EP3359188 - STREPTOCOCCUS SUIS POLYSACCHARIDE-PROTEIN CONJUGATE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim Animal Health USA Inc. 3239 Satellite Blvd Duluth, GA 30096 / US | For all designated states UNIVERSITE DE MONTREAL 2900, Boulevard Edouard-Monpetit Montreal, Quebec H3T 1J4 / CA | For all designated states Université Du Québec À Montréal 130 Saint-Denis Street P.O. Box 8888 Station Centre-Ville Montréal, Québec H3C 3P8 / CA | [2019/19] |
Former [2018/33] | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim Vetmedica, Inc. 2621 North Belt Highway St. Joseph, MO 64506 / US | ||
For all designated states UNIVERSITE DE MONTREAL 2900, Boulevard Edouard-Monpetit Montreal, Quebec H3T 1J4 / CA | |||
For all designated states Université Du Québec À Montréal 130 Saint-Denis Street P.O. Box 8888 Station Centre-Ville Montréal, Québec H3C 3P8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOTTSCHALK, Marcelo Université de Montréal 3200 Rue Sicotte Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec J2S 2M2 / CA | 02 /
GOYETTE-DESJARDINS, Guillaume Université de Montréal 3200 Rue Sicotte Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec J2S 2M2 / CA | 03 /
KEMPKER, Jennifer Anne 802 SW Savannah Drive Lee's Summit, Missouri 64081 / US | 04 /
NEUBAUER, Axel c/o VP IP Legal Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corp., 900 Ridgebury Rd., P.O. Box 368 Ridgefield, Connecticut 06877-0368 / US | 05 /
ROY, René Université du Québec à Montréal 1430 Saint-Denis P.O. Box 8888 Station Centre-Ville Montréal, Québec H3C 3P8 / CA | 06 /
SEGURA, Mariela Université de Montréal 3200 Rue Sicotte Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec J2S 2M2 / CA | 07 /
SHIAO, Tze Chieh Université du Québec à Montréal 1430 Saint-Denis P.O. Box 8888 Station Centre-Ville Montréal, Québec H3C 3P8 / CA | [2018/33] | Representative(s) | Simon, Elke Anna Maria, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2018/33] | Application number, filing date | 16782376.4 | 06.10.2016 | [2018/33] | WO2016US55658 | Priority number, date | US201562238516P | 07.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562238516 P | [2018/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017062558 | Date: | 13.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3359188 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/09 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
A61K39/092 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55544 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55566 (EP,US);
A61K2039/575 (EP,US);
A61K2039/70 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/33] | Title | German: | STREPTOCOCCUS-SUIS-POLYSACCHARID-PROTEIN-KONJUGATZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2018/33] | English: | STREPTOCOCCUS SUIS POLYSACCHARIDE-PROTEIN CONJUGATE COMPOSITION | [2018/33] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CONJUGUÉS POLYSACCHARIDE STREPTOCOCCUS SUIS-PROTÉINE | [2018/33] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/33] | 07.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/40] | 02.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2012035519 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-20 * the whole document * * in particular, the claims and the examples *; | [IP]WO2016134485 (VAXALTA INC [CA]) [IP] 1-20 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0168] * * paragraph [0170] *; | [Y] - CALZAS CYNTHIA ET AL, "Group B Streptococcus and Streptococcus suis Capsular Polysaccharides Induce Chemokine Production by Dendritic Cells via Toll-Like Receptor 2-and MyD88-Dependent and -Independent Pathways", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (201309), vol. 81, no. 9, pages 3106 - 3118, XP002765279 [Y] 1-20 * abstract * * page 3112, column r, paragraphs 1, 2 * | [XP] - GOYETTE-DESJARDINS GUILLAUME ET AL, "Protection against Streptococcus suis Serotype 2 Infection Using a Capsular Polysaccharide Glycoconjugate Vaccine", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (201607), vol. 84, no. 7, ISSN 0019-9567, pages 2059 - 2075, XP002765280 [XP] 1-20 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2909462 | US7709001 | - GOTTSCHALK, Diseases of swine, (2012), pages 841 - 55 | - FIELD ET AL., VET REC., (1954), vol. 66, pages 453 - 5 | - JANSEN; DORSSEN, TIJDSCHR DIERGENEESKD., (1951), vol. 76, pages 815 - 32 | - DE MOOR CE., ANTONIE VAN LEEUWENHOEK, (1963), vol. 29, pages 