EP3283034 - DOCKING SYSTEMS FOR MEDICAL DEVICES AND RELATED DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Skytron, LLC 5085 Corporate Exchange Blvd SE Grand Rapids, MI 49512 / US | [2018/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLANKENSHIP, Samuel A. 1340 Oakwood Drive Anoka, Minnesota 55303 / US | 02 /
BLANKENSHIP, Peter B. 1340 Oakwood Drive Anoka, Minnesota 55303 / US | 03 /
BAUMHARDT, Richard 3925 190th Avenue Breckenridge, Minnesota 56520 / US | [2018/08] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/08] | Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 16780739.5 | 14.04.2016 | [2018/08] | WO2016US27519 | Priority number, date | US201562148398P | 16.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562148398 P | US201562207106P | 19.08.2015 Original published format: US 201562207106 P | US201562210724P | 27.08.2015 Original published format: US 201562210724 P | [2018/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016168453 | Date: | 20.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3283034 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61G5/10, A61M5/14, A61G7/05, B62B11/00 | [2018/08] | CPC: |
A61G7/0503 (EP,US);
A61G5/10 (US);
A61G5/1094 (EP,US);
A61M5/1413 (EP,US);
A61M5/1414 (EP,US);
A61M5/1415 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/08] | Title | German: | ANDOCKSYSTEME FÜR MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2018/08] | English: | DOCKING SYSTEMS FOR MEDICAL DEVICES AND RELATED DEVICES | [2018/08] | French: | SYSTÈMES D'ACCUEIL POUR DISPOSITIFS MÉDICAUX ET DISPOSITIFS ASSOCIÉS | [2018/08] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/08] | 13.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/47] | 26.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004082554 (HILL ROM SERVICES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2013181100 (BLANKENSHIP PETER B [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [E]DE102015009336 (TRAGFREUND GMBH [DE]) [E] 1-12* the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2004075228 (DUFFEY CHARLES T [US]) [Y] 14, 22-23, 29 * See paragraphs [0012]-[0013] and figure 1. *; | [A]US2004256833 (CERVENKA DEAN A [US]) [A] 1-50* See paragraphs [0038]-[0054] and figures 1-3. *; | [Y]US7188855 (THOMAS E TREVOR [US]) [Y] 11-13 * See column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 23 and figures 2-3. *; | [XYA]US2013181100 (BLANKENSHIP PETER B [US], et al) [X] 31, 33, 36, 42, 50 * See abstract, paragraphs [0003],[0018], [0020], [0028], [0047], and figures 1-2, 5A-5B. * [Y] 11-14, 22-23, 29 [A] 1-10, 15-21, 24-28 ,30, 32, 34-35, 37-41 , 43-49; | [Y]US8955855 (HERLITZ TODD [US], et al) [Y] 22, 29 * See column 1, lines 15-20, column 3, lines 16-42, and figure 2. * |