EP3288999 - COMPOSITION INCLUDING A POLYTHIOL AND A POLYEPOXIDE AND METHODS RELATING TO THE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2018/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YE, Sheng 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
GONG, Tao 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
BLACKWELL, Charlie P. 1069 Hatch Avenue Saint Paul, Minnesota 55103 / US | 04 /
ZOOK, Jonathan D. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
DEMOSS, Susan E. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2018/10] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire Theatinerstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/33] | Mathys & Squire Mathys & Squire Europe LLP Theatinerstraße 7 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2018/10] | Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16787215.9 | 29.04.2016 | [2018/10] | WO2016US30021 | Priority number, date | US201562154469P | 29.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562154469 P | US201562154502P | 29.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562154502 P | [2018/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016176548 | Date: | 03.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3288999 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3288999 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 03.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08G59/66, C08G59/40, C08G59/68, C08G75/00, B05D1/36 | [2018/39] | CPC: |
C08G59/4021 (EP,US);
C08G59/22 (EP,US);
C08G59/32 (EP,US);
C08G59/56 (EP,US);
C08G59/66 (EP,US);
C08G59/686 (EP,US);
C08G75/02 (EP,US);
C08G75/04 (EP,US);
C08L63/00 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08L63/00, C08L81/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/10] | C08G59/66, C08G59/40, C08G59/68, C08G75/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINEM POLYTHIOL UND EINEM POLYEPOXID SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2018/10] | English: | COMPOSITION INCLUDING A POLYTHIOL AND A POLYEPOXIDE AND METHODS RELATING TO THE COMPOSITION | [2018/10] | French: | COMPOSITION COMPRENANT UN POLYTHIOL ET UN POLYÉPOXYDE, ET PROCÉDÉS SE RAPPORTANT À LA COMPOSITION | [2018/10] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 30.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/10] | 30.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.05.2021
CHEMETALL GmbH Trakehner Strasse 3 60487 Frankfurt / DE Opponent's representative Steffan & Kiehne Patentanwälte PartG mbB Burgplatz 21-22 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | 02
11.05.2021
PPG Indudtries, Inc One PPG Place Pittsburgh PA 15272 / US Opponent's representative f & e patent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2021/24] | 15.06.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 29.12.2022 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2023/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.04.2016 | AL | 12.08.2020 | AT | 12.08.2020 | CY | 12.08.2020 | CZ | 12.08.2020 | DK | 12.08.2020 | EE | 12.08.2020 | ES | 12.08.2020 | FI | 12.08.2020 | HR | 12.08.2020 | IT | 12.08.2020 | LT | 12.08.2020 | LV | 12.08.2020 | MC | 12.08.2020 | MK | 12.08.2020 | MT | 12.08.2020 | NL | 12.08.2020 | PL | 12.08.2020 | RO | 12.08.2020 | RS | 12.08.2020 | SE | 12.08.2020 | SI | 12.08.2020 | SK | 12.08.2020 | SM | 12.08.2020 | BG | 12.11.2020 | NO | 12.11.2020 | GR | 13.11.2020 | IS | 12.12.2020 | PT | 14.12.2020 | GB | 29.04.2021 | IE | 29.04.2021 | LU | 29.04.2021 | BE | 30.04.2021 | CH | 30.04.2021 | LI | 30.04.2021 | DE | 03.11.2021 | FR | 30.04.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 29.04.2016 | |
AL | 12.08.2020 | ||
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CY | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
MK | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
PT | 14.12.2020 | ||
GB | 29.04.2021 | ||
IE | 29.04.2021 | ||
LU | 29.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
DE | 03.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 29.04.2016 | |
AL | 12.08.2020 | ||
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CY | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
PT | 14.12.2020 | ||
GB | 29.04.2021 | ||
IE | 29.04.2021 | ||
LU | 29.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
DE | 03.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CY | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
PT | 14.12.2020 | ||
GB | 29.04.2021 | ||
IE | 29.04.2021 | ||
LU | 29.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
DE | 03.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
PT | 14.12.2020 | ||
GB | 29.04.2021 | ||
IE | 29.04.2021 | ||
LU | 29.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
DE | 03.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
GB | 29.04.2021 | ||
IE | 29.04.2021 | ||
LU | 29.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
DE | 03.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
GB | 29.04.2021 | ||
IE | 29.04.2021 | ||
LU | 29.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
DE | 03.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
GB | 29.04.2021 | ||
IE | 29.04.2021 | ||
LU | 29.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
DE | 03.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
GB | 29.04.2021 | ||
IE | 29.04.2021 | ||
