUBE | [2018/33] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/33] | 03.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/17] | 21.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/17] | Request for further processing for: | 25.03.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 25.03.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.04.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US3580620 (OFFENBROICH ADRIAN GOTTFRIED) [X] 1,2,7,9,11-13,15 * abstract * [I] 14; | [A]US6227752 (FRIEDRICH PAUL [US]) [A] 8* figure 3 *; | [XI]DE102009042381 (MAYTEC ALUMINIUM SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-13,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0020] * [I] 14; | [X]EP2551534 (PLATRE DAVID [FR], et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract * |