EP3281163 - DIGITAL ASSET INTERMEDIARY ELECTRONIC SETTLEMENT PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Digital Asset (Switzerland) GmbH Thurgauerstrasse 40 8050 Zurich / CH | [2021/21] |
Former [2018/40] | For all designated states Digital Asset Holdings, LLC 96 Spring Street, 8th Floor New York, NY 10012 / US | ||
Former [2018/07] | For all designated states Digital Asset Holdings 162 5th Avenue Suite 902 New York, NY 10010 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILSON, Jr. Donald R. 162 5th Avenue Suite 902 New York, NY 10010 / US | 02 /
HIRANI, Sunil 162 5th Avenue Suite 902 New York, NY 10010 / US | 03 /
SARANIECKI, W. Eric 162 5th Avenue Suite 902 New York, NY 10010 / US | 04 /
ROOZ, Yuval 162 5th Avenue Suite 902 New York, NY 10010 / US | 05 /
KFIR, Shaul 162 5th Avenue Suite 902 New York, NY 10010 / US | [2018/07] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2018/07] | Application number, filing date | 16777111.2 | 04.04.2016 | [2018/07] | WO2016US25888 | Priority number, date | US201562178315P | 05.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562178315 P | [2018/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016164310 | Date: | 13.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3281163 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3281163 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/36, G06Q20/38, G06Q20/40, G06Q20/02, H04L9/32, H04L9/00, G06Q40/06 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
G06Q20/3829 (EP,US);
G06Q20/02 (EP,US);
G06Q20/36 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3674 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3678 (EP,US);
G06Q20/38215 (US);
G06Q20/3825 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40 (EP,US);
G06Q20/401 (EP,US);
G06Q20/4016 (US);
G06Q40/06 (EP,US);
H04L63/0428 (US);
H04L67/104 (US);
H04L9/0637 (US);
H04L9/0825 (US);
H04L9/0861 (US);
H04L9/0894 (US);
H04L9/14 (US);
H04L9/30 (US);
H04L9/3239 (EP,US);
H04L9/3247 (EP,US);
H04L9/3297 (EP,US);
H04L9/50 (EP,US);
G06Q2220/00 (EP,US);
H04L2209/56 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/07] | G06Q20/06, G06Q20/38, G06Q40/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTERMEDIÄRE ELEKTRONISCHE ABWICKLUNGSPLATTFORM FÜR DIGITALE ASSETS | [2018/07] | English: | DIGITAL ASSET INTERMEDIARY ELECTRONIC SETTLEMENT PLATFORM | [2018/07] | French: | PLATEFORME DE RÈGLEMENT ÉLECTRONIQUE INTERMÉDIAIRE D'UN BIEN NUMÉRIQUE | [2018/07] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/07] | 06.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.06.2023 | 29.06.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 13.12.2023 | ES | 13.12.2023 | HR | 13.12.2023 | PL | 13.12.2023 | RO | 13.12.2023 | RS | 13.12.2023 | SK | 13.12.2023 | SM | 13.12.2023 | NO | 13.03.2024 | GR | 14.03.2024 | IS | 13.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 13.12.2023 | |
ES | 13.12.2023 | ||
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
RO | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 14.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002188621 (FLANK SHARON [US], et al); | [Y]US2013232023 (MUSE RANDALL FRANK [US]); | [A]US2014279540 (JACKSON DOUGLAS [US]); | [A]WO2014201059 (LERNER SERGIO DEMIAN [AR], et al); | [Y]WO2015024129 (MCCONAGHY TRENT LORNE [DE], et al); | [PX]US2015127940 (POLEHN DONNA L [US], et al) |