EP3359672 - BIOLOGICAL CONTROL OF PLANT VIRUSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Looije Applications B.V. Leehove 81 2678 MB De Lier / NL | [2018/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERMUNT, Adrianus Marinus Wilhelmus c/o Leehove 81 2678 MB De Lier / NL | [2018/33] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 Carnegieplein 5 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2018/33] | Application number, filing date | 16784990.0 | 04.10.2016 | [2018/33] | WO2016NL50684 | Priority number, date | EP20150188418 | 05.10.2015 Original published format: EP 15188418 | [2018/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017061859 | Date: | 13.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3359672 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3359672 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, C12Q1/68, C12Q1/70, A01H5/00 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
C12N7/00 (EP,US);
A01N63/40 (EP,US);
A01N63/60 (EP,US);
C12N15/8283 (EP,US);
C12Q1/04 (US);
C12N2770/26011 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A01N63/60, A01N63/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | 01.05.2018 | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCHE BEKÄMPFUNG VON PFLANZENKRANKHEITEN | [2020/07] | English: | BIOLOGICAL CONTROL OF PLANT VIRUSES | [2018/33] | French: | LUTTE BIOLOGIQUE CONTRE LES MALADIES DES PLANTES | [2020/07] |
Former [2018/33] | BIOLOGISCHE BEKÄMPFUNG VON PFLANZENVIREN | ||
Former [2018/33] | LUTTE BIOLOGIQUE CONTRE DES VIRUS DE PLANTES | Entry into regional phase | 01.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 01.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/33] | 01.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 09.09.2020 | CY | 09.09.2020 | CZ | 09.09.2020 | EE | 09.09.2020 | FI | 09.09.2020 | HR | 09.09.2020 | LT | 09.09.2020 | LV | 09.09.2020 | MC | 09.09.2020 | MK | 09.09.2020 | MT | 09.09.2020 | RO | 09.09.2020 | RS | 09.09.2020 | SE | 09.09.2020 | SI | 09.09.2020 | SK | 09.09.2020 | SM | 09.09.2020 | TR | 09.09.2020 | IE | 04.10.2020 | LU | 04.10.2020 | BG | 09.12.2020 | NO | 09.12.2020 | GR | 10.12.2020 | IS | 09.01.2021 | PT | 11.01.2021 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CY | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
MT | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
TR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IE | 04.10.2020 | ||
LU | 04.10.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
IE | 04.10.2020 | ||
LU | 04.10.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
LU | 04.10.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
LU | 04.10.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 09.09.2020 | |
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 09.09.2020 | |
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y] - BEATA HASIW-JAROSZEWSKA ET AL, "Single mutation converts mild pathotype of the Pepino mosaic virus into necrotic one", VIRUS RESEARCH, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 159, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.VIRUSRES.2011.04.008, ISSN 0168-1702, (20110422), pages 57 - 61, (20110422), XP028222904 [Y] 1,2,4-13 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.virusres.2011.04.008 | [Y] - I. M. HANSSEN ET AL, "Pepino mosaic virus isolates and differential symptomatology in tomato", PLANT PATHOLOGY, GB, (20090218), vol. 58, no. 3, doi:10.1111/j.1365-3059.2008.02018.x, ISSN 0032-0862, pages 450 - 460, XP055257124 [Y] 1,2,4-13 * page 457, column l; table 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-3059.2008.02018.x | [Y] - Godwill Mih Chewachong, "ENGINEERING PLANT VIRUS "VACCINES" USING PEPINO MOSAIC VIRUS AS A MODEL", Ph. D. thesis, (2013), pages i-xviii, 1 - 102, URL: https://etd.ohiolink.edu/rws_etd/document/get/osu1384203201/inline, (20160309), XP055256861 [Y] 1,2,4-13 * page 40 - page 46 * * page 60 - page 83 * | [Y] - MARTIJN F SCHENK ET AL, "The use of attenuated isolates of Pepino mosaic virus for cross-protection", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PLANT PATHOLOGY, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20100301), vol. 127, no. 2, ISSN 1573-8469, pages 249 - 261, XP019788747 [Y] 1,2,4-13 * figure 3; tables 1-3 * | [A] - GODWILL M. CHEWACHONG ET AL, "Generation of an Attenuated, Cross-Protective Pepino mosaic virus Variant Through Alignment-Guided Mutagenesis of the Viral Capsid Protein", PHYTOPATHOLOGY, US, (201501), vol. 105, no. 1, doi:10.1094/PHYTO-01-14-0018-R, ISSN 0031-949X, pages 126 - 134, XP055256854 [A] 1,2,4-13 * figures 1,3,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1094/PHYTO-01-14-0018-R | [A] - BEATA HASIÓW-JAROSZEWSKA ET AL, "Ratio of mutated versus wild-type coat protein sequences in Pepino mosaic virus determines the nature and severity of yellowing symptoms on tomato plants", MOLECULAR PLANT PATHOLOGY, GB, (20130715), vol. 14, no. 9, doi:10.1111/mpp.12059, ISSN 1464-6722, pages 923 - 933, XP055257155 [A] 1,2,4-13 * figure 4; table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/mpp.12059 | [A] - BEATA HASIÓW-JAROSZEWSKA ET AL, "A new method for detection and discrimination of Pepino mosaic virus isolates using high resolution melting analysis of the triple gene block 3", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGICAL METHODS, NL, (20130513), vol. 193, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.jviromet.2013.04.022, ISSN 0166-0934, pages 1 - 5, XP055256910 [A] 1,2,4-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jviromet.2013.04.022 | [A] - INGE M. HANSSEN ET AL, "Pepino mosaic virus : a successful pathogen that rapidly evolved from emerging to endemic in tomato crops", MOLECULAR PLANT PATHOLOGY, GB, (20091112), vol. 11, no. 2, doi:10.1111/j.1364-3703.2009.00600.x, ISSN 1464-6722, pages 179 - 189, XP055257352 [A] 1,2,4-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1364-3703.2009.00600.x |