|
17.11.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2021 |
Request for change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2020 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.12.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.11.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
04.11.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
08.10.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2020 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2019 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2019 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2019 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2019 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2019 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Invitation to file authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2019 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.07.2019 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2019 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2019 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2019 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2019 |
Invitation to file authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2019 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.05.2019 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2018 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2018 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.07.2018 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2018 |
Invitation to file authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.04.2018 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
26.04.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.02.2018 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.01.2018 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
11 |
|
17.01.2018 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.01.2018 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
17.01.2018 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
17.01.2018 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
31.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
31.10.2017 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
31.10.2017 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
31.10.2017 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
31.10.2017 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2017 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.09.2017 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
04.09.2017 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
24.08.2017 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
04.08.2017 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
04.08.2017 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
04.08.2017 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
04.08.2017 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
04.08.2017 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
02.05.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
13.04.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.04.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.04.2017 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
10.10.2016 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
03.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
03.10.2016 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
03.10.2016 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
03.10.2016 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
18 |
|
03.10.2016 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
03.10.2016 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
03.10.2016 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |