EP3280435 - TGF-BETA SUPERFAMILY TYPE I AND TYPE II RECEPTOR HETEROMULTIMERS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.08.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acceleron Pharma Inc. 128 Sidney Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2021/22] |
Former [2018/07] | For all designated states Acceleron Pharma Inc. 128 Sidney Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMAR, Ravindra 421 Arlington Street Acton, MA 01720 / US | 02 /
GRINBERG, Asya 37 Follen Road Lexington, MA 02421 / US | 03 /
SAKO, Dianne, S. 14 Mystic Street Medford, MA 02155 / US | 04 /
PEARSALL, Robert, Scott 8 Winterberry Lane North Reading, MA 01864 / US | 05 /
CASTONGUAY, Roselyne 32 Grace Street Malden, MA 02148 / US | [2018/07] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/22] | Rashid, Jeremy Suhail, et al White & Case LLP 5 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1 DW / GB | ||
Former [2018/07] | Evenson, Jane Harriet Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 16777003.1 | 06.04.2016 | [2018/07] | WO2016US00033 | Priority number, date | US201562143579P | 06.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562143579 P | [2018/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016164089 | Date: | 13.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3280435 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3280435 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 08.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61P1/16, A61P3/06, A61P3/10, A61P9/10, A61P9/12, A61P11/00, A61P13/08, A61P19/02, A61P21/00, A61P25/00, A61P35/02, A61P37/02, A61P27/06, C07K14/71, A61K38/00, C12N9/12, A61P3/04, A61P13/12, A61P37/06 | [2020/34] | CPC: |
C07K14/71 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K38/45 (KR,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C12N9/12 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/51] | C07K14/71, C07K19/00, A61K38/17, A61K39/395, A61P13/12, A61P3/04, A61K38/00, C12N9/12 | ||
Former IPC [2018/07] | A61K38/18, A61K39/395, A61P19/00, A61P21/00, A61P9/00, A61P35/00, C07K14/71, C07K19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/07] | Extension states | BA | 31.10.2017 | ME | 31.10.2017 | Validation states | MA | 31.10.2017 | MD | 31.10.2017 | Title | German: | HETEROMULTIMERE DES TGF-BETA-SUPERFAMILIE-TYP-I- UND TYP-II-REZEPTORS UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2018/07] | English: | TGF-BETA SUPERFAMILY TYPE I AND TYPE II RECEPTOR HETEROMULTIMERS AND USES THEREOF | [2018/07] | French: | HÉTÉROMULTIMÈRES DE RÉCEPTEUR DE TYPE I ET DE TYPE II DE LA SUPERFAMILLE DE TGF-BÊTA ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2018/07] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/07] | 31.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 23.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21161146.2 / EP3889171 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/19] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 23.02.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 23.02.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.03.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.04.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 17.04.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.04.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.04.2016 | AL | 02.06.2021 | AT | 02.06.2021 | CY | 02.06.2021 | CZ | 02.06.2021 | DK | 02.06.2021 | EE | 02.06.2021 | ES | 02.06.2021 | FI | 02.06.2021 | HR | 02.06.2021 | IT | 02.06.2021 | LT | 02.06.2021 | LV | 02.06.2021 | MC | 02.06.2021 | MK | 02.06.2021 | MT | 02.06.2021 | NL | 02.06.2021 | PL | 02.06.2021 | RO | 02.06.2021 | RS | 02.06.2021 | SE | 02.06.2021 | SI | 02.06.2021 | SK | 02.06.2021 | SM | 02.06.2021 | TR | 02.06.2021 | BG | 02.09.2021 | NO | 02.09.2021 | GR | 03.09.2021 | IS | 02.10.2021 | PT | 04.10.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 06.04.2016 | |