272 - 80 | - ELLIOTT SD., J HYG (LOND)., (1966), vol. 64, pages 205 - 12 | - WINDSOR; ELLIOTT, J HYG (LOND, (1975), vol. 75, pages 69 - 78 | - GOYETTE-DESJARDINS ET AL., EMERG MICROBES. INFECT, (2014), vol. 3, page E45 | - HIGGINS; GOTTSCHALK, DISEASES OF SWINE, (2006), pages 769 - 83 | - SANFORD; TILKER, J AM VET MED ASSOC., (1982), vol. 181, pages 673 - 6 | - CLOUTIER, VET MICROBIOL., (2003), vol. 97, pages 135 - 51 | - SEGURA M., CAN J MICROBIOL, (2012), vol. 58, pages 249 - 60 | - GOTTSCHALK, DISEASES OF SWINE, (2012), pages 841 - 55 | - LAPOINTE ET AL., CAN J VET RES., (2002), vol. 66, pages 8 - 14 | - BAUMS ET AL., CLIN VACCINE IMMUNOL., (2010), vol. 17, pages 1589 - 97 | - WISSELINK HJ ET AL., VET MICROBIOL., (2002), vol. 84, pages 155 - 68 | - BUSQUE ET AL., CAN J VET RES., (1997), pages 275 - 9 | - FITTIPALDI ET AL., VACCINE, (2007), vol. 25, pages 3524 - 35 | - FITTIPALDI ET AL., FUTURE MICROBIOL., (2012), vol. 7, pages 259 - 79 | - CALZAS ET AL., INFECT IMMUN., (2015), vol. 83, pages 441 - 53 | - CHARLAND ET AL., MICROBIOLOGY, (1997), vol. 143, pages 3607 - 14 | - ROY; SHIAO, CHIMIA, (2011), vol. 65, pages 24 - 9 | - HEATH PT, EXPERT REV VACCINES, (2011), vol. 10, pages 685 - 94 | - BAKER ET AL., N ENGL J MED., (1988), vol. 319, pages 1180 - 5 | - KASPER ET AL., J CLIN INVEST., (1996), vol. 98, pages 2308 - 14 | - MOENS ET AL., INFECT IMMUN., (2009), vol. 77, pages 1976 - 80 | - SCHIITZ ET AL., J CLIN IMMUNOL., (2013), vol. 33, pages 288 - 96 | - BAUMS ET AL., CLIN VACCINE IMMUNOL, (2009), vol. 16, pages 200 - 8 | - SAMBROOK; FRITSCH; MANIATIS, Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, (1989), vol. I, II, I | - DNA Cloning, (1985), vol. I, II | - Methods In Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC. | - Protein purification methods - a practical approach, IRL PRESS AT OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS | - Handbook of Experimental Immunology, SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, (1986), vol. I-IV | - "Carbohydrate-based vaccines", R. ROY, ACS Symposium Series, (2008), page 989 | - "Carbohydrate-based vaccines", R. ROY, ACS Symp. Ser, (2008), vol. 989 | - HUNTER ET AL., The Theory and Practical Application of Adjuvants, JOHNWILEY AND SONS, (1995), pages 51 - 94 | - TODD ET AL., VACCINE, (1997), vol. 15, pages 564 - 570 | - Vaccine Design, The Subunit and Adjuvant Approach, PLENUM PRESS, (1995), page 147 | - PHAMEUROPA, (199606), vol. 8, no. 2 | - VAN CALSTEREN ET AL., BIOCHEM CELL BIOL., (2010), vol. 88, pages 513 - 25 | - SEGURA ET AL., INFECT IMMUN., (1999), vol. 67, pages 4646 - 54 | - CALZAS ET AL., INFECT IMMUN., (2013), vol. 81, pages 3106 - 18 | - HIGGINS; GOTTSCHALK, J VET DIAGN INVEST., (1990), vol. 2, pages 249 - 52 | - GOYETTE-DESJARDINS ET AL., METHODS MOL BIOL., (2015), vol. 1331, pages 81 - 92 | - BYRD; KADIS, INFECT IMMUN., (1992), vol. 60, pages 3042 - 51 | - CALZAS ET AL., INFECT IMMUN, (2013), vol. 81, pages 3106 - 18 | - SZU ET AL., CARBOHYDR RES., (1986), vol. 152, pages 7 - 20 | - DUAN; KASPER, GLYCOBIOLOGY, (2011), vol. 21, pages 401 - 9 | - HIGASHI ET AL., CARBOHYDR POLYM, (2011), vol. 86, pages 1365 - 70 | - ANDERSON P., INFECT IMMUN, (1983), vol. 39, pages 233 - 8 | - SVENSON ET AL., FEMS MICROBIOL LETT, (1977), vol. 1, pages 145 - 7 | - SVENSON ET AL., J IMMUNOL METHODS, (1979), vol. 25, pages 323 - 35 | - WESSELS ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI, (1987), vol. 84, pages 9170 - 4 | - PAOLETTI ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1990), vol. 265, pages 18278 - 83 | - PAWLOWSKI; SVENSON, FEMS MICROBIOL LETT, (1999), vol. 174, pages 255 - 63 | - VAN CALSTEREN ET AL., BIOCHEM CELL BIOL, (2013), vol. 91, pages 49 - 58 | - REUTER ET AL., GLYCOCONJ J, (1989), vol. 6, pages 35 - 44 | - HOUDE ET AL., INFECT IMMUN., (2012), vol. 80, pages 506 - 17 | - WESSELS ET AL., J CLIN INVEST, (1990), vol. 86, pages 1428 - 33 | - O'HAGAN; VALIANTE, NAT REV DRUG DISCOV., (2003), vol. 2, pages 727 - 35 | - CHU ET AL., INFECT IMMUN., (2000), vol. 68, pages 1450 - 6 | - FATTOM ET AL., VACCINE, (1995), vol. 13, pages 1288 - 93 | - BODE ET AL., EXPERT REV VACCINES, (2011), vol. 10, pages 499 - 511 | - CHU ET AL., J EXP MED., (1997), vol. 186, pages 1623 - 31 | - KOVARIK ET AL., IMMUNOLOGY, (2001), vol. 102, pages 67 - 76 | - STILLS HF., ILAR JOURNAL, (2005), vol. 46, pages 280 - 93 | - LEENAARS ET AL., VET IMMUNOL IMMUNOPATHOL., (1994), vol. 40, pages 225 - 41 | - BENNETT ET AL., J IMMUNOL METHODS, (1992), vol. 153, pages 31 - 40 | - SOMMARIVA ET AL., J TRANSL MED., (2013), vol. 11, page 25 | - JENNINGS, ILAR JOURNAL, (1995), vol. 37, pages 119 - 25 | - KATEREGGA ET AL., BMC VET RES., (2012), vol. 8, page 63 | - PLOTKIN SA., CLIN VACCINE IMMUNOL., (2010), vol. 17, pages 1055 - 65 | - SONG JY ET AL., J INFECT CHEMOTHER., (2013), vol. 19, pages 412 - 25 | - ROMERO-STEINER ET AL., CLIN VACCINE IMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 13, pages 165 - 9 | - GUILLIAMS ET AL., NAT REV IMMUNOL., (2014), vol. 14, pages 94 - 108 | - UNDERHILL; OZINSKY, ANNU REV IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 20, pages 825 - 52 | - RICKLIN ET AL., NAT IMMUNOL., (2010), vol. 11, pages 785 - 97 | - LEE ET AL., CRIT REV MICROBIOL., (2003), vol. 29, pages 333 - 49 | - PERLMUTTER ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (1978), vol. 121, pages 566 - 72 | - RUBINSTEIN; STEIN, J IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 141, pages 4352 - 6 | - SCHREIBER ET AL., J INFECT DIS., (1993), vol. 167, pages 221 - 6 | - MICHAELSEN ET AL., SCAND J IMMUNOL., (2004), vol. 59, pages 34 - 9 | - MCLAY ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 168, pages 3437 - 43 | - WISSELINK ET AL., VET MICROBIOL., (2002), vol. 84, pages 155 - 68 | - SWILDENS ET AL., VET REC., (2007), vol. 160, pages 619 - 21 | - GALINA ET AL., CAN J VET RES., (1996), vol. 60, pages 72 - 4 | - GOTTSCHALK ET AL., CAN J VET RES., (1998), vol. 62, pages 75 - 9 | - OKWUMABUA ET AL., FEMS MICROBIOL LETT., (1999), vol. 181, pages 113 - 21 | - FITTIPALDI ET AL., EMERG INFECT DIS., (2011), vol. 17, pages 2239 - 44 | - LI Y ET AL., INFECT IMMUN., (2006), vol. 74, pages 305 - 12 | - "Streptococcosis", GOTTSCHALK M., Diseases of swine, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING, (2012), pages 841 - 55 | - FIELD HI; BUNTAIN D; DONE JT., "Studies on piglet mortality. I. Streptococcal meningitis and arthritis", VET REC, (1954), vol. 66, pages 453 - 5 | - JANSEN EJ; DORSSEN CA., "Meningo-encephalitis in pigs caused by Streptococci", TIJDSCHR DIERGENEESKD, (1951), vol. 76, pages 815 - 32 | - DE MOOR CE., "Septicaemic infections in pigs, caused by haemolytic Streptococci of new Lancefield groups designated R, S and T.", ANTONIE VAN LEEUWENHOEK, (1963), vol. 29, pages 272 - 80 | - ELLIOTT SD., "Streptococcal infection in young pigs. I. An immunochemical study of the causative agent (PM Streptococcus", J HYG (LOND, (1966), vol. 64, pages 205 - 12 | - WINDSOR RS; ELLIOTT SD., "Streptococcal infection in young pigs. IV. An outbreak of streptococcal meningitis in weaned pigs", J HYG (LOND, (1975), vol. 75, pages 69 - 78 | - GOYETTE-DESJARDINS G; AUGER JP; XU J; SEGURA M; GOTTSCHALK M., "Streptococcus suis, an important pig pathogen and emerging zoonotic agent-an update on the worldwide distribution based on serotyping and sequence typing", EMERG MICROBES INFECT, (2014), vol. 3, page E45 | - "Streptococcal diseases", HIGGINS R; GOTTSCHALK M., Diseases of swine, BLACKWELL PUBLISHING, (2006), pages 769 - 83 | - SANFORD SE; TILKER ME., "Streptococcus suis type II-associated diseases in swine: observations of a one-year study", J AM VET MED ASSOC, (1982), vol. 181, pages 673 - 6 | - CLOUTIER G; D'ALLAIRE S; MARTINEZ G; SURPRENANT C; LACOUTURE S; GOTTSCHALK M., "Epidemiology of Streptococcus suis serotype 5 infection in a pig herd with and without clinical disease", VET MICROBIOL, (2003), vol. 97, pages 135 - 51 | - SEGURA M., "Fisher scientific award lecture - The capsular polysaccharides of Group B Streptococcus and Streptococcus suis differently modulate bacterial interactions with dendritic cells", CAN J MICROBIOL, (2012), vol. 58, pages 249 - 60 | - LAPOINTE L; D'ALLAIRE S; LEBRUN A; LACOUTURE S; GOTTSCHALK M., "Antibody response to an autogenous vaccine and serologic profile for Streptococcus suis capsular type 1/2", CAN J VET RES, (2002), vol. 66, pages 8 - 14 | - BAUMS CG; BRIIGGEMANN C; KOCK C; BEINEKE A; WALDMANN K-H; VALENTIN-WEIGAND P., "Immunogenicity of an autogenous Streptococcus suis bacterin in preparturient sows and their piglets in relation to protection after weaning", CLIN VACCINE IMMUNOL, (2010), vol. 17, pages 1589 - 97 | - WISSELINK HJ; STOCKHOFE-ZURWIEDEN N; HILGERS LAT; SMITH HE., "Assessment of protective efficacy of live and killed vaccines based on a non-encapsulated mutant of Streptococcus suis serotype 2", VET