EP3286924 - SHELF FOR COMMUNICATIONS RACK OR CABINET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CommScope, Inc. of North Carolina 1100 CommScope Place, SE Hickory, NC 28602 / US | [2018/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLETCHER, Neil Christopher 137 Spicers Hill Southampton Hampshire SO40 9ET / GB | 02 /
WOMACK, Wade J. 2017 Nottingham Place Allen, Texas 75013 / US | [2018/09] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/09] | Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 16783828.3 | 21.04.2016 | [2018/09] | WO2016US28581 | Priority number, date | US201562152435P | 24.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562152435 P | US201562155609P | 01.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562155609 P | US201562163758P | 19.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562163758 P | US201562198322P | 29.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562198322 P | US201514853024 | 14.09.2015 Original published format: US201514853024 | [2018/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016172302 | Date: | 27.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3286924 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q1/02, H04Q1/06, G02B6/44 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
G02B6/4453 (EP,CN,US);
G02B6/4478 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/09] | H04Q1/02, H04Q1/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/09] | Title | German: | REGAL FÜR KOMMUNIKATIONSGESTELL ODER -SCHRANK | [2018/09] | English: | SHELF FOR COMMUNICATIONS RACK OR CABINET | [2018/09] | French: | ÉTAGÈRE POUR CHÂSSIS OU ARMOIRE DE COMMUNICATIONS | [2018/09] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 16.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/09] | 16.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5903698 (POREMBA JOHN [US], et al); | [XI]US2002181924 (SCHRAY STEVEN JOHN [US]); | [XI]US2003129871 (FOLLINGSTAD MICHAEL JAY [US]); | [XI]US2008002937 (SPISANY GORDON [US], et al); | [XI]US2010158465 (SMRHA MARK [US]); | [XI]US2012051708 (BADAR TIMOTHY G [US], et al); | [XI]CN104378160 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) | International search | [A]US2007020991 (MURANO ADAM [US]); | [A]US2008063350 (TREBESCH STEVEN P [US], et al); | [Y]WO2008074013 (COMMSCOPE INC [US]); | [YA]US2013084050 (VASTMANS KRISTOF [BE], et al); | [Y]US2014080325 (LAI CHYI-LANG [TW]) | by applicant | US5903698 | US2002181924 | US2003129871 | US2008002937 | US2010158465 | US2012051708 | CN104378160 |