EP3365853 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR GROSS SETTLEMENT BY USE OF AN OPAQUE BLOCKCHAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.09.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Change: Date of oral proceedings | 27.04.2024 | Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mastercard International Incorporated 2000 Purchase Street Purchase, New York 10577 / US | [2018/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIS, Steven, Charles 128 Glenallen Drive Saint Peters, MO 63376 / US | [2018/35] | Representative(s) | Walker-Smith, Samantha Lynelle Zhi Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/35] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 16787693.7 | 19.10.2016 | [2018/35] | WO2016US57579 | Priority number, date | US201514950117 | 24.11.2015 Original published format: US201514950117 | [2018/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017091305 | Date: | 01.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3365853 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/02, G06Q20/38, H04L9/32 | [2018/35] | CPC: |
G06Q20/3827 (EP,US);
G06Q20/02 (EP,US);
G06Q20/389 (EP,US);
G06Q20/401 (EP,US);
H04L9/3239 (EP,US);
H04L9/50 (EP,US);
H04L2209/56 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BRUTTOABRECHNUNG MITTELS EINER OPAKEN BLOCKKETTE | [2018/35] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR GROSS SETTLEMENT BY USE OF AN OPAQUE BLOCKCHAIN | [2018/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE RÈGLEMENT BRUT AU MOYEN D'UNE CHAÎNE DE BLOCS OPAQUE | [2018/35] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/35] | 06.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.11.2021 | 18.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 11.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | Appeal following examination | 04.03.2022 | Appeal received No. T1617/22 | 04.03.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 20.05.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.04.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2004128240 (YUSIN WENDY E [US]) [I] 1-30 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0018] , [0028] , [0045] - [0059] - [0071] , [0077] , [0110] , [0159] - [0164] * * tables I, III *; | [A]WO2008060951 (VISA USA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * abstract * * page 10, lines 3-8, 25-30 * * page 11, lines 20-23 * * page 20, lines 2-8, 31 - page 21, line 32 *; | [A] - Gertrude Chavez-Dreyfuss, "IBM is looking to adopt bitcoin technology for major currencies - Business Insider", (20150312), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20150929155653/http://www.businessinsider.com/r-exclusive-ibm-looking-at-adopting-bitcoin-technology-for-major-currencies-2015-3, (20170110), XP055333933 [A] 1-30 * the whole document * | [A] - Dr Gavin Wood, "ETHEREUM: A SECURE DECENTRALISED GENERALISED TRANSACTION LEDGER FINAL DRAFT -UNDER REVIEW", (20140604), URL: http://gavwood.com/paper.pdf, (20160118), XP055242189 [A] 1-30 * sections 2, 4.2, 4.3, 11, 11.5 * |