AL | 02.06.2021 | ||
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CY | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
MK | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
TR | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 06.04.2016 | |
AL | 02.06.2021 | ||
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CY | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
MK | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 06.04.2016 | |
AL | 02.06.2021 | ||
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CY | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 06.04.2016 | |
AL | 02.06.2021 | ||
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
LT | 02.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - DIANNE SAKO ET AL, "Characterization of the Ligand Binding Functionality of the Extracellular Domain of Activin Receptor Type IIB", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, US, vol. 285, no. 27, doi:10.1074/JBC.M110.114959, ISSN 0021-9258, (20100702), pages 21037 - 21048, (20100412), XP008148640 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 21038, column l, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M110.114959 | [A] - A. KONCAREVIC ET AL, "A Soluble Activin Receptor Type IIB Prevents the Effects of Androgen Deprivation on Body Composition and Bone Health", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (20100901), vol. 151, no. 9, doi:10.1210/en.2010-0134, ISSN 0013-7227, pages 4289 - 4300, XP055060206 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/en.2010-0134 | [A] - DERWALL MATTHIAS ET AL, "Inhibition of Bone Morphogenetic Protein Signaling Reduces Vascular Calcification and Atherosclerosis", ARTERIOSCLEROSIS, THROMBOSIS, AND VASCULAR BIOL, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, US, (20120301), vol. 32, no. 3, doi:10.1161/ATVBAHA.111.242594, ISSN 1079-5642, pages 613 - 622, XP009162035 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 614, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 615, column r, paragraph l * * figures 4, 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/ATVBAHA.111.242594 | International search | [A]WO2005084699 (ACCELERON PHARMA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15, 37-62, 69-86, 103-234, 497* abstract, Figures, Examples *; | [A]WO2008076437 (ACCELERON PHARMA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15, 37-62, 69-86, 103-234, 497 * abstract, Figures, Examples *; | [A]WO2009134428 (ACCELERON PHARMA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15, 37-62, 69-86, 103-234, 497 * abstract, Figures, Examples *; | [A]WO2010114860 (ACCELERON PHARMA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15, 37-62, 69-86, 103-234, 497 * abstract, Figures, Examples *; | [A] - CASTONGUAY R. et al., "Soluble endoglin specifically binds bone morphogenetic proteins 9 and 10 via its orphan domain, inhibits blood vessel formation, and suppress tumor growth", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20110000), vol. 286, no. 34, pages 30034 - 