|
07.07.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2021 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2021 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.04.2021 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
28.07.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
108 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
108 |
|
30.03.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2020 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2019 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2019 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2019 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
11.10.2018 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2018 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2018 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2018 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2018 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.09.2018 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2018 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2018 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2018 |
Request for correction of errors in filed documents |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.05.2018 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2018 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2018 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2017 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2017 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2017 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.10.2017 |
Translation of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.10.2017 |
The request for correction will be decided by the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2017 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2017 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2017 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
02.10.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
77 |
|
02.10.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.09.2017 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.08.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.2017 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2017 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2017 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2017 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
86 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.10.2016 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
96 |