MICROBIOL, (2002), vol. 84, pages 155 - 68 | - BUSQUE P; HIGGINS R; CAYA F; QUESSY S., "Immunization of pigs against Streptococcus suis serotype 2 infection using a live avirulent strain", CAN J VET RES, (1997), vol. 61, pages 275 - 9 | - FITTIPALDI N; HAREL J; D'AMOURS B; LACOUTURE S; KOBISCH M; GOTTSCHALK M., "Potential use of an unencapsulated and aromatic amino acid-auxotrophic Streptococcus suis mutant as a live attenuated vaccine in swine", VACCINE, (2007), vol. 25, doi:doi:10.1016/j.vaccine.2007.01.084, pages 3524 - 35, XP022032559 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2007.01.084 | - FITTIPALDI N; SEGURA M; GRENIER D; GOTTSCHALK M., "Virulence factors involved in the pathogenesis of the infection caused by the swine pathogen and zoonotic agent Streptococcus suis", FUTURE MICROBIOL, (2012), vol. 7, pages 259 - 79 | - CALZAS C; LEMIRE P; AURAY G; GERDTS V; GOTTSCHALK M; SEGURA M, "Antibody response specific to the capsular polysaccharide is impaired in Streptococcus suis serotype 2-infected animals", INFECT IMMUN, (2015), vol. 83, pages 441 - 53 | - SONG JY; MOSELEY MA; BURTON RL; NAHM MH., "Pneumococcal vaccine and opsonic pneumococcal antibody", J INFECT CHEMOTHER, (2013), vol. 19, pages 412 - 25 | - HEATH PT., "An update on vaccination against Group B Streptococcus", EXPERT REV VACCINES, (2011), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.1586/erv.11.61, pages 685 - 94, XP009192824 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1586/erv.11.61 | - BOTTOMLEY MJ; SERRUTO D; SAFADI MAP; KLUGMAN KP, "Future challenges in the elimination of bacterial meningitis", VACCINE, (2012), vol. 30, pages B78 - B86 | - ROY R; SHIAO TC., "Organic chemistry and immunochemical strategies in the design of potent carbohydrate-based vaccines", CHIMIA, (2011), vol. 65, pages 24 - 9 | - ELLIOTT SD; CLIFTON-HADLEY F; TAI J., "Streptococcal infection in young pigs. V. An immunogenic polysaccharide from Streptococcus suis type 2 with particular reference to vaccination against streptococcal meningitis in pigs", J HYG (LOND, (1980), vol. 85, pages 275 - 85, XP000857913 | - CHARLAND N; JACQUES M; LACOUTURE S; GOTTSCHALK M., "Characterization and protective activity of a monoclonal antibody against a capsular epitope shared by Streptococcus suis serotypes 1, 2 and 1/2", MICROBIOLOGY, (1997), vol. 143, pages 3607 - 14 | - KNUF M; KOWALZIK F; KIENINGER D., "Comparative effects of carrier proteins on vaccine-induced immune response", VACCINE, (2011), vol. 29, doi:doi:10.1016/j.vaccine.2011.04.053, pages 4881 - 90, XP028379356 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2011.04.053 | - BYRD W; KADIS S., "Preparation, characterization, and immunogenicity of conjugate vaccines directed against Actinobacillus pleuropneumoniae virulence determinants", INFECT IMMUN, (1992), vol. 60, pages 3042 - 51 | - BYRD W; HARMON BG; KADIS S., "Protective efficacy of conjugate vaccines against experimental challenge with porcine Actinobacillus pleuropneumoniae", VET IMMUNOL IMMUNOPATHOL, (1992), vol. 34, doi:doi:10.1016/0165-2427(92)90172-M, pages 307 - 24, XP023795768 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-2427(92)90172-M | - ANDRESEN LO; JACOBSEN MJ; NIELSEN JP., "Experimental vaccination of pigs with an Actinobacillus pleuropneumoniae serotype 5b capsular polysaccharide-tetanus toxoid conjugate", ACTA VET SCAND, (1997), vol. 38, pages 283 - 93 | - VAN CALSTEREN MR; GAGNON F; LACOUTURE S; FITTIPALDI N; GOTTSCHALK M., "Structure determination of Streptococcus suis serotype 2 capsular polysaccharide", BIOCHEM CELL BIOL, (2010), vol. 88, pages 513 - 25 | - SEGURA M; STANKOVA J; GOTTSCHALK M., "Heat-killed Streptococcus suis capsular type 2 strains stimulate tumor necrosis factor alpha and interleukin-6 production by murine macrophages", INFECT IMMUN, (1999), vol. 67, pages 4646 - 54 | - CALZAS C; GOYETTE-DESJARDINS G; LEMIRE P; GAGNON F; LACHANCE C; VAN CALSTEREN MR ET AL., "Group B Streptococcus and Streptococcus suis capsular polysaccharides induce chemokine production by dendritic cells via Toll-like receptor 2- and MyD88-dependent and -independent pathways", INFECT IMMUN, (2013), vol. 81, pages 3106 - 18, XP002765279 | - VAN CALSTEREN MR; GAGNON F; CALZAS C; GOYETTE-DESJARDINS G; OKURA M; TAKAMATSU D ET AL., "Structure determination of Streptococcus suis serotype 14 capsular polysaccharide", BIOCHEM CELL BIOL, (2013), vol. 91, pages 49 - 58 | - HOUDE M; GOTTSCHALK