05.05.2023 |
Refusal of application |
published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] |
05.04.2023 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
19.01.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
23.12.2022 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
28.07.2022 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
23.02.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.08.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.04.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.04.2021 |
First examination report |
|
24.02.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.02.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.08.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.02.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.01.2019 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
11.01.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
11.01.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
11.01.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
09.11.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
09.11.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
08.06.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
08.06.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
08.06.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
14.05.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.03.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.03.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.03.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.03.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.12.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.11.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
25.11.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.10.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|