Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10227347 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2019 | B2 | US2018134709 | 17.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201510189476 | 21.04.2015 | WO2016CN79022 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102015826B | Global Dossier | 29.08.2019 | B1 | KR20180011068 | 31.01.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201510189476 | 21.04.2015 | WO2016CN79022 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6518833B | Global Dossier | 22.05.2019 | B2 | JP2018521111 | 02.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201510189476 | 21.04.2015 | WO2016CN79022 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107849045B | Global Dossier | 24.12.2019 | B | CN107849045 | 27.03.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201510189476 | 21.04.2015 | WO2016CN79022 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2983042 | Global Dossier | 07.01.2020 | C | CA2983042 | 27.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201510189476 | 21.04.2015 | WO2016CN79022 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2016250972B | Global Dossier | 17.01.2019 | B2 | AU2016250972 | 09.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201510189476 | 21.04.2015 | WO2016CN79022 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3287459 | Global Dossier | 02.09.2020 | B1 | EP3287459 | 24.10.2018 | A4 | EP3287459 | 28.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201510189476 | 21.04.2015 | WO2016CN79022 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA033106 | 30.08.2019 | B1 | EA201792215 | 31.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201510189476 | 21.04.2015 | WO2016CN79022 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2833473T | 15.06.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CN201510189476 | 21.04.2015 | WO2016CN79022 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016169417 | Global Dossier | 27.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201510189476 | 21.04.2015 |