M; GAGNON F; VAN CALSTEREN M-R; SEGURA M., "Streptococcus suis Capsular Polysaccharide Inhibits Phagocytosis through Destabilization of Lipid Microdomains and Prevents Lactosylceramide-Dependent Recognition", INFECT IMMUN, (2012), vol. 80, pages 506 - 17 | - HIGGINS R; GOTTSCHALK M., "An update on Streptococcus suis identification", J VET DIAGN INVEST, (1990), vol. 2, pages 249 - 52 | - "Murine whole-blood opsonophagocytosis assay to evaluate protection by antibodies raised against encapsulated extracellular bacteria", GOYETTE-DESJARDINS G; ROY R; SEGURA M., Methods in Molecular Biology - Carbohydrate-based vaccines, SPRINGER | - SZU SC; ZON G; SCHNEERSON R; ROBBINS JB, "Ultrasonic irradiation of bacterial polysaccharides. Characterization of the depolymerized products and some applications of the process", CARBOHYDR RES, (1986), vol. 152, pages 7 - 20 | - REUTER G; SCHAUER R; SZEIKI C; KAMERLING JP; VLIEGENTHART JF., "A detailed study of the periodate oxidation of sialic acids in glycoproteins", GLYCOCONJ J, (1989), vol. 6, pages 35 - 44 | - WESSELS MR; PAOLETTI LC; KASPER DL; DIFABIO JL; MICHON F; HOLME K ET AL., "Immunogenicity in animals of a polysaccharide-protein conjugate vaccine against type III Group B Streptococcus", J CLIN INVEST, (1990), vol. 86, pages 1428 - 33, XP002546281 | - MERRIL C; GOLDMAN D; SEDMAN S; EBERT M, "Ultrasensitive stain for proteins in polyacrylamide gels shows regional variation in cerebrospinal fluid proteins", SCIENCE, (1981), vol. 211, pages 1437 - 8 | - CHU RS; TARGONI OS; KRIEG AM; LEHMANN PV; HARDING CV, "CpG oligodeoxynucleotides act as adjuvants that switch on T helper 1 (Thl) immunity", J EXP MED, (1997), vol. 186, doi:doi:10.1084/jem.186.10.1623, pages 1623 - 31, XP002910130 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.186.10.1623 | - STILLS HF., "Adjuvants and antibody production: dispelling the myths associated with Freund's complete and other adjuvants", ILAR JOURNAL, (2005), vol. 46, pages 280 - 93 | - LEENAARS PPAM; HENDRIKSEN CFM; ANGULO AF; KOEDAM MA; CLAASSEN E., "Evaluation of several adjuvants as alternatives to the use of Freund's adjuvant in rabbits", VET IMMUNOL IMMUNOPATHOL, (1994), vol. 40, doi:doi:10.1016/0165-2427(94)90022-1, pages 225 - 41, XP023690027 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-2427(94)90022-1 | - BENNETT B; CHECK IJ; OLSEN MR; HUNTER RL., "A comparison of commercially available adjuvants for use in research", J IMMUNOL METHODS, (1992), vol. 153, doi:doi:10.1016/0022-1759(92)90302-A, pages 31 - 40, XP023657883 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-1759(92)90302-A | - SOMMARIVA M; DE CESARE M; MEINI A; CATALDO A; ZAFFARONI N; TAGLIABUE E ET AL., "efficacy of CpG-ODN, cetuximab and cisplatin combination for very advanced ovarian xenograft tumors", J TRANSL MED, (2013), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1186/1479-5876-11-25, page 25, XP021139685 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1479-5876-11-25 | - JENNINGS VM., "Review of selected adjuvants used in antibody production", ILAR JOURNAL, (1995), vol. 37, pages 119 - 25 | - KATEREGGA J; LUBEGA GW; LINDBLAD EB; AUTHIE E; COETZER TH; BOULANGE AF., "Effect of adjuvants on the humoral immune response to congopain in mice and cattle", BMC VET RES, (2012), vol. 8, doi:doi:10.1186/1746-6148-8-63, page 63, XP021129622 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1746-6148-8-63 | - DALSGAARD K; HILGERS L; TROUVE G., "Classical and new approaches to adjuvant use in domestic food animals", ADV VET SCI COMP MED, (1990), vol. 35, pages 121 - 60 | - PLOTKIN SA., "Correlates of protection induced by vaccination", CLIN VACCINE IMMUNOL, (2010), vol. 17, pages 1055 - 65 | - SWILDENS B; NIELEN M; WISSELINK HJ; VERHEIJDEN JHM; STEGEMAN JA, "Elimination of strains of Streptococcus suis serotype 2 from the tonsils of carrier sows by combined medication and vaccination", VET REC, (2007), vol. 160, pages 619 - 21 | - GILBERT FB; POUTREL B; SUTRA L., "Immunogenicity in cows of Staphylococcus aureus type 5 capsular polysaccharide-ovalbumin conjugate", VACCINE, (1994), vol. 12, doi:doi:10.1016/0264-410X(94)90103-1, pages 369 - 74, XP023711582 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0264-410X(94)90103-1 | - LEE C-J; LEE LH; FRASCH CE., "Protective immunity of pneumococcal glycoconjugates", CRIT REV MICROBIOL, (2003), vol. 29, pages 333 - 49 | - BAKER CJ; RENCH MA; EDWARDS MS; CARPENTER