30046, XP055031457 [A] 1-15, 37-62, 69-86, 103-234, 497 * Materials, last paragraph of first column page 30035 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M111.260133 | by applicant | WO8401106 | US5096815 | US5198346 | WO9311162 | US5223409 | US5283317 | US5525490 | WO9626432 | US5677196 | US5731168 | US5932448 | US5955280 | US5965368 | WO0043781 | WO2006012627 | US7183076 | WO2007147901 | WO2008097541 | US2009010879 | WO2009089004 | US7612041 | US7709605 | US7842663 | WO2010151426 | WO2011034605 | US2011236309 | US8252900 | US2012302737 | US8338377 | US8592562 | - HINCK et al., FEBS Letters, (20120000), vol. 586, pages 1860 - 1870 | - GROBET et al., Nat Genet., (19970000), vol. 17, no. 1, pages 71 - 4 | - SCHUELKE et al., N Engl J Med, (20040000), vol. 350, pages 2682 - 8 | - SPIESS et al., Molecular Immunology, (20150000), vol. 67, no. 2A, pages 95 - 106 | - WEISS et al., Developmental Biology, (20130000), vol. 2, no. 1, pages 47 - 63 | - LIN et al., Reproduction, (20060000), vol. 132, pages 179 - 190 | - MASSAGUE, Nat. Rev. Mol. Cell Biol., (20000000), vol. 1, pages 169 - 178 | - GOUMANS et al., Mol Cell, (20030000), vol. 12, no. 4, pages 817 - 828 | - CLOUTHIER et al., J Clin. Invest., (19970000), vol. 100, no. 11, pages 2697 - 2713 | - LI et al., Immunity, (20060000), vol. 25, no. 3, pages 455 - 471 | - KUBICZKOVA et al., Journal of Translational Medicine, (20120000), vol. 10, page 183 | - DEPAOLO et al., Proc Soc Ep Biol Med., (19910000), vol. 198, pages 500 - 512 | - DYSON et al., Curr Biol., (19970000), vol. 7, pages 81 - 84 | - WOODRUFF, Biochem Pharmacol., (19980000), vol. 55, pages 953 - 963 | - SAKUMA et al., Genes Cells. 2002, (20020000), vol. 7, pages 401 - 12 | - RIDER et al., Biochem J., (20100000), vol. 429, no. 1, pages 1 - 12 | - MCPHERRON et al., Nature, (19970000), vol. 387, pages 83 - 90 | - ASHMORE et al., Growth, (19740000), vol. 38, pages 501 - 507 | - SWATLANDKIEFFER, J. Anim. Sci., (19940000), vol. 38, pages 752 - 757 | - MCPHERRONLEE, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19970000), vol. 94, pages 12457 - 12461 | - KAMBADUR et al., Genome Res., (19970000), vol. 7, pages 910 - 915 | - GONZALEZ-CADAVID et al., PNAS, (19980000), vol. 95, pages 14938 - 43 | - WAKEFIELD et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19880000), vol. 263, pages 7646 - 7654 | - BROWN et al., Growth Factors, (19900000), vol. 3, pages 35 - 43 | - GAMER et al., Dev. Biol., (19990000), vol. 208, pages 222 - 232 | - MCPHERRON et al., Nat. Genet., (19990000), vol. 22, pages 260 - 264 | - NAKASHIMA et al., Mech. Dev., (19990000), vol. 80, pages 185 - 189 | - MISHINA et al., Dev Biol., (19990000), vol. 213, pages 314 - 326 | - GAMER et al., Dev Biol., (20010000), vol. 229, pages 407 - 20 | - WU et al., Neuron., (20030000), vol. 37, pages 197 - 207 | - MACIAS-SILVA et al., J Biol Chem., (19980000), vol. 273, pages 25628 - 36 | - ZEC et al., Biochemia Medica, (20110000), vol. 21, no. 3, pages 219 - 30 | - CUNHAPIETRAS, Blood, (20110000), vol. 117, no. 26, pages 6999 - 7006 | - FUKUDA et al., J Biol Chem., (20090000), vol. 284, no. 11, pages 7149 - 7156 | - KAPLAN et al., Ann N.Y. Acad Sci., (20110000), vol. 1237, pages 5 - 10 | - IWABUCHI et al., Oncogene, (19930000), vol. 8, pages 1693 - 1696 | - LAVERY et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20080000), vol. 283, pages 20948 - 20958 | - KAMIYA, J. Bone Miner. Res., (20080000), vol. 23, pages 2007 - 2017 | - KAMIYA, Development, (20080000), vol. 135, pages 