EP3280865 - DOWNHOLE VIBRATION ASSEMBLY AND METHOD OF USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dreco Energy Services ULC 2900 Manulife Place 10180 - 101 Street Edmonton, Alberta T5J 3V5 / CA | [2018/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRILL, Jonathan Ryan 7603 - 16th Avenue SW Edmonton, Alberta T6X 1M3 / CA | [2020/14] |
Former [2018/07] | 01 /
PRILL, Jonathan, Ryan 7603 - 16th Avenue SW Edmonton, Alberta T6X 1M3 / CA | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [2020/14] |
Former [2018/07] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 16775970.3 | 04.04.2016 | [2018/07] | WO2016CA00099 | Priority number, date | US201562144801P | 08.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562144801 P | [2018/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016161502 | Date: | 13.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3280865 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3280865 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 13.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | E21B7/24, E21B28/00, E21B4/00 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
E21B7/24 (EP,US);
E21B28/00 (EP,US);
E21B4/003 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/07] | E21B7/24, E21B28/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BOHRLOCHVIBRATIONSANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2018/07] | English: | DOWNHOLE VIBRATION ASSEMBLY AND METHOD OF USING SAME | [2018/07] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE VIBRATION DE FOND DE TROU ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | [2018/07] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 02.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/07] | 02.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20162851.8 / EP3690179 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.04.2016 | AL | 01.04.2020 | AT | 01.04.2020 | CY | 01.04.2020 | CZ | 01.04.2020 | DK | 01.04.2020 | EE | 01.04.2020 | ES | 01.04.2020 | FI | 01.04.2020 | HR | 01.04.2020 | IT | 01.04.2020 | LT | 01.04.2020 | LV | 01.04.2020 | MC | 01.04.2020 | MK | 01.04.2020 | MT | 01.04.2020 | PL | 01.04.2020 | RO | 01.04.2020 | RS | 01.04.2020 | SE | 01.04.2020 | SI | 01.04.2020 | SK | 01.04.2020 | SM | 01.04.2020 | TR | 01.04.2020 | IE | 04.04.2020 | LU | 04.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | BG | 01.07.2020 | GR | 02.07.2020 | IS | 01.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 04.04.2016 | |
AL | 01.04.2020 | ||
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CY | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
MT | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
TR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IE | 04.04.2020 | ||
LU | 04.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
IE | 04.04.2020 | ||
LU | 04.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
IE | 04.04.2020 | ||
LU | 04.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
LU | 04.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
LU | 04.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
ES | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
LU | 04.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 01.04.2020 | |
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 01.04.2020 | |
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | BG | 01.07.2020 | |
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | BG | 01.07.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4077683 (BHATEJA CHANDER PRAKASH, et al) [Y] 5,14 * column 3, lines 19-25 *; | [A]US5664891 (KUTINSKY DAVID PETER [CA], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XYI]US8517093 (BENSON TODD W [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6-9,11,13 * column 16, lines 38-50 * [Y] 5,14 [I] 2,10,15; | [XYI]US2015023137 (BENSON TODD W [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6-9,11,13 * paragraph [0116] * [Y] 5,14 [I] 2,10,15 | International search | [Y]US3235014 (BROOKS WARREN B) [Y] 2 * see whole document *; | [Y]US4077683 (BHATEJA CHANDER PRAKASH, et al) [Y] 1-20 * see whole document *; | [A]US2008099245 (HALL DAVID R [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * see whole document, cited by applicant *; | [Y]US8517093 (BENSON TODD W [US]) [Y] 1-20 * see whole document *; | [A]US8764307 (BRUBAKER JUSTIN [US], et al) [A] 1-20* see whole document * |