EP3359658 - POLYPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.09.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novozymes A/S Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [2018/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GJERMANSEN, Morten Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 02 /
GORI, Klaus Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 03 /
GEERTZ-HANSEN, Henrik M. Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 04 /
STRINGER, Mary Ann Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 05 /
SALOMON, Jesper Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 06 /
BLICHER, Thomas H. Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 07 /
SPODSBERG, Nikolaj Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 08 /
SUN, Tianqi China Headquarters 14 Xinxi Road Shangdi Zone Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2018/33] | Representative(s) | NZ EPO Representatives Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [2018/33] | Application number, filing date | 16779068.2 | 07.10.2016 | [2018/33] | WO2016EP74079 | Priority number, date | DK20150000615 | 07.10.2015 Original published format: DK 201500615 | DK20150000617 | 07.10.2015 Original published format: DK 201500617 | DK20150000618 | 07.10.2015 Original published format: DK 201500618 | [2018/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2017060475 | Date: | 13.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3359658 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/22, C12N5/10, C11D3/386, C11D3/48 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
C12N9/22 (EP,CN,US);
C11D3/2065 (CN,US);
C11D3/22 (CN,US);
C11D3/3707 (CN,US);
C11D3/38627 (CN,US);
C11D3/38636 (EP,CN,US);
C11D3/38681 (EP,CN,US);
C12Y301/21 (EP,CN,US);
C12Y301/21001 (EP,CN,US);
C11D2111/12 (CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/33] | Title | German: | POLYPEPTIDE | [2018/33] | English: | POLYPEPTIDES | [2018/33] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES | [2018/33] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/33] | 27.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M06) [2019/42] | 12.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP2617824 (INDEPENDENT ADMINISTRATIVE INSTITUTION JAPAN AGENCY FOR MARINE EARTH SCI & TECH [JP]); | [A]WO2014087011 (NOVOZYMES AS [DK]); | [XPI]WO2015181286 (NOVOZYMES AS [DK]); |