Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6594538B | Global Dossier | 23.10.2019 | B2 | JP2018530472 | 18.10.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP73711 | 05.10.2016 | US201514881573 | 13.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3362330 | Global Dossier | 08.12.2021 | B1 | EP3362330 | 22.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP73711 | 05.10.2016 | US201514881573 | 13.10.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017063921 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514881573 | 13.10.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9840239 | Global Dossier | 12.12.2017 | B2 | US2017101081 | 13.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514881573 | 13.10.2015 |