3801 - 3811 | - TSUCHIDA et al., Endocrine Journal, (20080000), vol. 55, no. 1, pages 11 - 21 | - LARSSON et al., The EMBO Journal, (20010000), vol. 20, no. 7, pages 1663 - 1673 | - KEMALADEWI et al., Mol Ther Nucleic Acids, (20140000), vol. 3, page el56 | - DEMIRHAN et al., J Med Genet., (20050000), vol. 42, pages 314 - 317 | - YI et al., Development, (20000000), vol. 127, pages 621 - 630 | - ANDERSSON et al., PNAS, (20080000), vol. 105, no. 20, pages 7252 - 7256 | - DE SILVA et al., Frontiers in Endocrinology, (20120000), vol. 3, page 59 | - CHENG et al., Int. J. Mol. Sci., (20140000), vol. 15, pages 12665 - 12676 | - ROSENZWEIG et al., PNAS, (19950000), vol. 92, pages 7632 - 7636 | - GREENWALD et al., Nat Struct Biol, (19990000), vol. 6, pages 18 - 22 | - HINCK, FEBS Lett, (20120000), vol. 586, pages 1860 - 1870 | - HILDEN et al., Blood, (19940000), vol. 83, no. 8, pages 2163 - 2170 | - ATTISANO et al., Cell, (19920000), vol. 68, no. 1, pages 97 - 108 | - GREENWALD et al., Nature Structural Biology, (19990000), vol. 6, no. 1, pages 18 - 22 | - ALLENDORPH et al., PNAS, (20060000), vol. 103, no. 20, pages 7643 - 7648 | - THOMPSON et al., The EMBO Journal, (20030000), vol. 22, no. 7, pages 1555 - 1566 | - KONRAD et al., BMC Genomics, (20070000), vol. 8, page 318 | - ROBERTS et al., Biol Reprod, (20030000), vol. 68, pages 1719 - 1726 | - THOTAKURA et al., Meth. Enzymol., (19870000), vol. 138, page 350 | - NARANG, SA, Tetrahedron, (19830000), vol. 39, page 3 | - "Recombinant DNA, Proc. 3rd Cleveland Sympos", ITAKURA et al., Macromolecules, Elsevier, (19810000), pages 273 - 289 | - ITAKURA et al., Annu. Rev. Biochem., (19840000), vol. 53, page 323 | - ITAKURA et al., Science, (19840000), vol. 198, page 1056 | - IKE et al., Nucleic Acid Res., (19830000), vol. 11, page 477 | - DEVLIN et al., Science, (19900000), vol. 249, pages 404 - 406 | - ROBERTS et al., PNAS USA, (19920000), vol. 89, pages 2429 - 2433 | - CWIRLA et al., PNAS USA, (19900000), vol. 87, pages 6378 - 6382 | - RUF et al., Biochemistry, (19940000), vol. 33, pages 1565 - 1572 | - WANG et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19940000), vol. 269, pages 3095 - 3099 | - BALINT et al., Gene, (19930000), vol. 137, pages 109 - 118 | - GRODBERG et al., Eur. J. Biochem., (19930000), vol. 218, pages 597 - 601 | - NAGASHIMA et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20120000), vol. 287, pages 43331 - 43339 | - LOWMAN et al., Biochemistry, (19910000), vol. 30, pages 10832 - 10838 | - CUNNINGHAM et al., Science, (19890000), vol. 244, pages 1081 - 1085 | - GUSTIN et al., Virology, (19930000), vol. 193, pages 653 - 660 | - BROWN et al., Mol. Cell Biol., (19920000), vol. 12, pages 2644 - 2652 | - MCKNIGHT et al., Science, (19820000), vol. 232, page 316 | - MEYERS et al., Science, (19860000), vol. 232, page 613 | - LEUNG et al., Method Cell Mol Biol, (19890000), vol. 1, pages 11 - 19 | - PACKPLUECKTHUN, Biochemistry, (19920000), vol. 31, pages 1579 - 1584 | - GREENER et al., Strategies in Mol Biol, (19940000), vol. 7, pages 32 - 34 | - PACK et al., Bio/Technology, (19930000), vol. 11, pages 1271 - 1277 | - KLEIN et al., mAbs, (20120000), vol. 4, pages 653 - 663 | - RIDGWAY et al., Protein Eng, (19960000), vol. 9, pages 617 - 621 | - MERCHANT et al., Nat Biotech, (19980000), vol. 16, pages 677 - 681 | - DAVIS et al., Protein Eng Des Sel, (20100000), vol. 23, pages 195 - 202 | - WRANIK et al., J Biol Chem, (20120000), vol. 287, pages 43331 - 43339 | - DAVIS et al., Protein Eng