EP3283344 - SYSTEM FOR LANE SELECTION BY AN AUTOMATED VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aptiv Technologies Limited Erin Court Bishop's Court Hill St. Michael / BB | [2018/51] |
Former [2018/08] | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052, M/C: 483-400-402 Troy, MI 48007-5052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIESKAMP, Jonathan, L. 783 Cornell Drive Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | 02 /
LAUR, Michael, H. 21991 Grass Valley Mission Viejo, CA 92692 / US | [2018/08] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2018/08] | Robert, Vincent, et al Delphi France SAS Bâtiment Le Raspail - Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 16780414.5 | 25.02.2016 | [2018/08] | WO2016US19560 | Priority number, date | US201514685958 | 14.04.2015 Original published format: US201514685958 | [2018/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016167883 | Date: | 20.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3283344 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/12, B60W10/20, B60W40/08 | [2018/08] | CPC: |
B62D15/0255 (EP,US);
G08G1/01 (US);
B62D15/025 (EP,US);
G01C21/26 (US);
G06V20/588 (EP,US);
G06V20/593 (EP,US);
G08G1/09626 (EP,US);
G08G1/096716 (EP,US);
G08G1/09675 (EP,US);
G08G1/096775 (EP,US);
G08G1/096783 (EP,US);
G08G1/167 (EP,US);
H04N23/80 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/08] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR FAHRSPURAUSWAHL DURCH EIN AUTOMATISCHES FAHRZEUG | [2018/08] | English: | SYSTEM FOR LANE SELECTION BY AN AUTOMATED VEHICLE | [2018/08] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SÉLECTION DE VOIE PAR UN VÉHICULE AUTOMATISÉ | [2018/08] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/08] | 12.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/07] | 11.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6295503 (INOUE HIROKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2010169007 (KAUSHIK SHASHIKUMAR [US], et al); | [XY]WO2012166475 (HARMAN INT IND [US], et al) | International search | [Y]KR20100067988 (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20110101990 (ARGUS INC [KR]); | [A]US2013184926 (SPERO DORIAN JACK [US], et al); | [A]US2014129084 (LEE JEONG HEE [KR]); | [YA]KR101509995B |