EP3387758 - METHOD AND COMMUNICATION DEVICE FOR DETERMINING BEAM FOR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2018/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ATHLEY, Fredrik Banvallen 65A SE-429 30 Kullavik / SE | 02 /
NILSSON, Andreas Seminariegatan 16 SE-41313 Göteborg / SE | 03 /
PETERSSON, Sven Rotevägen 1 SE-433 69 Sävedalen / SE | [2018/42] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/42] | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 16782072.9 | 18.10.2016 | [2018/42] | WO2016EP74928 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018072814 | Date: | 26.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3387758 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/08 | [2018/42] | CPC: |
H04B7/0814 (EP,US);
H04B7/088 (US);
H04B17/318 (US);
H04B7/0617 (US);
H04W72/046 (US);
H04W72/542 (US);
H04W88/06 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES STRAHLS ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2018/42] | English: | METHOD AND COMMUNICATION DEVICE FOR DETERMINING BEAM FOR USE | [2018/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION POUR DÉTERMINER UN FAISCEAU À UTILISER | [2018/42] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/42] | 09.07.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/39] | 25.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6167286 (WARD CHRISTOPHER ROBERT [GB], et al); | [Y]US2006223477 (NAKAGAWA KIYOTAKA [JP]); | [IY]WO2009012377 (VIASAT INC [US], et al) |