Design Sel, (20100000), vol. 23, pages 195 - 202 | - SCHAEFER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (20110000), vol. 108, pages 11187 - 11192 | - MERCHANT et al., Nat. Biotechnol., (19980000), vol. 16, pages 677 - 681 | - FENN et al., PLoS ONE, (20130000), vol. 8, page e61953 | - LEWIS, Nat. Biotechnol., (20140000), vol. 32, pages 191 - 198 | - DAS et al., Annu. Rev. Biochem., (20080000), vol. 77, pages 363 - 382 | - FLATMAN et al., J. Chromatogr. B, (20070000), vol. 848, pages 79 - 87 | - ZERVOS et al., Cell, (19930000), vol. 72, pages 223 - 232 | - NISSENSON, Am J Kidney Dis, (19920000), vol. 20, no. 1, pages 21 - 24 | - BRON et al., Semin Oncol, (20010000), vol. 28, no. 8, pages 1 - 6 | - HOCHULI et al., J. Chromatography, (19870000), vol. 411, page 177 | - JANKNECHT et al., PNAS USA, (19910000), vol. 88, page 8972 | - MADURA et al., J Biol Chem, (19930000), vol. 268, pages 12046 - 12054 | - BARTEL et al., Biotechniques, (19930000), vol. 14, pages 920 - 924 | - VIDALLEGRAIN, Nucleic Acids Res, (19990000), vol. 27, pages 919 - 29 | - VIDALLEGRAIN, Trends Biotechnol, (19990000), vol. 17, pages 374 - 81 | - JAKOBY WB et al., Methods in Enzymology, (19740000), vol. 46, page 1 | - BOGDANOVICH et al., Nature, (20020000), vol. 420, pages 418 - 421 | - PISTILLI et al., Am J Pathol, (20110000), vol. 178, pages 1287 - 1297 | - JACOBS et al., Nephrol Dial Transplant, (20000000), vol. 15, no. 4, pages 51 - 56 | - DI MATTEO et al., J Biol Regul Homeost Agents, (20080000), vol. 22, pages 211 - 216 | - GANZ, J Am Soc Nephrol, (20070000), vol. 18, pages 394 - 400 | - GROOPMAN et al., J Natl Cancer Inst, (19990000), vol. 91, pages 1616 - 1634 | - LEVIN et al., Am J Kidney Dis, (19990000), vol. 27, pages 347 - 354 | - REVICKI et al., Am J Kidney Dis, (19950000), vol. 25, pages 548 - 554 | - GAFTER et al., Kidney Int, (19940000), vol. 45, pages 224 - 231 | - RICKETTS et al., Clin Nucl Med, (19780000), vol. 3, pages 159 - 164 | - TANNO et al., Adv Hematol 2010, (20100000), page 750643 | - AIZAWA et al., Am J Hematol, (20030000), vol. 74, pages 68 - 72 | - PIPPARD et al., Lancet, (19790000), vol. 2, pages 819 - 821 | - MUSALLAM et al., Cold Spring Harb Perspect Med, (20120000), vol. 2, page a013482 | - HAIDAR et al., Bone, (20110000), vol. 48, pages 425 - 432 | - MUSALLAM et al., Blood Rev, (20120000), vol. 26, no. 1, pages S 16 - S19 | - GALANELLO et al., Orphanet J Rare Dis, (20100000), vol. 5, page 11 | - LEKAWANVIJIT et al., Can J Cardiol, (20090000), vol. 25, pages 213 - 218 | - SCHRIER, Curr Opin Hematol, (20020000), vol. 9, pages 123 - 126 | - VICHINSKY, Ann NY Acad Sci, (20050000), vol. 1054, pages 18 - 24 | - RUND et al., N Engl J Med, (20050000), vol. 353, pages 1135 - 1146 | - HERSHKO, Haematologica, (20060000), vol. 91, pages 1307 - 1312 | - CAO et al., Pediatr Rep, (20110000), vol. 3, no. 2, page e17 | - ESPOSITO et al., Blood, (20030000), vol. 102, pages 2670 - 2677 | - KALINOWSKI et al., Pharmacol Rev, (20050000), vol. 57, pages 547 - 583 | - GALANELLO et al., Ann NY Acad Sci, (20100000), vol. 1202, pages 79 - 86 | - GARDENGHI et al., J Clin Invest, (20100000), vol. 120, pages 4466 - 4477 | - SINGIBARTI, J. Clin Investig, (19940000), vol. 72, no. 6, pages S36 - S43 | - DELANTY et al., Neurology, (19970000), vol. 49, pages 686 - 689 | - BUNN, N Engl J Med, (20020000), vol. 346, no. 7, pages 522 - 523 | - FRALEY et al., Trends Biochem. Sci., (19810000), vol. 6, page 77 | - MANNINO et al., Biotechniques, (19880000), vol. 6, page 682 |