RJ; HAYS BM; KASPER DL., "Immunization of pregnant women with a polysaccharide vaccine of Group B Streptococcus", N ENGL J MED, (1988), vol. 319, pages 1180 - 5 | - KASPER DL; PAOLETTI LC; WESSELS MR; GUTTORMSEN HK; CAREY VJ; JENNINGS HJ ET AL., "Immune response to type III Group B streptococcal polysaccharide-tetanus toxoid conjugate vaccine", J CLIN INVEST, (1996), vol. 98, pages 2308 - 14 | - MOENS L; JEURISSEN A; NIERKENS S; BOON L; VAN KAER L; KASRAN A ET AL., "Generation of antibody responses to pneumococcal capsular polysaccharides is independent of CD1 expression in mice", INFECT IMMUN, (2009), vol. 77, pages 1976 - 80 | - SCHIITZ K; HUGHES R; PARKER A; QUINTI I; THON V; CAVALIERE M ET AL., "Kinetics of IgM and IgA antibody response to 23-valent pneumococcal polysaccharide vaccination in healthy subjects", J CLIN IMMUNOL, (2013), vol. 33, pages 288 - 96 | - BAUMS CG; KOCK C; BEINEKE A; BENNECKE K; GOETHE R; SCHRODER C ET AL., "Streptococcus suis bacterin and subunit vaccine immunogenicities and protective efficacies against serotypes 2 and 9", CLIN VACCINE IMMUNOL, (2009), vol. 16, pages 200 - 8 | - DUAN J; KASPER DL., "Oxidative depolymerization of polysaccharides by reactive oxygen/nitrogen species", GLYCOBIOLOGY, (2011), vol. 21, pages 401 - 9 | - HIGASHI K; LY M; WANG Z; MASUKO S; BHASKAR U; STERNER E ET AL., "Controlled photochemical depolymerization of K5 heparosan, a bioengineered heparin precursor", CARBOHYDR POLYM, (2011), vol. 86, pages 1365 - 70 | - ANDERSON P., "Antibody responses to Haemophilus influenzae type b and diphtheria toxin induced by conjugates of oligosaccharides of the type b capsule with the nontoxic protein CRM197", INFECT IMMUN, (1983), vol. 39, pages 233 - 8 | - SVENSON SB; LINDBERG AA., "Oligosaccharide-protein conjugate: A novel approach for making Salmonella O-antigen immunogens", FEMS MICROBIOL LETT, (1977), vol. 1, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1574-6968.1977.tb00601.x, pages 145 - 7, XP023717080 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1574-6968.1977.tb00601.x | - SVENSON SB; LINDBERG AA., "Coupling of acid labile Salmonella specific oligosaccharides to macromolecular carriers", J IMMUNOL METHODS, (1979), vol. 25, doi:doi:10.1016/0022-1759(79)90025-5, pages 323 - 35, XP024017647 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-1759(79)90025-5 | - WESSELS MR; MUNOZ A; KASPER DL., "A model of high-affinity antibody binding to type III Group B Streptococcus capsular polysaccharide", PROC NATL ACAD SCI, (1987), vol. 84, pages 9170 - 4 | - PAOLETTI LC; KASPER DL; MICHON F; DIFABIO J; HOLME K; JENNINGS HJ ET AL., "An oligosaccharide-tetanus toxoid conjugate vaccine against type III Group B Streptococcus", J BIOL CHEM, (1990), vol. 265, pages 18278 - 83, XP002301343 | - PAWLOWSKI A; SVENSON SB, "Electron beam fragmentation of bacterial polysaccharides as a method of producing oligosaccharides for the preparation of conjugate vaccines", FEMS MICROBIOL LETT, (1999), vol. 174, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1574-6968.1999.tb13577.x, pages 255 - 63, XP055262001 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1574-6968.1999.tb13577.x | - PAOLETTI LC; WESSELS MR; MICHON F; DIFABIO J; JENNINGS HJ; KASPER DL, "Group B Streptococcus type II polysaccharide-tetanus toxoid conjugate vaccine", INFECT IMMUN, (1992), vol. 60, pages 4009 - 14, XP000601510 | - WESSELS MR; PAOLETTI LC; RODEWALD AK; MICHON F; DIFABIO J; JENNINGS HJ ET AL., "Stimulation of protective antibodies against type la and Ib Group B Streptococci by a type la polysaccharide-tetanus toxoid conjugate vaccine", INFECT IMMUN, (1993), vol. 61, pages 4760 - 6 | - PAOLETTI LC; WESSELS MR; RODEWALD AK; SHROFF AA; JENNINGS HJ; KASPER DL., "Neonatal mouse protection against infection with multiple Group B streptococcal (GBS) serotypes by maternal immunization with a tetravalent GBS polysaccharide-tetanus toxoid conjugate vaccine", INFECT IMMUN, (1994), vol. 62, pages 3236 - 43, XP001148813 | - WESSELS MR; PAOLETTI LC; PINEL J; KASPER DL., "Immunogenicity and protective activity in animals of a type V Group B streptococcal polysaccharide-tetanus toxoid conjugate vaccine", J INFECT DIS, (1995), vol. 171, pages 879 - 84, XP000674380 | - PAOLETTI LC; PINEL J; JOHNSON KD; REINAP B; ROSS RA; KASPER DL., "Synthesis and preclinical evaluation of glycoconjugate vaccines against Group B Streptococcus types VI and VIII", J INFECT