EP3275241 - WIRELESS CLIENT TRAFFIC CONTINUITY ACROSS CONTROLLER FAILOVER AND LOAD-BALANCING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | [2019/25] |
Former [2018/05] | For all designated states Aruba Networks, Inc. 1344 Crossman Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THEOGARAJ, Isaac 1344 Crossman Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | 02 /
JOSHI, Puneet 1344 Crossman Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | 03 /
VERMA, Shishir 1344 Crossman Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | 04 /
YANG, Sheausong 1344 Crossman Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | [2018/05] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/24] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2018/05] | Holt, Daniel Richard Hewlett Packard Servicios Espana S.L. Legal Department - IP Section Vicente Aleixandre, 1 Parque Empresarial Las Rozas 28232 Las Rozas, Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 16787116.9 | 28.04.2016 | [2018/05] | WO2016US29700 | Priority number, date | US201514699879 | 29.04.2015 Original published format: US201514699879 | [2018/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016176408 | Date: | 03.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3275241 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3275241 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/12, H04W28/08, H04W24/04, H04W12/06, H04L29/06, H04W84/12, H04W88/12 | [2018/11] | CPC: |
H04L69/40 (EP,US);
H04W36/10 (CN,US);
G06F11/14 (US);
G06F11/2092 (EP);
G06F11/2097 (EP,US);
G06F21/00 (US);
H04L43/08 (US);
H04L47/00 (US);
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
H04L63/061 (EP,US);
H04L65/611 (EP,US);
H04L67/14 (EP,CN,US);
H04L67/142 (EP,US);
H04W52/00 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (US);
H04W88/12 (US);
G06F2201/80 (EP);
H04L45/22 (EP,CN,US);
H04L47/125 (EP,US);
H04L63/101 (EP,US);
H04L67/1027 (EP,CN);
|
Former IPC [2018/05] | H04W28/12, H04W28/08, H04W24/04, H04W12/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRAHTLOS-CLIENT-VERKEHRSKONTINUITÄT ÜBER STEUERGERÄTEAUSFALLSICHERUNG UND LASTAUSGLEICH HINWEG | [2018/05] | English: | WIRELESS CLIENT TRAFFIC CONTINUITY ACROSS CONTROLLER FAILOVER AND LOAD-BALANCING | [2018/05] | French: | CONTINUITÉ DE TRAFIC DE CLIENT SANS FIL SUR L'ENSEMBLE D'UN BASCULEMENT DE CONTRÔLEUR ET ÉQUILIBRAGE DE CHARGE | [2018/05] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/05] | 26.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.04.2016 | AL | 10.06.2020 | AT | 10.06.2020 | CY | 10.06.2020 | CZ | 10.06.2020 | DK | 10.06.2020 | EE | 10.06.2020 | ES | 10.06.2020 | FI | 10.06.2020 | HR | 10.06.2020 | IT | 10.06.2020 | LT | 10.06.2020 | LV | 10.06.2020 | MC | 10.06.2020 | MK | 10.06.2020 | MT | 10.06.2020 | NL | 10.06.2020 | PL | 10.06.2020 | RO | 10.06.2020 | RS | 10.06.2020 | SE | 10.06.2020 | SI | 10.06.2020 | SK | 10.06.2020 | SM | 10.06.2020 | BG | 10.09.2020 | NO | 10.09.2020 | GR | 11.09.2020 | IS | 10.10.2020 | PT | 12.10.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 28.04.2016 | |
AL | 10.06.2020 | ||
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CY | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
MK | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 28.04.2016 | |
AL | 10.06.2020 | ||
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CY | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 28.04.2016 | |
AL | 10.06.2020 | ||
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 10.06.2020 | |
NO | 10.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2004100899 (MAHAMUNI ATUL B [US]); | [XA]EP2521335 (ACME PACKET INC [US]) | International search | [A]US2004199808 (FREIMUTH DOUGLAS MORGAN [US], et al); | [A]US2009049201 (ALBERT MARK [US], et al); | [A]US2012144462 (POCHOP JR JEFFREY L [US]); | [A]US2014095925 (WILSON JASON [CA], et al); | [A]US8799511 (BALAKRISHNA RAGHUNATH [US], et al) |