LU | 29.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
DE | 03.11.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
GB | 29.04.2021 | ||
LU | 29.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
DE | 03.11.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
GB | 29.04.2021 | ||
LU | 29.04.2021 | ||
DE | 03.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
LU | 29.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 12.08.2020 | |
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 12.08.2020 | |
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | DK | 12.08.2020 | |
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2006008251 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 1, line 2 - page 58, line 17; example -; claims 1-13 *; | [XY]WO2009069562 (THREE BOND CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0037]; example -; claims 1-13 * [Y] 1-15; | [XP]WO2015121341 (ZEISS CARL JENA GMBH [DE]) [XP] 1-15* page 1, line 4 - page 33, line 35; example -; claims 1-14 * | International search | [A]JPS59129221 (DAINIHON SHIKIZAI KOGYO KK) [A] 1 * Abstract *; | [X]US6057380 (BIRBAUM JEAN-LUC [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * Abstract; Col 9, lines 60-65; Col 5, line 65 - Col 6, line 1; Col 10, line 10-17, line 62-67; Col 11, line 25; Col 18, lines 35-50; Col 19, line 50-65; Col. 25, Example 4 *; | [X]JP2009126974 (THREE BOND CO LTD) [X] 1-15 * Para 0011; Claim 1 *; | [X]JP2010095686 (ASAHI KASEI E MATERIALS CORP) [X] 1-15 * Para 0087-0090, Examples 1-2 *; | [X]JP2013087149 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-15 * Abstract; Para 0046, 0101, 0105, 0125 *; | [PX]WO2015121341 (ZEISS CARL JENA GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-15* Claims 1 and 9; Page 18, line 36 * | by applicant | US2466963 | US2789958 | US4165425 | US4366307 | US4609762 | US5225472 | US5610243 | US5912319 | US5959071 | US6057380 | US6087070 | US6124371 | US6172179 | US6410628 | US6509418 | WO2006008251 | US7538104 | WO2009069562 | JP2009126974 | US2011190412 | WO2014172305 | WO2015121341 | - SUYAMA, K.SHIRAI, M., "Photobase Generators: Recent Progress and Application Trend in Polymer Systems", Progress in Polymer Science, (20090000), vol. 34, doi:doi:10.1016/j.progpolymsci.2008.08.005, pages 194 - 209, XP025770090 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.progpolymsci.2008.08.005 | - SALMI, H. et al., "Quaternary Ammonium Salts of Phenylglyoxylic acid as Photobase Generators for Thiol- Promoted Epoxide Photopolymerization", Polymer Chemistry, (20140000), vol. 5, doi:doi:10.1039/C4PY00927D, pages 6577 - 6583, XP055302705 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C4PY00927D | Opposition | US5610243 | US5912319 | US6057380 | WO2008010786 | JP2009126974 | EP2270114 | CN103305131 | WO2015121341 | US3363026 | GB1220741 | US6489374 | US7538104 | US2011028585 | EP2145231 | DE102014202609 | - "Product information 2-methyl-4'-(methylthio)-2-Morpholinopropiophenone Item No. 21651", Registry, (20190905), Database accession no. 71868-10-5, URL: STN, XP055955525 | - Studer Katia, Jung Tunja, Dietliker Kurt, Benkhoff Johannes, Sitzmann Eugene, "Photolatent bases: new catalysts for UV-curing of coatings", RadTech 2006 Technical Proceedings, (20060101), XP055959825 | - H. MANCHANDA et al., "DEVELOPMENT OF A NOVEL COATING SYSTEM USING PHOTO-LATENT BASE TECHNOLOGY", URL: https://www.eiseverywhere.com/docs/5555/193128 | - Jehanno Coralie, Pérez-Madrigal Maria M., Demarteau Jeremy, Sardon Haritz, Dove Andrew P., "Organocatalysis for depolymerisation", Polymer Chemistry, Royal Society of Chemistry, Cambridge, Cambridge , (20190101), vol. 10, no. 2, doi:10.1039/C8PY01284A, ISSN 1759-9954, pages 172 - 186, XP055959795 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C8PY01284A | - Farhad Khalili, Amr Henni, Allan L. L. East, "p K a Values of Some Piperazines at (298, 303, 313, and 323) K", JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL AND ENGINEERING DATA., AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY., US, US , (20091008), vol. 54, no. 10, doi:10.1021/je900005c, ISSN 0021-9568, pages 2914 - 2917, XP055551770 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/je900005c | - Anonymous, "Araldite Casting Resin System", Ciba /Product Data, (19980701), Ciba /Product Data, (20220912), XP055959820 | - Blickenstorfer Benno, Peregi Eva, Carroy Antoine, Meier Markus A, Dietliker Kurt, Sitzmann Eugene V, "Photolatent Base Catalysts for Adhesives", RADTECH REPORT, (20100701), pages 10 - 16, XP055959802 | - Dietliker Kurt, Jung Tunja, Studer Katia, Benkhoff Johannes, "Photolatent Tertiary Amines - A New Technology Platform for Radiation Curing", CHIMIA International Journal for Chemistry, Schweizerische Chemische Gesellschaft, CH, CH , (20070101), vol. 61, no. 10, doi:10.2533/chimia.2007.655, ISSN 0009-4293, pages 655 - 660, XP055959805 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2533/chimia.2007.655 | - Dietliker K., T. Jung, J. Benkhoff , "Photolatent Amines: New Opportunities in Radiation Curing", RadTech 2004 Technical Proceedings, (20040101), RadTech 2004 Technical Proceedings, (20220912), XP055959808 | - Jung T., "Neue Amine braucht das Land", Neue Amine braucht das Land, (20031001), Neue Amine braucht das Land, URL: https://docplayer.org/31354514-Neue-amine-braucht-das-land.html, (20220912), XP055959811 |