EP3352917 - CEMENT GRINDING MEDIA SORTER AND OPERATING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 29.01.2025 [2025/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Manvia - Manutenção e Exploração de Instalações e Construção S.A. Rua Mário Dionísio Nº2 2º Piso 2796-957 Linda-a-Velha / PT | [2018/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOMES ESTEVES, José António Rua Pedro Monjardino N° 12-3° Dt° 1600-892 Lisboa / PT | [2018/31] | Representative(s) | Patentree Edificio Net Rua de Salazares, 842 4149-002 Porto / PT | [2021/52] |
Former [2018/31] | Patentree, Lda. Edificio Net Rua de Salazares, 842 4149-002 Porto / PT | Application number, filing date | 16778117.8 | 23.09.2016 | [2018/31] | WO2016IB55710 | Priority number, date | PT20150108831 | 23.09.2015 Original published format: PT 2015108831 | [2018/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017051377 | Date: | 30.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3352917 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3352917 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B07B1/24, B07B13/04, B07B13/07, B07B13/11, B07B15/00, B07B1/22 | [2018/31] | CPC: |
B07B1/22 (EP);
B07B1/005 (EP);
B07B1/24 (EP);
B07B13/04 (EP);
B07B13/07 (EP);
B07B13/11 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZEMENTMAHLKÖRPERSORTIERER UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2018/31] | English: | CEMENT GRINDING MEDIA SORTER AND OPERATING METHOD THEREOF | [2018/31] | French: | TRIEUSE DE CORPS BROYANTS DE CIMENT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2018/31] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/31] | 28.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.09.2016 | AL | 29.12.2021 | AT | 29.12.2021 | CY | 29.12.2021 | CZ | 29.12.2021 | DK | 29.12.2021 | EE | 29.12.2021 | FI | 29.12.2021 | GR | 29.12.2021 | HR | 29.12.2021 | LT | 29.12.2021 | LV | 29.12.2021 | MC | 29.12.2021 | MK | 29.12.2021 | MT | 29.12.2021 | NL | 29.12.2021 | RO | 29.12.2021 | RS | 29.12.2021 | SI | 29.12.2021 | SK | 29.12.2021 | SM | 29.12.2021 | BG | 29.03.2022 | NO | 29.03.2022 | IS | 29.04.2022 | [2025/05] |
Former [2024/42] | HU | 23.09.2016 | |
AL | 29.12.2021 | ||
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CY | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
MK | 29.12.2021 | ||
MT | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 23.09.2016 | |
AL | 29.12.2021 | ||
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CY | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
MK | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 23.09.2016 | |
AL | 29.12.2021 | ||
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CY | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 23.09.2016 | |
AL | 29.12.2021 | ||
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 29.12.2021 | |
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/26] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 29.12.2021 | |
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 29.03.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X]CN2149256Y (JIANG JINGWEI [CN]) [X] 1,5-7,9,10,15,16,19,21,23,24 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0013] *; | [XI]DE2449875 (LAFARGE SA) [X] 1,5,6,8-10,15,16,20,23,24 * page 1, line 1 - page 6, line 13; figures 1-6 * [I] 21; | [X]JP2010216721 (NIPPON STEEL ENG CO LTD, et al) [X] 1,5,6,8-10,15,16,20,21,23,24 * paragraphs [0001] - [0023]; figure 1 * * abstract *; | [XI]CN201012355Y (XIAOHONG MA [CN]) [X] 1,6,7,9,10,15,16,19,21-24 * paragraphs [0001] - [0017]; figure 1 * * abstract * [I] 2,3; | [A]JP2008246397 (HACHINOHE CEMENT KK, et al) [A] 1-24 * paragraphs [0001] - [0050]; figures 1-4 * * abstract *; | [A]CN204338454U (ARONGQI MENGXI CEMENT CO LTD) [A] 1-24 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0026] * | by applicant | SU1200976 |