EP3384264 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A DEVICE FOR DETECTING AT LEAST ONE PROPERTY OF A FLUID MEDIUM IN A MEASURING CHAMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2018/41] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOLF, Ronny Bornstrasse 19 99817 Eisenach / DE | 02 /
LUX, Alexander Oberhofer Strasse 42 99897 Tambach-Dietharz / DE | 03 /
REINHARD, Markus Georg-Friedrich-Haendel-Str. 3 70806 Kornwestheim / DE | 04 /
BARNSTORFF, Vincent Theaterplatz 3a 99817 Eisenach / DE | 05 /
OTTO, Andreas Rosenweg 25 99819 Hoerselberg-Hainich / DE | 06 /
ROEHLER, Andreas Bornstrasse 7 99817 Eisenach / DE | 07 /
VOLLERT, Jens Am Riethberge 4 99974 Muehlhausen / DE | 08 /
PATZNER, Patrik Hohensteiner Weg 3 71229 Leonberg / DE | [2018/41] | Application number, filing date | 16782067.9 | 17.10.2016 | [2018/41] | WO2016EP74896 | Priority number, date | DE201510223850 | 01.12.2015 Original published format: DE102015223850 | [2018/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017092921 | Date: | 08.06.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3384264 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3384264 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01L19/14 | [2018/41] | CPC: |
G01L19/143 (EP,KR,US);
G01L19/0061 (US);
G01L19/146 (EP,KR,US);
G01L19/148 (US);
G01L19/0627 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERFASSUNG MINDESTENS EINER EIGENSCHAFT EINES FLUIDEN MEDIUMS IN EINEM MESSRAUM | [2018/41] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A DEVICE FOR DETECTING AT LEAST ONE PROPERTY OF A FLUID MEDIUM IN A MEASURING CHAMBER | [2018/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION D'AU MOINS UNE CARACTÉRISTIQUE D'UN MILIEU FLUIDE DANS UNE CHAMBRE DE MESURE | [2018/41] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/41] | 18.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 26.07.2023 | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | IT | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | MC | 26.07.2023 | NL | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SE | 26.07.2023 | SI | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | LU | 17.10.2023 | GB | 26.10.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
LU | 17.10.2023 | ||
GB | 26.10.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
LU | 17.10.2023 | ||
GB | 26.10.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
LU | 17.10.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 26.07.2023 | |
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 26.07.2023 | |
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 26.07.2023 | |
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 26.07.2023 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE19731420 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [AD] 1-11* the whole document *; | [XAI]DE102007033040 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,4,6-8,11 * page 4, paragraphs [0042]-[0045] * * page 5, paragraphs [0051]-[0052] * * page 6, paragraphs [0053]-[0056] * * page 9, paragraph [0091] * * figures 1, 15A, 15B * [A] 5 [I] 2,3,9,10; | [XI]EP2136193 (ELTEK SPA [IT]) [X] 1,4,5,9,11 * page 1, paragraph [0001] * * page 3, paragraph [0014] * * page 6, paragraph [0038] * * page 7, paragraph [0050] - page 8, paragraph [0054] * * page 11, paragraphs [0075], [0080] * * figures 1-20 * [I] 2,3,6-8,10; | [XI]US2014341255 (KAISER RALF [DE], et al) [X] 1,5,6,9-11 * abstract * * figures 1-2 * * page 2, paragraphs [0021]-[0022] * * page 3, paragraphs [0023]-[0031] * [I] 2-4,7,8 | by applicant | DE19731420 | DE10223357 | DE102012223014 | - Konrad Reif: Sensoren im Kraftfahrzeug, (2010), pages 134 - 135 |