EP3287962 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR RESERVING PARKING SPACE IN REAL TIME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Empresas Disruptiva SPA Avenida Calera de Tango Paradero 18 Parcelación El Acacio y La Cruz Parcela 1-A Comuna Calera de Tango Santiago de Chile / CL | [2018/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALANO TRIVIÑO, Sergio Enrique Avenida Calera de Tango Paradero 18 Parcelación El Acacio y La Cruz Parcela 1-A Comuna Calera de Tango Santiago de Chile / CL | 02 /
SANHUEZA PEREZ, Darío Alejandro Las Verbenas poniente 2453 Comuna de Lampa Santiago de Chile / CL | [2018/09] | Representative(s) | Padial Martinez, Ana Belen Arochi & Lindner C/ Gurtubay Nº 6-3º Izquierda 28001 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2018/09] | Padial Martinez, Ana Belen Arochi & Lindner Abogados Calle Serrano, 28 - 1C 28001 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 16782443.2 | 21.04.2016 | [2018/09] | WO2016CL50019 | Priority number, date | CL201520151087 | 24.04.2015 Original published format: CL 20151087 | [2018/09] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016168948 | Date: | 27.10.2016 | Language: | ES | [2016/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3287962 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2018/09] | CPC: |
G06Q10/02 (EP,US);
G06F16/90 (EP,US);
G06Q10/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/09] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG VON PARKPLÄTZEN IN ECHTZEIT | [2018/09] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR RESERVING PARKING SPACE IN REAL TIME | [2018/09] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉSERVATION DE STATIONNEMENTS EN TEMPS RÉEL | [2018/09] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2017 | Translation filed | 24.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/09] | 24.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 21.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2002099574 (CAHILL JOHN J [US], et al) [I] 1-20* paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0079]; figures 1-3; claims 1-23 *; | [I]US2014236645 (AARON FRANCIS [FR], et al) [I] 1-20 * figures 1-15; claims 1-16 * | International search | [A]US2012092190 (STEFIK MARK JEFFREY [US], et al) [A] 1-16, 18-22, 28-30* , entire document *; | [Y]US2014249742 (KRIVACIC ROBERT T [US], et al) [Y] 1-16, 18-22, 28-30 * , entire document, especially; abstract, para. [0035], [0076]-[0080] *; | [Y]US2014372155 (WANG YAO RONG [US], et al) [Y] 1-16, 18-22, 28-30 * , entire document, especially; abstract, para. [0006], [0015], [0016], [0019], [0035]-[0040], [0046] * |