DIS, (1999), vol. 180, pages 892 - 5 | - PAOLETTI LC; KASPER DL., "Conjugate vaccines against Group B Streptococcus types IV and VII", J INFECT DIS, (2002), vol. 186, pages 123 - 6 | - WESSELS MR; PAOLETTI LC; GUTTORMSEN HK; MICHON F; D'AMBRA AJ; KASPER DL., "Structural properties of Group B streptococcal type III polysaccharide conjugate vaccines that influence immunogenicity and efficacy", INFECT IMMUN, (1998), vol. 66, pages 2186 - 92, XP009113849 | - JENNINGS HJ; LUGOWSKI C; KASPER DL., "Conformational aspects critical to the immunospecificity of the type III Group B streptococcal polysaccharide", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1981), vol. 20, pages 4511 - 8 | - ZOU W; MACKENZIE R; THERIEN L; HIRAMA T; YANG Q; GIDNEY MA ET AL., "Conformational epitope of the type III Group B Streptococcus capsular polysaccharide", J IMMUNOL, (1999), vol. 163, pages 820 - 5 | - AVCI FY; LI X; TSUJI M; KASPER DL., "A mechanism for glycoconjugate vaccine activation of the adaptive immune system and its implications for vaccine design", NAT MED, (2011), vol. 17, doi:doi:10.1038/nm.2535, pages 1602 - 9, XP055179286 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm.2535 | - MICHON F; UITZ C; SARKAR A; D'AMBRA AJ; LAUDE-SHARP M; MOORE S ET AL., "Group B streptococcal type II and III conjugate vaccines: physicochemical properties that influence immunogenicity", CLIN VACCINE IMMUNOL, (2006), vol. 13, doi:doi:10.1128/CVI.00122-06, pages 936 - 43, XP055211257 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/CVI.00122-06 | - O'HAGAN DT; VALIANTE NM., "Recent advances in the discovery and delivery of vaccine adjuvants", NAT REV DRUG DISCOV, (2003), vol. 2, pages 727 - 35 | - CHU RS; MCCOOL T; GREENSPAN NS; SCHREIBER JR; HARDING CV., "CpG oligodeoxynucleotides act as adjuvants for pneumococcal polysaccharide-protein conjugate vaccines and enhance antipolysaccharide immunoglobulin G2a (IgG2a) and IgG3 antibodies", INFECT IMMUN, (2000), vol. 68, pages 1450 - 6 | - FATTOM A; LI X; CHO YH; BURNS A; HAWWARI A; SHEPHERD SE ET AL., "Effect of conjugation methodology, carrier protein, and adjuvants on the immune response to Staphylococcus aureus capsular polysaccharides", VACCINE, (1995), vol. 13, doi:doi:10.1016/0264-410X(95)00052-3, pages 1288 - 93, XP004057429 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0264-410X(95)00052-3 | - BODE C; ZHAO G; STEINHAGEN F; KINJO T; KLINMAN DM., "CpG DNA as a vaccine adjuvant", EXPERT REV VACCINES, (2011), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.1586/erv.10.174, pages 499 - 511, XP055138146 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1586/erv.10.174 | - KOVARIK J; BOZZOTTI P; TOUGNE C; DAVIS HL; LAMBERT PH; KRIEG AM ET AL., "Adjuvant effects of CpG oligodeoxynucleotides on responses against T-independent type 2 antigens", IMMUNOLOGY, (2001), vol. 102, pages 67 - 76 | - COX JC; COULTER AR., "Adjuvants-A classification and review of their modes of action", VACCINE, (1997), vol. 15, doi:doi:10.1016/S0264-410X(96)00183-1, pages 248 - 56, XP004094403 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(96)00183-1 | - LEENAARS PP; SAVELKOUL HF; HENDRIKSEN CF; VAN ROOIJEN N; CLAASSEN E., "Increased adjuvant efficacy in stimulation of antibody responses after macrophage elimination in vivo", IMMUNOLOGY, (1997), vol. 90, pages 337 - 43 | - HEEGAARD P; DEDIEU L; JOHNSON N; LE POTIER M-F; MOCKEY M; MUTINELLI F ET AL., "Adjuvants and delivery systems in veterinary vaccinology: current state and future developments", ARCH VIROL, (2011), vol. 156, doi:doi:10.1007/s00705-010-0863-1, pages 183 - 202, XP019878345 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00705-010-0863-1 | - HUNTER RL., "Overview of vaccine adjuvants: present and future", VACCINE, (2002), vol. 20, no. 3, pages 7 - 12 | - "Preparation of polysaccharide-conjugate vaccines", PEETERS CC; LAGERMAN PR; WEERS O; OOMEN LA; HOOGERHOUT P; BEURRET M ET AL., Methods in Molecular Medecine - Vaccine Protocols, HUMANA PRESS INC, (2003), pages 153 - 73 | - WILSON D; BRALEY-MULLEN H., "Antigen requirements for priming of type III pneumococcal polysaccharide-specific IgG memory responses: suppression of memory with the T-independent form of antigen", CELL IMMUNOL, (1981), vol. 64, doi:doi:10.1016/0008-8749(81)90468-8, pages 177 - 86, XP024007446 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0008-8749(81)90468-8 | - PEETERS CCAM; TENBERGEN-MEEKES A-MJ; POOLMAN