EP3289390 - DENSITY MEASUREMENTS USING DETECTORS ON A PULSED NEUTRON MEASUREMENT PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAKER HUGHES, A GE COMPANY, LLC 17021 Aldine Westfield Houston, TX 77073 / US | [2018/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INANC, Feyzi 6526 Loblolly Vista Drive Spring, TX 77389 / US | 02 /
GADE, Sandeep S. 3115 Rose Trace Drive Spring, TX 77386 / US | 03 /
VASILYEV, Maxim 50 E Summer Storm Circle The Woodlands TX 77381 / US | 04 /
BLIVEN, Steven M. 723 Manitou Avenue Manitou Springs, CO 80829 / US | 05 /
CHACE, David M. 618 E 8th Street Houston, TX 77007 / US | [2018/21] |
Former [2018/15] | 01 /
INANC, Feyzi 2929 Allen Parkway Suite 2100 Houston, TX 77019-2118 / US | ||
02 /
CHACE, David, M. 2929 Allen Parkway Suite 2100 Houston, TX 77019-2118 / US | |||
03 /
VASILYEV, Maxim 50 E Summer Storm Circle The Woodlands TX 77381 / US | |||
04 /
GADE, Sandeep, S. 2929 Allen Parkway Suite 2100 Houston, TX 77019-2118 / US | |||
05 /
BLIVEN, Steven, M. 2929 Allen Parkway Suite 2100 Houston, TX 77019-2118 / US | |||
Former [2018/10] | 01 /
INANC, Feyzi 2929 Allen Parkway Suite 2100 Houston, TX 77019-2118 / US | ||
02 /
CHACE, David, M. 2929 Allen Parkway Suite 2100 Houston, TX 77019-2118 / US | |||
03 /
VASILYEV, Maxim 2929 Allen Parkway Suite 2100 Houston, TX 77019-2118 / US | |||
04 /
GADE, Sandeep, S. 2929 Allen Parkway Suite 2100 Houston, TX 77019-2118 / US | |||
05 /
BLIVEN, Steven, M. 2929 Allen Parkway Suite 2100 Houston, TX 77019-2118 / US | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/10] | Davies, Christopher Robert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 16787021.1 | 27.04.2016 | [2018/10] | WO2016US29450 | Priority number, date | US201514699910 | 29.04.2015 Original published format: US201514699910 | [2018/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016176260 | Date: | 03.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3289390 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N9/24, E21B49/00, G01V5/14, G01V5/10 | [2024/40] | CPC: |
G01V5/145 (EP,US);
E21B49/00 (EP,US);
G01N9/24 (EP,US);
G01T1/208 (US);
G01V5/10 (EP,US);
G01V5/102 (US);
G01V5/12 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/03] | G01V5/14, G01V5/10, G01V5/12, G01V1/28, G01V1/30, G01V1/40, G01V1/16 | ||
Former IPC [2018/10] | G01V1/28, G01V1/30, G01V1/40, G01V1/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] | Title | German: | DICHTEMESSUNGEN MIT DETEKTOREN AUF EINER GEPULSTEN NEUTRONENMESSUNGSPLATTFORM | [2018/10] | English: | DENSITY MEASUREMENTS USING DETECTORS ON A PULSED NEUTRON MEASUREMENT PLATFORM | [2018/10] | French: | MESURES DE DENSITÉ À L'AIDE DE DÉTECTEURS SUR UNE PLATE-FORME DE MESURE DE NEUTRONS PULSÉS | [2018/10] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 27.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/10] | 27.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0323773 (SCHLUMBERGER LTD [US], et al); | [XYI]US2005028586 (SMITS JAN WOUTER [US], et al); | [YA]US2007023626 (RILEY STEPHEN [US], et al); | [YA]US2011112810 (SCOULLAR PAUL ANDREW BASIL [AU], et al); | [A]WO2011094405 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US], et al); | [YA]US2013048847 (GILCHRIST W ALLEN [US], et al); | [A]US2013048849 (LI FUSHENG [US], et al) | International search | [X]US4879463 (WRAIGHT PETER D [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * See column 3, lines 8-10, column 5, lines 24 - column 12, line 46, claims 1, 30, and figures 1-2A. *; | [A]US2010228485 (BETANCOURT SORAYA [US], et al) [A] 1-15* See abstract, paragraphs [0021]-[0027], and figures 1A-1B. *; | [A]US2011077867 (EVANS MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See abstract, paragraphs [0021]-[0031], and figures 1-2. *; | [A]US2011191027 (PFUTZNER HAROLD [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See abstract, paragraphs [0065]-[0074], and figures 4A-4D. *; | [A]US2013300570 (COOPER PAUL A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See abstract, paragraphs [0030]-[0039], and figure 3. * | by applicant | EP0323773 | US2005028586 |