EP3283847 - EXTERNAL LOAD MANAGEMENT FUNCTIONS FOR VERTICAL TAKE-OFF AND LANDING AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2021 [2021/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation 6900 Main Street P.O. Box 9729 Stratford, CT 06615 / US | [2018/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LESPERANCE, Jesse J. 102 Gentle River Road Harvest, Alabama 35749 / US | 02 /
ZYGMANT, Thomas 55 Juniper Lane Southport, Connecticut 06890 / US | [2018/08] | Representative(s) | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Pelkovenstraße 143 80992 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/08] | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16780455.8 | 01.04.2016 | [2018/08] | WO2016US25549 | Priority number, date | US201562148799P | 17.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562148799 P | [2018/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016167988 | Date: | 20.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3283847 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01C23/00, G06F17/00, G06F19/00, B64C39/02, B64C27/04, B64C29/00, B64D1/02, B64D1/22, // B64D47/08 | [2018/44] | CPC: |
B64D1/22 (EP,US);
B64C27/04 (EP,US);
B64C29/00 (EP,US);
B64D1/02 (EP,US);
G05D1/0858 (EP,US);
B64U10/17 (EP,US);
B64U2101/30 (US);
B64U2101/64 (EP,US);
B64U2201/10 (EP,US);
B64U2201/20 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/08] | G01C23/00, G06F17/00, G06F19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/08] | Title | German: | AUSSENLASTVERWALTUNGSFUNKTIONEN FÜR EIN SENKRECHT STARTENDES UND LANDENDES FLUGZEUG | [2018/08] | English: | EXTERNAL LOAD MANAGEMENT FUNCTIONS FOR VERTICAL TAKE-OFF AND LANDING AIRCRAFT | [2018/08] | French: | FONCTIONS DE GESTION DE CHARGE EXTERNE POUR AÉRONEF À DÉCOLLAGE ET ATTERRISSAGE VERTICAUX | [2018/08] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/08] | 14.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/02] | 08.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007200032 (EADIE WILLIAM J [US], et al); | [A]US2008071431 (DOCKTER GREGORY E [US], et al); | [X]US2010222993 (BRAINARD STEVEN J [US], et al); | [A]US2013054054 (TOLLENAERE DONALD JOHN [US], et al); | [X]US2013240673 (SCHLOSSER KEVIN [US], et al); | [XA]US2013248648 (LESPERANCE JESSE J [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US2007200032 (EADIE WILLIAM J [US], et al); | [Y]US2008071431 (DOCKTER GREGORY E [US], et al); | [Y]US2010222993 (BRAINARD STEVEN J [US], et al); | [Y]US2013240673 (SCHLOSSER KEVIN [US], et al) |