08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
18.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
16.07.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
02.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] |
11.06.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
21.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
11.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
23.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
12.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
15.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
07.08.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
04.08.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
03.08.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
03.08.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
01.04.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.01.2020 |
Change - German title |
published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] |
10.01.2020 |
Change - French title |
published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] |
22.11.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.09.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.09.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.09.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.07.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.07.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.05.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.01.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.01.2019 |
First examination report |
|
07.12.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 09.01.2019 [2019/02] |
07.12.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.01.2019 [2019/02] |
16.11.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.09.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.07.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
13.07.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
13.07.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
16.06.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.05.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.05.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.05.2018 |
New entry: Fee payment for validation state |
|
01.05.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
01.05.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.01.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.11.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|