03.09.2021 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] |
03.06.2021 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
03.03.2021 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.11.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.10.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.10.2020 |
First examination report |
|
01.11.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.04.2019 |
Change - applicant |
published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] |
14.12.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] |
14.12.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] |
08.12.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.11.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.07.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
13.07.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
13.07.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
18.06.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.05.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.05.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.05.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.05.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.05.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
05.05.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.01.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.10.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|