EP3290036 - STABILIZED PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astellas Pharma Inc. 5-1, Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | [2018/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TASAKI, Hiroaki c/o Astellas Pharma Inc. 5-1 Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIDA, Mitsuru c/o Astellas Pharma Inc. 5-1 Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 03 /
TSUNASHIMA, Daisuke c/o Astellas Pharma Inc. 5-1 Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 04 /
AZUMA, Ryota c/o Astellas Pharma Inc. 5-1 Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | [2018/10] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/10] | Application number, filing date | 16786469.3 | 26.04.2016 | [2018/10] | WO2016JP63004 | Priority number, date | JP20150090702 | 27.04.2015 Original published format: JP 2015090702 | JP20150252958 | 25.12.2015 Original published format: JP 2015252958 | [2018/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016175192 | Date: | 03.11.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3290036 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/48, A61K31/497, A61K47/04, A61K47/26, A61K47/36, A61K47/38, A61P35/00 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
A61K47/26 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/4858 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/497 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/02 (EP,US);
A61K47/36 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/38 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/48 (US);
A61K9/4816 (US);
A61K9/485 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/10] | A61K31/497, A61K9/48, A61K47/04, A61K47/26, A61K47/36, A61K47/38, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] | Title | German: | STABILISIERTE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2018/10] | English: | STABILIZED PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION | [2018/10] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE STABILISÉE | [2018/10] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2017 | Translation filed | 09.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 09.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/10] | 09.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2805940 (ASTELLAS PHARMA INC [JP]) [X] 1,6,7,9,10 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0284] * * paragraph [0285]; example 261 * * example 54; table 105 * * test example 3; paragraph [0126] - paragraph [0128] * * table 3 * * paragraph [0133] - paragraph [0138] * * claims 1,12,13 * [I] 2-5,8,11; | [XPI]WO2015182628 (ASTELLAS PHARMA INC [JP]) [XP] 1,6,7,9,10 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0059] * * example 7 * [I] 2-5,8,11; | [E]EP3150206 (ASTELLAS PHARMA INC [JP]) [E] 1,6,7,9,10 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0059] * * example 7 *; | [A] - ALI R RAJABI-SIAHBOOMI ET AL, Chapter 13: Excipient selection in oral solid dosage formulations containing moisture sensitive drugs, EXCIPIENT APPLICATIONS IN FORMULATION DESIGN AND DRUG DELIVERY, NEW YORK, NY [U.A.] : SPRINGER, 2013, US, PAGE(S) 385 - 421, (20130101), ISBN 978-1-4614-8431-8, XP009509408 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * * sections 13.5 - 13.6.1; page 396 - page 403 * * section 13.2; page 387 * | [A] - HEIDEMANN D R ET AL, "Preformulation studies involving moisture uptake in solid dosage forms", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, SPRINGER NEW YORK LLC, US, (19910228), vol. 8, no. 3, doi:10.1023/A:1015877011807, ISSN 0724-8741, pages 292 - 297, XP009509474 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * * abstract * * tables 1,3 * * figure 5 * * "Results" * * "Discussion" * * "Conclusions" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1015877011807 | International search | [Y]WO2013108754 (ASTELLAS PHARMA INC [JP]) [Y] 1-11 * , paragraphs [0113], [0295] & JP 5532366 B & US 2014/0323463 A1 paragraph [0304]; table 137 & EP 2805940 A1 *; | [Y] - "7-1. Iyakuhin Tenkabutsu', '7-6. Iyakuhin no Rekka to sono Boshi", 7 Seizai no Kihon Mondai, Yakuzaigaku Manual, (19890320), pages 107 - 108, 122, XP 009507186 [Y] 1-11 | [Y] - Anonymous, "1. Kyushitsu ni yoru Kagaku Henka, Funtai o Chushin to shita Seizaigaku", Powder-based formulation, Fourth Edition, JAPAN, (19760325), pages 233 - 236, XP009508242 [Y] 1-11 * , a whole article * | [Y] - OSAMU SHINOZAKI, "Suibun Sokutei Sochi", Pharmacia, (19830900), vol. 19, no. 9, pages 900 - 902, XP 009507025 [Y] 1-11 * , particularly, page 900, column of Hajimeni, page 902, column of Owarini * | [Y] - N YUTO SUIWABUTSU, Iyakuhin Tenkabutsu Jiten 2007, (20070725), page 204, XP 009507040 [Y] 2-5 * , a whole article * | [Y] - "Yoto Betsu ni Mita Kobunshi Kagobutsu", Jitsuyo Iyakuhin Tenkabutsu, Kagaku Kogyosha, (19740305), pages 104 - 105, XP 009507148 [Y] 4, 5 * , particularly, page 105, upper part * |