EP3365146 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CUTTING OFF A PROVIDING A FILM PART UNIT FROM A FOOD PACKAGING FILM STRIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chocal Aluminiumverpackungen GmbH Perlenweg 6 73525 Schwaebisch Gmuend / DE | [2018/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPECK, Thomas Industriestraße 21 73571 Göggingen / DE | 02 /
SCHERR, Joachim Im Gerstenfeld 2 71549 Auenwald / DE | 03 /
BANTLEON, Konrad Humboldtstraße 15 89547 Gerstetten / DE | [2018/35] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/35] | Application number, filing date | 16785452.0 | 21.10.2016 | [2018/35] | WO2016EP75348 | Priority number, date | DE201510220738 | 23.10.2015 Original published format: DE102015220738 | [2018/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017068109 | Date: | 27.04.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3365146 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B26D7/18, B26F1/44, B65H29/24, B65H35/02 | [2019/31] | CPC: |
B26D7/18 (EP,US);
B65H35/02 (US);
B26D7/1863 (EP,US);
B26F1/44 (EP,US);
B65H29/241 (EP,US);
B26F2001/4481 (EP,US);
B65H2406/342 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/35] | B26D7/18, B26F1/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/35] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ABTRENNEN UND BEREITSTELLEN EINER FOLIENTEILSTÜCKEINHEIT VON EINEM LEBENSMITTELVERPACKUNGSFOLIENBAND | [2018/35] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CUTTING OFF A PROVIDING A FILM PART UNIT FROM A FOOD PACKAGING FILM STRIP | [2018/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION ET DE FOURNITURE D'UNE UNITÉ DE FILM D'UNE BANDE DE FILM D'EMBALLAGE ALIMENTAIRE | [2018/35] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/35] | 22.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 20.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2659421 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 7-10,18* page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 21; figures 1-6 *; | [A]CN204545128U (DONGGUAN DAOJIAO HENGCHANG MACHINERY PLANT) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0022]; figures 1-3 * |