JT; ZEGERS BJM; RIJKERS GT., "Immunogenicity of a Streptococcus pneumoniae type 4 polysaccharide-protein conjugate vaccine is decreased by admixture of high doses of free saccharide", VACCINE, (1992), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.1016/0264-410X(92)90046-M, pages 833 - 40, XP023710393 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0264-410X(92)90046-M | - RODRIGUEZ ME; VAN DEN DOBBELSTEEN GP; OOMEN LA; DE WEERS O; VAN BUREN L; BEURRET M ET AL., "Immunogenicity of Streptococcus pneumoniae type 6B and 14 polysaccharide-tetanus toxoid conjugates and the effect of uncoupled polysaccharide on the antigen-specific immune response", VACCINE, (1998), vol. 16, doi:doi:10.1016/S0264-410X(98)00129-7, pages 1941 - 9, XP004138440 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(98)00129-7 | - ROMERO-STEINER S; FRASCH CE; CARLONE G; FLECK RA; GOLDBLATT D; NAHM MH, "Use of opsonophagocytosis for serological evaluation of pneumococcal vaccines", CLIN VACCINE IMMUNOL, (2006), vol. 13, doi:doi:10.1128/CVI.13.2.165-169.2006, pages 165 - 9, XP002622149 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/CVI.13.2.165-169.2006 | - GUILLIAMS M; BRUHNS P; SAEYS Y; HAMMAD H; LAMBRECHT BN., "The function of Fcg receptors in dendritic cells and macrophages", NAT REV IMMUNOL, (2014), vol. 14, pages 94 - 108 | - UNDERHILL DM; OZINSKY A., "Phagocytosis of microbes: complexity in action", ANNU REV IMMUNOL, (2002), vol. 20, pages 825 - 52 | - RICKLIN D; HAJISHENGALLIS G; YANG K; LAMBRIS JD, "Complement: a key system for immune surveillance and homeostasis", NAT IMMUNOL, (2010), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1038/ni.1923, pages 785 - 97, XP055306904 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ni.1923 | - PERLMUTTER RM; HANSBURG D; BRILES DE; NICOLOTTI RA; DAVID JM, "Subclass Restriction of Murine Anti-Carbohydrate Antibodies", J IMMUNOL, (1978), vol. 121, pages 566 - 72 | - RUBINSTEIN LJ; STEIN KE, "Murine immune response to the Neisseria meningitidis group C capsular polysaccharide. I. Ontogeny", J IMMUNOL, (1988), vol. 141, pages 4352 - 6 | - SCHREIBER JR; COOPER LJN; DIEHN S; DAHLHAUSER PA; TOSI MF; GLASS DD ET AL., "Variable region-identical monoclonal antibodies of different IgG subclass directed to Pseudomonas aeruginosa lipopolysaccharide O-specific side chain function differently", J INFECT DIS, (1993), vol. 167, pages 221 - 6, XP009027285 | - MICHAELSEN TE; KOLBERG J; AASE A; HERSTAD TK; H IBY EA, "The four mouse IgG isotypes differ extensively in bactericidal and opsonophagocytic activity when reacting with the P1.16 epitope on the outer membrane PorA protein of Neisseria meningitidis", SCAND J IMMUNOL, (2004), vol. 59, pages 34 - 9 | - MCLAY J; LEONARD E; PETERSEN S; SHAPIRO D; GREENSPAN NS; SCHREIBER JR, "y3 gene-disrupted mice selectively deficient in the dominant IgG subclass made to bacterial polysaccharides. II. Increased susceptibility to fatal pneumococcal sepsis due to absence of anti-polysaccharide IgG3 is corrected by induction of anti-polysaccharide IgGl", J IMMUNOL, (2002), vol. 168, pages 3437 - 43 | - GALINA L; VECHT U; WISSELINK HJ; PIJOAN C, "Prevalence of various phenotypes of Streptococcus suis isolated from swine in the U.S.A. based on the presence of muraminidase-released protein and extracellular factor", CAN J VET RES, (1996), vol. 60, pages 72 - 4 | - GOTTSCHALK M; LEBRUN A; WISSELINK H; DUBREUIL JD; SMITH H; VECHT U., "Production of virulence-related proteins by Canadian strains of Streptococcus suis capsular type 2", CAN J VET RES, (1998), vol. 62, pages 75 - 9 | - OKWUMABUA O; ABDELMAGID O; CHENGAPPA MM., "Hybridization analysis of the gene encoding a hemolysin (suilysin) of Streptococcus suis type 2: evidence for the absence of the gene in some isolates", FEMS MICROBIOL LETT, (1999), vol. 181, pages 113 - 21 | - FITTIPALDI N; XU J; LACOUTURE S; THARAVICHITKUL P; OSAKI M; SEKIZAKI T ET AL., "Lineage and virulence of Streptococcus suis serotype 2 isolates from North America", EMERG INFECT DIS, (2011), vol. 17, pages 2239 - 44 | - LI Y; MARTINEZ G; GOTTSCHALK M; LACOUTURE S; WILLSON P; DUBREUIL JD ET AL., "Identification of a surface protein of Streptococcus suis and evaluation of its immunogenic and protective capacity in pigs", INFECT IMMUN, (2006), vol. 74, doi:doi:10.1128/IAI.74.1.305-312.2006, pages 305 - 12, XP008078285 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/IAI.74.1.305-312.2006 |