Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3368452 | Global Dossier | 13.01.2021 | B1 | EP3368452 | 05.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP73572 | 03.10.2016 | AT508652015 | 08.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3368452T | 12.04.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP73572 | 03.10.2016 | AT508652015 | 08.10.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017060198 | Global Dossier | 13.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT508652015 | 08.10.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AT517783 | 15.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT508652015 | 08.10.2015 |