EP3291736 - MICROWAVE ABLATION PLANNING AND PROCEDURE SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2018/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIROTTO, Darren G. 656 West Ash Street Louisville, Colorado 80027 / US | 02 /
BHARADWAJ, Jeetendra S. 2810 Twin Lakes Circle Lafayette, Colorado 80026 / US | 03 /
FRANK, Kevin J. 844 West Spruce Street Louisville, CO 80027 / US | [2018/11] | Representative(s) | Maschio & Soames IP Ltd 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [2024/25] |
Former [2018/11] | Maschio, Antonio Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | Application number, filing date | 16787216.7 | 29.04.2016 | [2018/11] | WO2016US30028 | Priority number, date | US201562154929P | 30.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562154929 P | US201562154924P | 30.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562154924 P | US201562154933P | 30.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562154933 P | US201562154942P | 30.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562154942 P | US201562154950P | 30.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562154950 P | US201615099730 | 15.04.2016 Original published format: US201615099730 | US201615099665 | 15.04.2016 Original published format: US201615099665 | US201615099772 | 15.04.2016 Original published format: US201615099772 | US201615099698 | 15.04.2016 Original published format: US201615099698 | US201615099820 | 15.04.2016 Original published format: US201615099820 | [2018/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016176549 | Date: | 03.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3291736 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3291736 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/20, A61B18/18, A61B8/14, A61B8/08, A61B8/00 | [2019/10] | CPC: |
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
A61B18/1815 (EP,US);
A61B34/10 (EP,US);
A61B34/25 (US);
A61B8/0841 (EP,US);
A61B8/085 (EP,US);
A61B8/4254 (EP,US);
A61B8/463 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00702 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00714 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00761 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00904 (US);
A61B2018/1823 (US);
A61B2018/1861 (US);
A61B2018/1869 (EP,US);
A61B2034/105 (US);
A61B2034/2051 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/11] | A61B8/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PLANUNGS- UND VERFAHRENSSYSTEME FÜR MIKROWELLENABLATION | [2018/11] | English: | MICROWAVE ABLATION PLANNING AND PROCEDURE SYSTEMS | [2018/11] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE PLANIFICATION ET DE PROCÉDURE D'ABLATION PAR MICRO-ONDES | [2018/11] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/11] | 29.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005090742 (MINE YOSHITAKA [JP], et al); | [XI]WO2010096419 (INNEROPTIC TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) | International search | [A]JP2001340350 (ALOKA CO LTD); | [X]US2002049375 (STROMMER GERA M [IL], et al); | [X]US2005090742 (MINE YOSHITAKA [JP], et al); | [A]US2010240997 (ICHIOKA KENICHI [JP], et al) | by applicant | US2005090742 | WO2010096419 |