EP3346316 - 3D DISPLAY DEVICE AND DRIVING METHOD AND DEVICE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.10.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | For all designated states Beijing BOE Optoelectronics Technology Co., Ltd. No. 8 Xihuanzhonglu, BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2018/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUO, Renwei No.9 Dize Road BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
DONG, Xue No.9 Dize Road BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2018/28] | Representative(s) | Fritzsche, Thomas Fritzsche Patent Naupliastraße 110 81545 München / DE | [2018/28] | Application number, filing date | 16784370.5 | 16.02.2016 | [2018/28] | WO2016CN73872 | Priority number, date | CN201510556849 | 02.09.2015 Original published format: CN201510556849 | [2018/28] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017036097 | Date: | 09.03.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3346316 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/22, G09G3/20, H04N13/31, H04N13/324 | [2019/07] | CPC: |
H04N13/349 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N13/302 (KR);
G09G3/001 (US);
G09G3/003 (EP,US);
G09G3/20 (KR);
H04N13/31 (EP,US);
H04N13/315 (EP,US);
H04N13/32 (US);
H04N13/324 (EP,US);
H04N13/354 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0443 (US);
G09G2300/0452 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/28] | G02B27/22, G09G3/20, H04N13/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/28] | Title | German: | 3D-ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND ANSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2018/28] | English: | 3D DISPLAY DEVICE AND DRIVING METHOD AND DEVICE THEREFOR | [2018/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE 3D ET PROCÉDÉ DE PILOTAGE ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉS | [2018/28] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2016 | Translation filed | 31.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2016 | Examination requested [2018/28] | 31.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 31.01.2023 | 20.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/23] | 30.01.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/23] | 31.01.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR20050049626 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]) [A] 1-13* figure 5b *; | [Y]US2011234929 (LIN MING-YEN [TW]) [Y] 2 * figure 25 *; | [XYI]US2014029095 (ALLIO PIERRE [FR], et al) [X] 1,3-6 * paragraphs [0001] - [0008]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0024] - [0034]; figure 2 * * figure 30 * [Y] 2,8-11 [I] 7,12,13; | [A]CN104505015 (BEIJING BOE OPTOELECTRONICS, et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 5,6 *; | [Y]CN104599626 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD, et al) [Y] 8-11 * figures 14-16 *; | US2016203800 [ ] (CHEN ZHONGJUN [CN], et al) [ ] * figure 5 *; | US2016379533 [ ] (GUO RENWEI [CN], et al) | International search | [A]JP2002182153 (MIXED REALITY SYSTEMS LAB INC) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011291549 (KIM GUN-SHIK [KR], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [XA]CN104599626 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD, et al) [X] 7, 12 * claims 1-10description,paragraphs [0004]-[0084] and figures 1-17 claims 1-10,description, paragraphs [0004]-[0084] and figures 1-17 * [A] 1-6, 8-11, 13; | [A]CN104599625 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]CN104614863 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [PX]CN105093550 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD, et al) [PX] 1-11 * claims 1-11 * |