EP3284242 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CORRELATING ROUTING PROTOCOL INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Level 3 Communications, LLC 1025 Eldorado Boulevard Broomfield, CO 80021 / US | [2018/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASLAK, Joel C. 1025 Eldorado Boulevard Broomfield, Colorado 80021 / US | [2018/08] | Representative(s) | Ford, Esther Mary Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/08] | Ford, Esther Mary Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | Application number, filing date | 16780746.0 | 14.04.2016 | [2018/08] | WO2016US27539 | Priority number, date | US201562147884P | 15.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562147884 P | [2018/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016168465 | Date: | 20.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3284242 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/701, H04L29/12, H04L29/08 | [2018/47] | CPC: |
H04L61/4511 (EP,US);
H04L61/5007 (US);
H04L45/74 (US);
H04L45/741 (EP,US);
H04L67/1001 (EP,US);
H04L2101/659 (EP,US);
H04L61/58 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/08] | H04L29/06, H04L12/701 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/08] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KORRELATION VON ROUTING-PROTOKOLL-INFORMATIONEN | [2018/08] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CORRELATING ROUTING PROTOCOL INFORMATION | [2018/08] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR METTRE EN CORRÉLATION DES INFORMATIONS DE PROTOCOLE DE ROUTAGE | [2018/08] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 02.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/08] | 02.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/48] | 01.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2013346202 (KOULADJIE KAMBIZ [US], et al) [I] 1,9 * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0077] *; | [A]US2014149601 (CARNEY ROGER [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0046] *; | [X] - ARTHUR BERGER ET AL, "Internet nameserver IPv4 and IPv6 address relationships", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2013 CONFERENCE ON INTERNET MEASUREMENT CONFERENCE, IMC '13, New York, New York, USA, (20130101), doi:10.1145/2504730.2504745, ISBN 978-1-4503-1953-9, pages 91 - 104, XP055516071 [X] 1-15 * Chapters 1 and 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2504730.2504745 | International search | [XY]US2008177868 (ZILBERSHTEIN ITAI EPHRAIM [IL], et al) [X] 1, 4-10, 12, 15-20 * , Abstract, Figures 1-3, Paragraphs [0033], [0035], [0037], [0039], [0040]. [0047], [0052], [0055], [0056], [0064], [0067], [0072], [0074], Claims 1, 17. * [Y] 2, 3, 11-13, 14; | [A]US2010118869 (LI QING [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document. *; | [A]US2011283018 (LEVINE MATTHEW S [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document. *; | [A]US2011289185 (HEDER BRIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-20* , entire document. *; | [Y]US2014344400 (VARNEY LEWIS ROBERT [US], et al) [Y] 11 * , Abstract, Paragraph [0815]. *; | [Y]US9009353 (DONLEY CHRIS [US], et al) [Y] 2, 3, 13, 14 * , Column 5, Lines 2-23, Column 6, Lines 2-7, Claim 2. * |