EP3285633 - STEERABLE MICRO-ENDOSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2021 [2021/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research Development International Corporation 87 E. Green Street, Suite 201 Pasadena, CA 91105 / US | [2018/14] |
Former [2018/09] | For all designated states Research & Development International, Inc. 87 East Green Street, Suite 201 Pasadena, CA 91105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEKOWSKI, Marek 550 Erskine Drive Pacific Palisades, California 90272 / US | [2018/28] |
Former [2018/09] | 01 /
SEKOWSKI, Marek 550 Erksine Drive Pacific Palisades, California 90272 / US | Representative(s) | Richards, John, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Temple Chambers 3-7 Temple Avenue London EC4Y 0DA / GB | [2018/09] | Application number, filing date | 16783528.9 | 08.02.2016 | [2018/09] | WO2016US17033 | Priority number, date | WO2015US27170 | 22.04.2015 Original published format: PCT/US2015/027170 | WO2015US56279 | 19.10.2015 Original published format: PCT/US2015/056279 | [2018/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016171780 | Date: | 27.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3285633 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/00, A61B18/08, A61B18/12, A61B1/005, A61B1/05, G02B23/24, A61B17/00, A61B18/14, A61B1/00, A61B1/018 | [2019/05] | CPC: |
A61B1/0052 (EP,CN,US);
A61B1/0011 (CN);
A61B1/00167 (CN);
A61B1/0055 (EP,CN,US);
A61B1/0057 (CN,US);
A61B1/04 (CN);
A61B1/05 (EP,US);
A61B1/07 (US);
G02B23/2476 (EP,US);
A61B1/00087 (US);
A61B1/018 (US);
A61B18/1492 (US);
A61B2017/00318 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/09] | A61B1/005, A61B1/00, A61B1/04, A61B1/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/09] | Title | German: | LENKBARES MIKROENDOSKOP | [2018/09] | English: | STEERABLE MICRO-ENDOSCOPE | [2018/09] | French: | MICRO-ENDOSCOPE ORIENTABLE | [2018/09] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 15.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/09] | 17.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 01.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/03] | 11.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   02.09.2019 | 29.02.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005131279 (BOULAIS DENNIS R [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0061] - [0224] * [I] 6; | [X]US2007249907 (BOULAIS DENNIS R [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2013172673 (KENNEDY II KENNETH C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2014024951 (HERZLINGER PETER M [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [E]WO2016064449 (RES DEV INTERNAT CORP [US]) [E] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US6171235 (KONSTORUM GREGORY [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * See abstract, column 3, line 55- column 4, line 24 and figures 1-7. *; | [A]US2010032470 (HESS CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * SSee abstract, paragraph [177] and figures 1,2. *; | [A]US2012296167 (CHEN YUNG-HSIU [TW], et al) [A] 1-24 * See abstract, paragraphs [28]-[35] and figures 1-6. *; | [A]US2013109919 (SUGIYAMA YUTA [JP], et al) [A] 1-24* See abstract, paragraphs [32]-[37] and figures 1,2. *; | [A]US2014243592 (KATO TAKAHISA [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * See abstract, paragraphs [49]-[103] and figures 1A-10. * |